This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 05/30/2023 at 21:14:03 (UTC).

Serta Simmons Bedding LLC et al. et al v. AG Centre Street Partnership et al. et al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 Serta Simmons Bedding LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against AG Centre Street Partnership. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David R Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:23-AP-09001

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

David R Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Serta Simmons Bedding LLC et al.

Credit Suisse Asset Management, LLC

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

AG Centre Street Partnership et al.

Z Capital Credit Partners CO 2019-1 Ltd.

Z Capital Credit Partners CLO 2018-1 Ltd.

Shackleton 2017-XI CLO, Ltd.

Shackleton 2015-VII-R CLO, Ltd.

Shackleton 2014-V-R CLO, Ltd.

Shackleton 2013-IV-R CLO, Ltd.

Shackleton 2013-III CLO, Ltd.

Silver Oak Capital, L.L.C.

North Star Debt Holdings, L.P.

Gamut Capital SSB, LLC

Contrarian Centre Street Partnership, L.P.

Contrarian Distressed Debt Fund, L.P.

Contrarian Capital Fund I, L.P.

Columbia Strategic Income Fund, a series of Columbia Funds Series Trust I

Columbia Floating Rate Income Fund, a series of Columbia Funds Series Trust II

368 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Gabriel Adam Morgan

Samuel Dawson Adkisson

Bruce J Ruzinsky

Defendant Attorney

John F Higgins, IV

Other Attorneys

John James Sparacino

 

Court Documents

#317

(#317) Certificate of Service by Panagiota Manatakis (Filed By Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC ).(Related document(s):#229 Agenda, #234 Exhibit List, Witness List) (Garabato, Sid) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

#316

(#316) Notice of Filing Confirmation Hearing Closing Demonstrative. Filed by c/o Bruce J. Ruzinsk PTL Lender Group (Ruzinsky, Bruce) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#315

(#315) Certificate of Service of Sharna Wilson (Filed By Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC ).(Related document(s):#302 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law) (Garabato, Sid) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#314

(#314) Notice of Filing Confirmation Hearing Closing Demonstrative. Filed by AG Centre Street Partnership, L.P., AG Credit Solutions Non-ECI Master Fund, L.P., AG SF Master (L), L.P., AG Super Fund Master, L.P., Ascribe III Investments, LLC, Columbia Cent CLO 21 Limited, Columbia Cent CLO 27 Limited, Columbia Floating Rate Income Fund, a series of Columbia Funds Series Trust II, Columbia Strategic Income Fund, a series of Columbia Funds Series Trust I, Contrarian Capital Fund I, L.P., Contrarian Centre Street Partnership, L.P., Contrarian Distressed Debt Fund, L.P., Gamut Capital SSB, LLC, North Star Debt Holdings, L.P., Shackleton 2013-III CLO, Ltd., Shackleton 2013-IV-R CLO, Ltd., Shackleton 2014-V-R CLO, Ltd., Shackleton 2015-VII-R CLO, Ltd., Shackleton 2017-XI CLO, Ltd., Silver Oak Capital, L.L.C., Z Capital Credit Partners CLO 2018-1 Ltd., Z Capital Credit Partners CO 2019-1 Ltd. (Higgins, John) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#313

(#313) Order Granting Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Excluded Lenders to File Under Seal Portions of their Post Trial Memorandum of Law (Related Doc #301) Signed on 5/25/2023. (VrianaPortillo) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#302

(#315) Certificate of Service of Sharna Wilson (Filed By Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC ).(Related document(s):#302 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law) (Garabato, Sid) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

301 #1

Main Document

#234

(#317) Certificate of Service by Panagiota Manatakis (Filed By Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC ).(Related document(s):#229 Agenda, #234 Exhibit List, Witness List) (Garabato, Sid) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

#229

(#317) Certificate of Service by Panagiota Manatakis (Filed By Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC ).(Related document(s):#229 Agenda, #234 Exhibit List, Witness List) (Garabato, Sid) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

#5

(#5) Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Michael P. Goodyear. Filed by Serta Simmons Bedding LLC et al. (Morgan, Gabriel) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#4

(#4) Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Luna Ngan Barrington. Filed by Serta Simmons Bedding LLC et al. (Morgan, Gabriel) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#3

