This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 08/08/2021 at 06:32:30 (UTC).

Sky Steel, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 Sky Steel, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Middle Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Lori V. Vaughan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-BK-02638

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Lori V. Vaughan

 

Party Details

Debtor

Sky Steel, Inc.

Po Box 300165

Casselberry, FL 32730

Us Trustee

United States Trustee - ORL

George C Young Federal Building

400 West Washington Street, SU 1100

Trustee

L. Todd Budgen

Longwood, FL 32752

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Jeffrey Ainsworth

Attorney at BransonLaw PLLC

1501 E. Concord Street

Orlando, FL 32803

Robert B Branson

Attorney at BransonLaw PLLC

1501 E. Concord Street

Orlando, FL 32803

Jacob D Flentke

Attorney at BransonLaw, PLLC

1501 East Concord Street

Orlando, FL 32803

Us Trustee Attorney

Miriam G Suarez

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

George C. Young Federal Building

400 West Washington Street, SU 1100

 

Court Documents

#49

#48

#46

#45

#44

#43

#42

#40

#29

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

#3

#2

#1

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Proof of Service of Order Granting Amended Application of Sky Steel, Inc. to Retain Counsel for Debtor in Possession. Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Sky Steel, Inc. (related document(s)#48). (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Order Granting Amended Application to Employ/Retain Jeffrey S. Ainsworth and BransonLaw, PLLC. as Counsel (Related Doc #45). Service Instructions: Jeffrey Ainsworth is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Rutha). (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Financial Reports for the Period June 10, 2021 to June 30, 2021. Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Sky Steel, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Jeffrey Ainsworth: Debtor; Jill Kelso: UST; L Todd Budgen: SubV Trustee; Mindy Langston: Huntington National Bank RULING: 1) Initial Status Conference - cont to 9/8/21 at 1:30pm (AOCNFNG) 2) Motion by Debtor to Use Cash Collateral and Emergency Hearing Requested (Doc #8) - granted on interim basis; continued hearing 9/8/21 at 1:30pm. Order by Ainsworth. 3) Amended Motion to Extend Automatic Stay to Stephen P. Collins and Elizabeth A. Collins and Request for Emergency Hearing (Doc #32) - cont to 9/8/21 at 1:30pm (AOCNFNG) 4) Application to Retain Jeffrey S. Ainsworth as Debtor Counsel Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Sky Steel, Inc. (Doc #29) - Amended Application filed 7/21/21 (Doc #45) - Approved; order by Ainsworth. (aj) Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Dkt) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketThe Application to Employ/Retain (Doc #45) appears to be the type of motion or application listed on the Court's Accompanying Orders List posted on the Court's website #(Click here to view). Local Rule 9072-1(b)(1) states that if a motion or application is listed on the Accompanying Orders List, counsel may submit a proposed order at the time that the motion or application is filed. Counsel for the moving party is directed to verify that the motion or application is listed on the Accompanying Orders List, and if so, to submit a proposed order granting the motion or approving the application. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Amended Application to Retain Jeffrey S. Ainsworth and BransonLaw, PLLC. as Counsel Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Sky Steel, Inc. (related document(s)#29). (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Proof of Service of Second Preliminary Order Granting motion by Debtor-In-Possession for Authority to Use Cash Collateral and Emergency Hearing Requested through July 27, 2021; A Further Preliminary Hearing on this Matter Will be Held on July 27, 2021. Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Sky Steel, Inc. (related document(s)#43). (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketThe United States Trustee states that the initial meeting of creditors was held and concluded on July 19, 2021. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Suarez, Miriam) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Second Interim Order Granting Emergency Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral (related document(s)#8). Hearing scheduled for 7/27/2021 at 02:45 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6C, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Service Instructions: Jeffrey Ainsworth is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Rutha) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #40)). Notice Date 07/17/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion to Extend Automatic Stay to Stephen P. Collins and Elizabeth A. Collins and Request for Emergency Hearing Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Sky Steel, Inc. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Emergency Hearing Requested Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Sky Steel, Inc. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/10/2021 (Scott). (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice as Additional Counsel Filed by Jacob D Flentke on behalf of Debtor Sky Steel, Inc.. (Flentke, Jacob) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice as Additional Counsel Filed by Robert B Branson on behalf of Debtor Sky Steel, Inc.. (Branson, Robert) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Tax Documents for the Year 2020 Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Sky Steel, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Cash Flow Statement for Small Business Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Sky Steel, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Balance Sheet Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Sky Steel, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Sky Steel, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(6:21-bk-02638) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number 67535234, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) *Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Fee Paid.). Schedules and Summary of Assets. Statement of Financial Affairs. List of 20 Largest Creditors. Disclosure of Compensation Not Filed. Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Sky Steel, Inc.. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 09/7/2021. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/10/2021 (Ahyen). Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2021 (Lumpkins, Scott). (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Miriam G Suarez