This case was last updated from PACER on 10/30/2021 at 06:30:49 (UTC).

Sequential Brands Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 Sequential Brands Group, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is John T. Dorsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-BK-11194

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

John T. Dorsey

 

Party Details

Debtor

Sequential Brands Group, Inc.

1407 Broadway, 38Th Floor

New York, NY 10018

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building

844 King Street, SUIT 2207

Not Classified By Court

Reliable Companies

1007 North Orange Street, Suite 110

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC

222 N. Pacific Coast Highway, Suite 300

El Segundo, CA 90245

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Robert J. Dehney

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell

1201 N. Market Street, P O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899-1347

Ashtyn D. Hemendinger

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Laura Davis Jones

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP

919 N. Market Street, 17Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Matthew K. Kelsey

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Monica K. Loseman

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1801 California Street, Suite 4200

Denver, CO 80202

Mary Beth Maloney

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-0193

Joshua K. Brody

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Timothy P. Cairns

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Young & Jones LLP

919 N. Market Street, 17Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jason Zachary Goldstein

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Scott J Greenberg

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Stephen D. Silverman

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Us Trustee Attorney

Richard L. Schepacarter

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

844 King Street, Suite 2207, Lockbox #35

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

265 #8

Exhibit 4 - Proposed Sale Order re With You, Inc.

265 #7

Exhibit 3 - Proposed Sale Order re With You, Inc.

265 #5

Exhibit 2A - Redline comparison of Proposed Sale Order re Centric Brands, LLC

173 #1

Main Document

#139

(#265) Notice of Service /Notice of Filing of Proposed Sale Orders in Connection with the Sale of Substantially All of the Debtors' Assets (related document(s)#19, #135, #138, #139, #173) Filed by Sequential Brands Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Sale Order re Gainline Galaxy Holdings LLC #2 Exhibit 1A - Redline comparison of Proposed Sale Order re Gainline Galaxy Holdings LLC #3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Sale Order re Centric Brands, LLC #4 Exhibit 2A - Redline comparison of Proposed Sale Order re Centric Brands, LLC #5 Exhibit 2B - Redline comparison of APA re Centric Brands, LLC #6 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Sale Order re With You, Inc. #7 Exhibit 4 - Proposed Sale Order re With You, Inc.) (Cairns, Timothy) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

138 #6

Exhibit 5

138 #2

Exhibit 1

135 #5

Exhibit B-2 - Blackline of Bidding Procedures Order

19 #2

Exhibit A - Order

5 #4

Exhibit C

5 #3

Exhibit B

5 #2

Exhibit A

4 #1

Main Document

3 #2

Exhibit A - Org Chart

3 #1

Main Document

#2

Exhibit A

2 #1

Main Document

#1

Main Document

490 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#265) Notice of Service /Notice of Filing of Proposed Sale Orders in Connection with the Sale of Substantially All of the Debtors' Assets (related document(s)#19, #135, #138, #139, #173) Filed by Sequential Brands Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Sale Order re Gainline Galaxy Holdings LLC #2 Exhibit 1A - Redline comparison of Proposed Sale Order re Gainline Galaxy Holdings LLC #3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Sale Order re Centric Brands, LLC #4 Exhibit 2A - Redline comparison of Proposed Sale Order re Centric Brands, LLC #5 Exhibit 2B - Redline comparison of APA re Centric Brands, LLC #6 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Sale Order re With You, Inc. #7 Exhibit 4 - Proposed Sale Order re With You, Inc.) (Cairns, Timothy) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#264) Certificate of Service re: 1) Order Authorizing and Approving Stalking Horse Designation; and 2) Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 26, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. (Prevailing Eastern Time) Before the Honorable John T. Dorsey (related document(s)#256, #257) Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#263) Claims Register Alphabetical and Numerical Order. Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Attachments: #1 Numerical) (Kass, Albert) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#262) Notice of Service /Notice of Selection of Successful Bidders and Cancellation of Auction [Hearing Date: November 4, 2021 at 10:00 A.M.] (related document(s)#19, #138) Filed by Sequential Brands Group, Inc.. (Cairns, Timothy) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#261) Certificate of Service re: 1) Notice of Deadlines for the Filing of (I) Proofs of Claim, Including Requests for Payment Pursuant to Section 503(B)(9) of the Bankruptcy Code, (II) Administrative Claims, and (III) Rejection Damages Claims; and 2) Proof of Claim Form Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#260) Notice of Service /Notice of Adjournment of Auction (related document(s)#19, #138) Filed by Sequential Brands Group, Inc.. (Cairns, Timothy) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#259) Certificate of Service re: Declaration in Support of Employment of Locke Lord LLP as Professional Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business (related document(s)#246) Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#258) Certificate of Service re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 26, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. (Prevailing Eastern Time) Before the Honorable John T. Dorsey (related document(s)#245) Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#257) Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Sequential Brands Group, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Cairns, Timothy) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#256) Order Authorizing and Approving Stalking Horse Designation (William Rast) (related document(s)#19, #138, #223) Order Signed on 10/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (LJH) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
256 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion to Maintain Bank Accounts Motion of Debtors for Interim and Final Orders (A) Authorizing Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System, Including Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts, Checks, and Business Forms; (B) Authorizing Continuation of Existing Deposit Practices; (C) Waiving Certain U.S. Trustee Guidelines; (D) Authorizing Continuation of Intercompany Transactions; (E) Granting Priority Status to Postpetition Intercompany Claims; (F) Authorizing the Debtors to Open and Close Bank Accounts; and (G) Granting Related Relief Filed By Sequential Brands Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C)(Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docket(#7) The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber Reliable Companies. Telephone number 3026548080.. (Reliable Companies) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docket(#6) Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-11194) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A10474580, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Application to Appoint Claims/Noticing Agent KURTZMAN CARSON CONSULTANTS, LLC Filed By Sequential Brands Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C)(Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) File a Consolidated List of Creditors in Lieu of Submitting a Separate Mailing Matrix for Each Debtor, (B) File a Consolidated List of the Debtors' Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors, and (C) Redact Certain Personally Identifiable Information for Individual Creditors and Interest Holders, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed By Sequential Brands Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Affidavit/Declaration in Support of First Day Motion Declaration of Lorraine DiSanto in Support of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Petitions and Requests for First Day Relief Filed By Sequential Brands Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Org Chart #2 Exhibit B - RSA)(Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Joint Administration Debtors' Motion Seeking Entry of an Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Their Related Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed By Sequential Brands Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketFiled by U.S. Trustee. (Schepacarter, Richard) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketJudge John T. Dorsey added to case (LB) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Sequential Brands Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Creditor Matrix) (Jones, Laura Davis) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEQUENTIAL BRANDS GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent is a litigant

Latest cases where Reliable Companies is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant