This case was last updated from PACER on 04/02/2021 at 06:52:51 (UTC).

Shrungi LLC

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 Shrungi LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Eastern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Brenda T. Rhoades. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-BK-40166

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Brenda T. Rhoades

 

Party Details

Debtor

Shrungi LLC

1333 W. Mcdermott Dr., Suite 150

Allen, TX 75103

Us Trustee

US Trustee

110 N. College Ave., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Joyce W. Lindauer

Attorney at Joyce Lindauer, Attorney

1412 Main Street, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75202

Jeff Carruth

Attorney at Weycer, Kaplan, Pulaski & Zuber, P.C.

3030 Matlock Rd., Suite 201

Arlington, TX 76015

Us Trustee Attorney

John M. Vardeman

Attorney at UST Office

110 N. College St., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) Operating Report for Filing Period February 2021 Filed by Shrungi LLC (Lindauer, Joyce) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

37 #12

Exhibit

37 #11

Exhibit

37 #3

Exhibit

#36

(#36) Affidavit Filed by Shrungi LLC (RE: related document(s)#30 Amended Amended Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To bridgeport hotel property Filed by Shri Ganeshay, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Carruth, Jeff). Related document(s) #28 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Bridgeport Hotel Property filed by Creditor Shri Ganeshay, LLC. Modified on 3/8/2021 (pr). filed by Creditor Shri Ganeshay, LLC). (Carruth, Jeff) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

30 #2

Proposed Order

30 #1

Main Document

28 #2

Proposed Order

28 #1

Main Document

9 #2

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Laurie A. Spindler) Filed by Wise County (Spindler, Laurie) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#6

(#6) Meeting of Creditors - TELEPHONIC INSTRUCTIONS 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/26/2021 at 02:30 PM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. (sd) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#5

(#5) Notice of Missing Documents and Notice that Case May Be Dismissed if Documents are Not Filed. (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Shrungi LLC Missing Documents Due By: 02/16/2021. (slt) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#4

(#4) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/26/2021 at 02:30 PM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 6/1/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/2/2021. (slt) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#8

(#8) Upon consultation with, and through the assistance of the United States Trustee, the Debtor hereby declares its status as a small business debtor pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sect.101(51D) and Fed.R.Bankr.P.1020. Only the Debtor is authorized to file a proposed plan of reorganization on or before 08/2/2021. The Court may shorten these deadlines for cause shown or extend them under the provisions of Sect.1121(e)(3). Under 11 U.S.C. Sect.1121(e) the deadline for the filing of a Chapter 11 plan and disclosure statement in this small business case shall be 11/29/2021. Filed by US Trustee (Vardeman, John) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#3

(#3) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Amount Charged $ 11,738.00 Amount Paid $ 6,750.00 Filed by Shrungi LLC (Lindauer, Joyce) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#2

(#2) List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Shrungi LLC (Lindauer, Joyce) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#1

