This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 12:39:03 (UTC).

Shawn Jensen, DDS, P.A.

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 Shawn Jensen, DDS, P A was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Kansas Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Dale L. Somers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-BK-10699

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Dale L. Somers

 

Party Details

Debtor

Shawn Jensen, DDS, P.A.

Hutchinson, KS 67502

Trustee

Kent L Adams

Wichita, KS 67205

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

301 North Main Suite 1150

Wichita, KS 67202

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Dan W. Forker, Jr.

129 West 2Nd - Ste. 200, P.O. Box 1868

Hutchinson, KS 67504-1868

Us Trustee Attorneys

Christopher T. Borniger

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

301 N. Main St., Suite 1150

Wichita, KS 67202

Richard A Kear

Attorney at DOJ-Ust

301 N Main St, Suite 1150

Wichita, KS 67202

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/18/2021 at 10:00 AM at Conf Call by US Trustee.Objection to Section 523 Due: 10/18/2021. (waa) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#11

(#11) Order to Debtor in Possession Respecting Report and Payment of Federal Taxes Signed on 7/26/2021 (waa) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#10

(#10) Notice of Objection Deadline. Proposed Hearing to be held 9/1/21 at 10:00 am. Certificate of Service on 7/26/21. Filed by Dan W. Forker Jr. on behalf of Shawn Jensen, DDS, P.A. (RE: related document(s)#8 Application to Employ Dan W. Forker, Jr. as Attorney Filed on behalf of Debtor Shawn Jensen, DDS, P.A., with Certificate of Service.) Objections due by 8/16/2021. (Forker, Dan) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#9

(#9) Affidavit Re: Filed by Debtor Shawn Jensen, DDS, P.A. (RE: related document(s)#8 Application to Employ Dan W. Forker, Jr. as Attorney ). (Forker, Dan) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#8

(#8) Application to Employ Dan W. Forker, Jr. as Attorney Filed on behalf of Debtor Shawn Jensen, DDS, P.A., with Certificate of Service.(Forker, Dan) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

7 #2

Exhibit 1 - Verified Statement of Kent Adams

7 #1

Main Document

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Christopher T. Borniger with Certificate of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee. (Borniger, Christopher) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Richard A Kear with Certificate of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee. (Kear, Richard) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. Amended Filed by Debtor Shawn Jensen, DDS, P.A.. (Forker, Dan) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Small Business, SubChapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Shawn Jensen, DDS, P.A. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 10/25/2021. Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due by 08/2/2021.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 08/25/2021 (Forker, Dan) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/18/2021 at 10:00 AM at Conf Call by US Trustee.Objection to Section 523 Due: 10/18/2021. (waa) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Order to Debtor in Possession Respecting Report and Payment of Federal Taxes Signed on 7/26/2021 (waa) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Objection Deadline. Proposed Hearing to be held 9/1/21 at 10:00 am. Certificate of Service on 7/26/21. Filed by Dan W. Forker Jr. on behalf of Shawn Jensen, DDS, P.A. (RE: related document(s)#8 Application to Employ Dan W. Forker, Jr. as Attorney Filed on behalf of Debtor Shawn Jensen, DDS, P.A., with Certificate of Service.) Objections due by 8/16/2021. (Forker, Dan) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Affidavit Re: Filed by Debtor Shawn Jensen, DDS, P.A. (RE: related document(s)#8 Application to Employ Dan W. Forker, Jr. as Attorney ). (Forker, Dan) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Application to Employ Dan W. Forker, Jr. as Attorney Filed on behalf of Debtor Shawn Jensen, DDS, P.A., with Certificate of Service.(Forker, Dan) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketJudge Dale L. Somers added to case (waa) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appointment of Trustee . Kent L Adams added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Verified Statement of Kent Adams)(Borniger, Christopher) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Christopher T. Borniger with Certificate of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee. (Borniger, Christopher) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Richard A Kear with Certificate of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee. (Kear, Richard) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. Amended Filed by Debtor Shawn Jensen, DDS, P.A.. (Forker, Dan) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by Debtor Shawn Jensen, DDS, P.A. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11, Credit Card)). (Forker, Dan) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Docket(#2) DeBN Request Form: Initial Declination Request for the Debtor Filed by Debtor Shawn Jensen, DDS, P.A.. (Forker, Dan) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketReceipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11, Credit Card)(# 21-10699) [misc,volp11cc] (1738.00). Receipt number A17562248,amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Small Business, SubChapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Shawn Jensen, DDS, P.A. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 10/25/2021. Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due by 08/2/2021.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 08/25/2021 (Forker, Dan) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher T. Borniger(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard A. Kear