This case was last updated from PACER on 09/19/2019 05:08:57

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 case was filed by Shanan L Ashley in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details

  • Case Number 2:19-BK-21066
  • Filing Date 09/18/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Bankruptcy - Chapter 7
  • Jurisdiction U.S. Bankruptcy Courts
  • Judge Neil W. Bason
  • Courthouse California Central Bankruptcy

Party Details

  • US Trustee United States Trustee (LA)
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Debtor Shanan L. Ashley
  • Represented By
    • Steven B Lever
  • Trustee Jason M Rund (TR)
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Shanan...

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amou...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2019
  • (#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Shanan L. Ashley (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)). (Lever, Steven) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
  • 09/18/2019
  • (#2) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Shanan L. Ashley (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)). (Lever, Steven) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
  • 09/18/2019
  • Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/21/2019 at 09:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 12/20/2019. Cert. of Financial Management due by 12/20/2019 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Lever, Steven) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
  • 09/18/2019
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:19-bk-21066) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 49769450. Fee amount 335.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
  • 09/18/2019
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Shanan L. Ashley Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 (Form 108) due 10/18/2019. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 10/2/2019. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 10/2/2019. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 10/2/2019. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 10/2/2019. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 10/2/2019. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 10/2/2019. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 10/2/2019. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 10/2/2019. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 10/2/2019. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 10/2/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 10/2/2019. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 10/2/2019. Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Form 121) due by 10/2/2019. Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 10/2/2019. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 10/2/2019. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 10/2/2019. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 10/2/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 10/2/2019. (Lever, Steven) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.