(#5) Notice of Missing Documents and Notice that Case May Be Dismissed if Documents are Not Filed. (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Shrungi LLC Missing Documents Due By: 02/16/2021. (slt) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketMeeting of Creditors Held & Concluded On 2/26/21 Filed by US Trustee (Vardeman, John) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Hearing Continued (RE: related document(s)#30 Amended Amended Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To bridgeport hotel property Filed by Shri Ganeshay, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Carruth, Jeff). Related document(s) #28 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Bridgeport Hotel Property filed by Creditor Shri Ganeshay, LLC. Modified on 3/8/2021 (pr). filed by Creditor Shri Ganeshay, LLC). Hearing scheduled for 5/4/2021 at 10:00 AM at TELEPHONIC HEARING LOCATION. (ym) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket*PLEASE DISREGARD FILED IN ERROR * Final Hearing Continued (RE: related document(s)#30 Amended Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To bridgeport hotel property Filed by Shri Ganeshay, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Carruth, Jeff). Related document(s) #28 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Bridgeport Hotel Property filed by Creditor Shri Ganeshay, LLC. Modified on 3/8/2021 (pr). filed by Creditor Shri Ganeshay, LLC). 5/4/2021 at 10:00 AM (ym) Modified on 3/29/2021 (ym). (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Operating Report for Filing Period February 2021 Filed by Shrungi LLC (Lindauer, Joyce) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Exhibit and/or Witness List Filed by Shri Ganeshay, LLC (RE: related document(s)#30 Amended Amended Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To bridgeport hotel property Filed by Shri Ganeshay, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Carruth, Jeff). Related document(s) #28 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Bridgeport Hotel Property filed by Creditor Shri Ganeshay, LLC. Modified on 3/8/2021 (pr). filed by Creditor Shri Ganeshay, LLC, #36 Affidavit Filed by Shrungi LLC (RE: related document(s)#30 Amended Amended Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To bridgeport hotel property Filed by Shri Ganeshay, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Carruth, Jeff). Related document(s) #28 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Bridgeport Hotel Property filed by Creditor Shri Ganeshay, LLC. Modified on 3/8/2021 (pr). filed by Creditor Shri Ganeshay, LLC). filed by Debtor Shrungi LLC). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit #4 Exhibit #5 Exhibit #6 Exhibit #7 Exhibit #8 Exhibit #9 Exhibit #10 Exhibit #11 Exhibit #12 Exhibit #13 Exhibit #14 Exhibit #15 Exhibit #16 Exhibit #17 Exhibit) (Carruth, Jeff) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Affidavit Filed by Shrungi LLC (RE: related document(s)#30 Amended Amended Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To bridgeport hotel property Filed by Shri Ganeshay, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Carruth, Jeff). Related document(s) #28 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Bridgeport Hotel Property filed by Creditor Shri Ganeshay, LLC. Modified on 3/8/2021 (pr). filed by Creditor Shri Ganeshay, LLC). (Carruth, Jeff) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Exhibit and/or Witness List Filed by Shrungi LLC (RE: related document(s)#30 Amended Amended Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To bridgeport hotel property Filed by Shri Ganeshay, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Carruth, Jeff). Related document(s) #28 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Bridgeport Hotel Property filed by Creditor Shri Ganeshay, LLC. Modified on 3/8/2021 (pr). filed by Creditor Shri Ganeshay, LLC). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E #6 Exhibit F #7 Exhibit G #8 Exhibit H #9 Exhibit I #10 Exhibit J) (Lindauer, Joyce) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#33 A telephonic preliminary will be held on 3/25/2021 at 01:30 PM to consider and act upon the Amended Amended Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To bridgeport hotel property filed by Creditor Shri Ganeshay, LLC filed as document number #30.). Notice Date 03/21/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) A telephonic preliminary will be held on 3/25/2021 at 01:30 PM to consider and act upon the Amended Amended Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To bridgeport hotel property filed by Creditor Shri Ganeshay, LLC filed as document number #30. (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Objection Filed by Shrungi LLC (RE: related document(s)#30 Amended Amended Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To bridgeport hotel property Filed by Shri Ganeshay, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Carruth, Jeff). Related document(s) #28 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Bridgeport Hotel Property filed by Creditor Shri Ganeshay, LLC. Modified on 3/8/2021 (pr). filed by Creditor Shri Ganeshay, LLC). (Lindauer, Joyce) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Application to Employ Joyce W. Lindauer Attorney, PLLC Filed by Shrungi LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lindauer, Joyce) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Laurie A. Spindler) Filed by Wise County (Spindler, Laurie) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Meeting of Creditors - TELEPHONIC INSTRUCTIONS 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/26/2021 at 02:30 PM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. (sd) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Missing Documents and Notice that Case May Be Dismissed if Documents are Not Filed. (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Shrungi LLC Missing Documents Due By: 02/16/2021. (slt) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/26/2021 at 02:30 PM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 6/1/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/2/2021. (slt) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Upon consultation with, and through the assistance of the United States Trustee, the Debtor hereby declares its status as a small business debtor pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sect.101(51D) and Fed.R.Bankr.P.1020. Only the Debtor is authorized to file a proposed plan of reorganization on or before 08/2/2021. The Court may shorten these deadlines for cause shown or extend them under the provisions of Sect.1121(e)(3). Under 11 U.S.C. Sect.1121(e) the deadline for the filing of a Chapter 11 plan and disclosure statement in this small business case shall be 11/29/2021. Filed by US Trustee (Vardeman, John) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-40166) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11928911, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Amount Charged $ 11,738.00 Amount Paid $ 6,750.00 Filed by Shrungi LLC (Lindauer, Joyce) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Shrungi LLC (Lindauer, Joyce) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Shrungi LLC, Document Due 02/8/2021.(Lindauer, Joyce) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John M. Vardeman