This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 12/18/2021 at 06:31:55 (UTC).

SILVER STATE BROADCASTING, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 SILVER STATE BROADCASTING, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Nevada Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is AUGUST B. LANDIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-BK-14978

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

AUGUST B. LANDIS

 

Party Details

Debtor

SILVER STATE BROADCASTING, LLC

Us Trustee

U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11

Not Yet Classified

GOLDEN STATE BROADCASTING, LLC

MAJOR MARKET RADIO LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor and Not Yet Classified Attorney

STEPHEN R HARRIS

Us Trustee Attorney

JOHN W. NEMECEK

 

Court Documents

#87

(#87) Reply Filed by STEPHEN R HARRIS on behalf of GOLDEN STATE BROADCASTING, LLC, MAJOR MARKET RADIO LLC, SILVER STATE BROADCASTING, LLC (Related document(s)#77 Opposition filed by Other Prof. W. LAWRENCE PATRICK.) (HARRIS, STEPHEN) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#86

(#86) Omnibus Reply in support of Motion to Excuse Turnover in Favor of Receiver and to Dismiss/Abstain, or, Alternatively, for Stay Relief and/or Conversion with Certificate of Service Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of W. LAWRENCE PATRICK (Related document(s)#45 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Other Prof. W. LAWRENCE PATRICK, Motion for Relief from Stay.) (AXELROD, BRETT) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#85

(#85) Amended Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by JOHN M NAYLOR on behalf of NAYLOR & BRASTER ATTORNEYS AT LAW PLLC (NAYLOR, JOHN) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#84

(#84) Joinder to Receiver's Opposition to Debtors' Emergency Joint Motion for Order Directing Court Appointed Receiver to Turnover Property Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 543(a) and (b) with Certificate of Service Filed by OGONNA M. BROWN on behalf of VCY AMERICA, INC. (Related document(s)#77 Opposition filed by Other Prof. W. LAWRENCE PATRICK.) (BROWN, OGONNA) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#83

(#83) Request for Special Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by STEVEN B. SCOW on behalf of BELLAIRE TOWER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (SCOW, STEVEN) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#82

(#82) Joinder with Certificate of Service Filed by STEVEN B. SCOW on behalf of BELLAIRE TOWER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Related document(s)#77 Opposition filed by Other Prof. W. LAWRENCE PATRICK.) (SCOW, STEVEN) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#81

(#81) Declaration Of: Edward R. Stolz Filed by STEPHEN R HARRIS on behalf of GOLDEN STATE BROADCASTING, LLC, MAJOR MARKET RADIO LLC, SILVER STATE BROADCASTING, LLC (Related document(s)#80 Opposition filed by Debtor SILVER STATE BROADCASTING, LLC, Jnt Admin Debtor GOLDEN STATE BROADCASTING, LLC, Jnt Admin Debtor MAJOR MARKET RADIO LLC) (HARRIS, STEPHEN) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#80

(#80) Opposition Filed by STEPHEN R HARRIS on behalf of GOLDEN STATE BROADCASTING, LLC, MAJOR MARKET RADIO LLC, SILVER STATE BROADCASTING, LLC (Related document(s)#45 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Other Prof. W. LAWRENCE PATRICK, Motion for Relief from Stay.) (HARRIS, STEPHEN) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#77

(#79) Certificate of Service Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of W. LAWRENCE PATRICK (Related document(s)#77 Opposition filed by Other Prof. W. LAWRENCE PATRICK, #78 Request for Judicial Notice filed by Other Prof. W. LAWRENCE PATRICK) (AXELROD, BRETT) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#45

(#80) Opposition Filed by STEPHEN R HARRIS on behalf of GOLDEN STATE BROADCASTING, LLC, MAJOR MARKET RADIO LLC, SILVER STATE BROADCASTING, LLC (Related document(s)#45 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Other Prof. W. LAWRENCE PATRICK, Motion for Relief from Stay.) (HARRIS, STEPHEN) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#10

(#10) BNC Certificate of Notice. (Related document(s)#7 Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing-Ch 11 Non-Individual (BNC)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/21/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#9

(#9) BNC Certificate of Notice (Related document(s)#4 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (BNC)) No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 10/21/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#8

(#8) Order to Set Hearing. Status Hearing to be held on 11/24/2021 at 01:30 PM at Remote. (Related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor SILVER STATE BROADCASTING, LLC.) (arv) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#7

