This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 09/17/2021 at 21:41:53 (UTC).

Solano v. Magnum Property Investments LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 Solano filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Magnum Property Investments LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent P. Zurzolo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-AP-01684

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent P. Zurzolo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose R Solano

Los Angeles, CA 90032

Defendants

Magnum Property Investments LLC

Rene Wilson

Lane Nussbaum

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

Riverside County Sheriff Dept

Trustee

Wesley H Avery (TR)

Pasadena, CA 91101

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Lane M Nussbaum

Attorney at NUSSBAUM APC

27489 Agoura Rd Ste 102

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

Kayleigh A Andersen

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

650 E. Hospitality Lane, Ste 600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

#33

#32

30 #2

Proposed Order

30 #1

Main Document

#28

#27

#26

#25

#13

#8

#5

#4

#3

#2

AP-Summons

2 #1

Main Document

1 #2

Summons

#1

Main Document

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1684 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jose R Solano, #25 Transcript, #31 Transcript) (Johnson, Tina R.) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#32 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/06/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Order Granting Motion to of County of Riverside And Renee Wilson to Dismiss Plaintiff's Adversary Complaint Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #13) Signed on 3/4/2021. (Carranza, Shemainee) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • Docket(#31) Transcript regarding Hearing Held 02/04/21 RE: MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S ADVERSARY COMPLAINT UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6). Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 05/17/2021. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office on a public terminal or purchased through the Transcription Service Provider before the transcript access restriction has ended. [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: BRIGGS REPORTING COMPANY, INC., Telephone number 310-410-4151.]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 2/22/2021. Redaction Request Due By 03/8/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 03/18/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 05/17/2021. (Steinhauer, Holly) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Notice of lodgment of Order in Adversary Proceeding re: Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendants Riverside County Sheriff Dept, Rene Wilson (RE: related document(s)#13 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's adversary complaint under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and Notice of motion; Filed by Defendants Riverside County Sheriff Dept, Rene Wilson (Johnson, Tina R.) [Amended Notice to be Filed] Modified on 1/25/2021 (Johnson, Tina R.). filed by Defendant Rene Wilson, Defendant Riverside County Sheriff Dept). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Andersen, Kayleigh) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Transcript Record Transmittal (Court transcript records have been uploaded to FDS). For Order Number: 21-VZ-08. RE Hearing Date: 02/04/21, [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: Briggs Reporting, Telephone number (310) 410-4151.] (RE: related document(s)#28 Transcript Order Form (Public Request) filed by Plaintiff Jose R Solano) (Carranza, Shemainee) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Transcript Order Form , regarding Hearing Date 02/04/21 Filed by Plaintiff Jose R Solano (RE: related document(s) 14 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set). [EDB] (Carranza, Shemainee) . (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#26 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/04/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Order RE: Defendant's Magnum Property Investment LLC And Lane Nussbaum's Motion to Dismiss (BNC-PDF) Signed on 2/2/2021 (RE: related document(s)#4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Magnum Property Investments LLC, Defendant Lane Nussbaum). (Carranza, Shemainee) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Transcript regarding Hearing Held 01/21/21 RE: MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S ADVERSARY COMPLAINT. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 04/29/2021. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office on a public terminal or purchased through the Transcription Service Provider before the transcript access restriction has ended. [TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE PROVIDER: BRIGGS REPORTING COMPANY, INC., Telephone number 310-410-4151.]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 2/5/2021. Redaction Request Due By 02/19/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 03/1/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 04/29/2021. (Steinhauer, Holly) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect/incomplete/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry. CORRECTION: Incorrect form title. Document should reflect: United States Bankruptcy Court Central District of California Los Angeles Division. CORRECTION: Judge's initials not included in adversary number on PDF. (RE: related document(s)#8 Request for judicial notice filed by Defendant Magnum Property Investments LLC, Defendant Lane Nussbaum) (Johnson, Tina R.) (Entered: 12/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for judicial notice Amended Filed by Defendants Lane Nussbaum, Magnum Property Investments LLC (RE: related document(s)#5 Request for judicial notice). (Nussbaum, Lane) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Magnum Property Investments LLC, Defendant Lane Nussbaum) The Hearing date is set for 1/21/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Vincent P. Zurzolo (Johnson, Tina R.) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect/incomplete/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry. CORRECTION: Mandatory proof of service not attached and/or Incorrect date on proof of servce. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE CORRECT PDF IMMEDIATELY. (RE: related document(s)#5 Request for judicial notice filed by Defendant Magnum Property Investments LLC, Defendant Lane Nussbaum) (Johnson, Tina R.) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for judicial notice Filed by Defendants Lane Nussbaum, Magnum Property Investments LLC (RE: related document(s)#4 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding ). (Nussbaum, Lane) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendants Lane Nussbaum, Magnum Property Investments LLC (Nussbaum, Lane) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proof of service Filed by Plaintiff Jose R Solano (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint). (Carranza, Shemainee) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued on Lane Nussbaum Date Issued 12/9/2020, Answer Due 1/8/2021; Magnum Property Investments LLC Date Issued 12/9/2020, Answer Due 1/8/2021; Riverside County Sheriff Dept Date Issued 12/9/2020, Answer Due 1/8/2021; Rene Wilson Date Issued 12/9/2020, Answer Due 1/8/2021 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jose R Solano) Status hearing to be held on 3/4/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Vincent P. Zurzolo (Carranza, Shemainee) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $0.00 by 20. Receipt Number 20242226. (admin) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 2:20-ap-01684. Complaint by Jose R Solano against Magnum Property Investments LLC , Lane Nussbaum , Rene Wilson , Riverside County Sheriff Dept . ($350.00 Fee Not Required). Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) ,(71 (Injunctive relief - reinstatement of stay)) (Cowan, Sarah) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/8/2020 (Cowan, Sarah). (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIVERSIDE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where MAGNUM PROPERTY INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lane M Nussbaum