(#3) Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Joseph R. Rausch. Filed by Serta Simmons Bedding LLC et al. (Morgan, Gabriel) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#2

(#2) Motion to Appear pro hac vice of David J. Lender. Filed by Serta Simmons Bedding LLC et al. (Morgan, Gabriel) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

1 #5

Adversary Proceeding Coversheet

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

#1

Main Document

1,008 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#317) Certificate of Service by Panagiota Manatakis (Filed By Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC ).(Related document(s):#229 Agenda, #234 Exhibit List, Witness List) (Garabato, Sid) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#316) Notice of Filing Confirmation Hearing Closing Demonstrative. Filed by c/o Bruce J. Ruzinsk PTL Lender Group (Ruzinsky, Bruce) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#315) Certificate of Service of Sharna Wilson (Filed By Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC ).(Related document(s):#302 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law) (Garabato, Sid) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#314) Notice of Filing Confirmation Hearing Closing Demonstrative. Filed by AG Centre Street Partnership, L.P., AG Credit Solutions Non-ECI Master Fund, L.P., AG SF Master (L), L.P., AG Super Fund Master, L.P., Ascribe III Investments, LLC, Columbia Cent CLO 21 Limited, Columbia Cent CLO 27 Limited, Columbia Floating Rate Income Fund, a series of Columbia Funds Series Trust II, Columbia Strategic Income Fund, a series of Columbia Funds Series Trust I, Contrarian Capital Fund I, L.P., Contrarian Centre Street Partnership, L.P., Contrarian Distressed Debt Fund, L.P., Gamut Capital SSB, LLC, North Star Debt Holdings, L.P., Shackleton 2013-III CLO, Ltd., Shackleton 2013-IV-R CLO, Ltd., Shackleton 2014-V-R CLO, Ltd., Shackleton 2015-VII-R CLO, Ltd., Shackleton 2017-XI CLO, Ltd., Silver Oak Capital, L.L.C., Z Capital Credit Partners CLO 2018-1 Ltd., Z Capital Credit Partners CO 2019-1 Ltd. (Higgins, John) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#313) Order Granting Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Excluded Lenders to File Under Seal Portions of their Post Trial Memorandum of Law (Related Doc #301) Signed on 5/25/2023. (VrianaPortillo) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#312) Order Granting Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Excluded Lenders to File Under Seal Portions of their Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Related Doc #298) Signed on 5/25/2023. (VrianaPortillo) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#311) Order Authorizing LCM Defendants to File Post-Trial Brief and Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Under Seal (Related Doc #295) Signed on 5/25/2023. (VrianaPortillo) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#310) Notice of Filing Confirmation Hearing Closing Demonstrative. Filed by Serta Simmons Bedding LLC et al. (Morgan, Gabriel) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#309) Amended Agenda for Hearing on 5/25/2023 (Filed By Serta Simmons Bedding LLC et al. ). (Morgan, Gabriel) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#308) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#290 Generic Order) No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 05/24/2023. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
307 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion to Appear pro hac vice Orin Snyder. Filed by Interested Party Invesco Senior Secured Management, Inc. and Credit Suisse Asset Management, LLC (Argeroplos, Victoria) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketJudge David R Jones added to case. (RobbieWestmoreland) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Taylor Dougherty. Filed by Plaintiff Serta Simmons Bedding LLC et al. (Morgan, Gabriel) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Richard Gage. Filed by Serta Simmons Bedding LLC et al. (Morgan, Gabriel) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Nicholas J. Reade. Filed by Plaintiff Serta Simmons Bedding LLC et al. (Morgan, Gabriel) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Michael P. Goodyear. Filed by Serta Simmons Bedding LLC et al. (Morgan, Gabriel) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Luna Ngan Barrington. Filed by Serta Simmons Bedding LLC et al. (Morgan, Gabriel) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Joseph R. Rausch. Filed by Serta Simmons Bedding LLC et al. (Morgan, Gabriel) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion to Appear pro hac vice of David J. Lender. Filed by Serta Simmons Bedding LLC et al. (Morgan, Gabriel) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 23-09001. Nature of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)) Complaint by Serta Simmons Bedding LLC et al. against AG Centre Street Partnership et al.. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 #2 Exhibit 2 #3 Exhibit 3 #4 Adversary Proceeding Coversheet) (Morgan, Gabriel) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less