This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2020 at 05:13:36 (UTC).

Sonya A. Huerta

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Sonya A Huerta was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin R. Barash. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-BK-10015

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Martin R. Barash

 

Party Details

Debtor

Sonya A. Huerta

Santa Barbara, CA 93103

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (ND)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Sandra McBeth (TR)

Atascdero, CA 93422

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Case Com Def Notice

#6

(#6) Order Granting Application To Proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #5). Signed on 1/6/2020. (Ortiz, Amber) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#1

Main Document

#5

(#5) Application to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by Debtor Sonya A. Huerta (Ortiz, Amber) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Sonya A. Huerta . (Ortiz, Amber) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/10/2020 at 10:00 AM at RM 148, 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. Objections for Discharge due by 04/10/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 04/10/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Ortiz, Amber) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Granting Application To Proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #5). Signed on 1/6/2020. (Ortiz, Amber) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Application to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by Debtor Sonya A. Huerta (Ortiz, Amber) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Sonya A. Huerta . (Ortiz, Amber) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Sonya A. Huerta . (Ortiz, Amber) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/10/2020 at 10:00 AM at RM 148, 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. Objections for Discharge due by 04/10/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 04/10/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Ortiz, Amber) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Sonya A. Huerta Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 1/21/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 1/21/2020. (Ortiz, Amber) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.