#5

#4

#2

#1

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) Reply Filed by STEPHEN R HARRIS on behalf of GOLDEN STATE BROADCASTING, LLC, MAJOR MARKET RADIO LLC, SILVER STATE BROADCASTING, LLC (Related document(s)#77 Opposition filed by Other Prof. W. LAWRENCE PATRICK.) (HARRIS, STEPHEN) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) Omnibus Reply in support of Motion to Excuse Turnover in Favor of Receiver and to Dismiss/Abstain, or, Alternatively, for Stay Relief and/or Conversion with Certificate of Service Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of W. LAWRENCE PATRICK (Related document(s)#45 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Other Prof. W. LAWRENCE PATRICK, Motion for Relief from Stay.) (AXELROD, BRETT) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) Amended Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by JOHN M NAYLOR on behalf of NAYLOR & BRASTER ATTORNEYS AT LAW PLLC (NAYLOR, JOHN) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) Joinder to Receiver's Opposition to Debtors' Emergency Joint Motion for Order Directing Court Appointed Receiver to Turnover Property Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 543(a) and (b) with Certificate of Service Filed by OGONNA M. BROWN on behalf of VCY AMERICA, INC. (Related document(s)#77 Opposition filed by Other Prof. W. LAWRENCE PATRICK.) (BROWN, OGONNA) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) Request for Special Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by STEVEN B. SCOW on behalf of BELLAIRE TOWER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (SCOW, STEVEN) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) Joinder with Certificate of Service Filed by STEVEN B. SCOW on behalf of BELLAIRE TOWER HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Related document(s)#77 Opposition filed by Other Prof. W. LAWRENCE PATRICK.) (SCOW, STEVEN) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) Declaration Of: Edward R. Stolz Filed by STEPHEN R HARRIS on behalf of GOLDEN STATE BROADCASTING, LLC, MAJOR MARKET RADIO LLC, SILVER STATE BROADCASTING, LLC (Related document(s)#80 Opposition filed by Debtor SILVER STATE BROADCASTING, LLC, Jnt Admin Debtor GOLDEN STATE BROADCASTING, LLC, Jnt Admin Debtor MAJOR MARKET RADIO LLC) (HARRIS, STEPHEN) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) Opposition Filed by STEPHEN R HARRIS on behalf of GOLDEN STATE BROADCASTING, LLC, MAJOR MARKET RADIO LLC, SILVER STATE BROADCASTING, LLC (Related document(s)#45 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Other Prof. W. LAWRENCE PATRICK, Motion for Relief from Stay.) (HARRIS, STEPHEN) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) Certificate of Service Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of W. LAWRENCE PATRICK (Related document(s)#77 Opposition filed by Other Prof. W. LAWRENCE PATRICK, #78 Request for Judicial Notice filed by Other Prof. W. LAWRENCE PATRICK) (AXELROD, BRETT) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Opposition to Debtors Emergency Joint Motion for Order Directing Court Appointed Receiver to Turnover Property Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 543(a) and (b) Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of W. LAWRENCE PATRICK (AXELROD, BRETT) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BNC Certificate of Notice. (Related document(s)#7 Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing-Ch 11 Non-Individual (BNC)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/21/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BNC Certificate of Notice (Related document(s)#4 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (BNC)) No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 10/21/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order to Set Hearing. Status Hearing to be held on 11/24/2021 at 01:30 PM at Remote. (Related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor SILVER STATE BROADCASTING, LLC.) (arv) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing. (hcs) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • Docket(#6) Set Deficient Filing Deadlines. Incomplete Filings due by 11/2/2021. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due by 11/2/2021. Schedule A/B due by 11/2/2021. Schedule D due by 11/2/2021.Schedule E/F due by 11/2/2021. Schedule G due by 11/2/2021. Schedule H due by 11/2/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs due by 11/2/2021. Atty Disclosure Statement due by 11/2/2021. Chapter 11 Current Monthly Income Form 122B Due 11/2/2021. (hcs) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 (NEMECEK, JOHN) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Meeting of Creditors 341 Meeting to be held on 11/18/2021 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic - Chapter 11 LV. Last day to file Proof of Claims 02/16/2022. (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(21-14978) [misc,volp11pb] (1738.00). Receipt number 20402110, fee amount $1738.00.(re: Doc#1) (HARRIS, STEPHEN) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by STEPHEN R HARRIS on behalf of SILVER STATE BROADCASTING, LLC (HARRIS, STEPHEN) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738. Filed by STEPHEN R HARRIS on behalf of SILVER STATE BROADCASTING, LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 02/16/2022. (HARRIS, STEPHEN) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less