This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 10/27/2020 at 06:31:20 (UTC).

Seton Medical Center et al v. Alcon Laboratories, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 Seton Medical Center filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Alcon Laboratories, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Ernest M. Robles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-AP-01416

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Ernest M. Robles

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

O'Connor Hospital

2105 Forest Avenue

San Jose, CA 95128

St. Francis Medical Center

3630 East Imperial Highway

Lynwood, CA 90262

Seton Medical Center

1900 Sullivan Avenue

Daly City, CA 94015

Defendant

Alcon Laboratories, Inc.

6201 South Freeway

Fort Worth, TX 76134

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr

Attorney at ASK LLP

2600 Eagan Woods Dr Ste 400

St Paul, MN 55121

Tania M Moyron

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

601 South Figuerora Street, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5704

 

Court Documents

#1

Main Document

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #5

Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet

#2

3 #1

Main Document

3 #2

Order Re: Courtroom Procedures

#3

Scheduling Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued). (Attachments: #1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures #2 Scheduling Order) (Moyron, Tania) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued on Alcon Laboratories, Inc. Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center) Status hearing to be held on 12/22/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01416-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51645191. Fee amount 350.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 2:20-ap-01416. Complaint by Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, O'Connor Hospital against Alcon Laboratories, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alcon Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Seton Medical Center is a litigant