This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 10/17/2021 at 06:30:37 (UTC).

Semoran Pines Phase II Condominium Association, In

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 Semoran Pines Phase II Condominium Association, In was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Middle Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen S. Jennemann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-BK-03745

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Karen S. Jennemann

 

Party Details

Debtors

Semoran Pines Phase II Condominium Association, In

Semoran Pines Phase II Condominium Association, Inc.

Post Office Box 770491

Orlando, FL 32822

Us Trustee

United States Trustee - ORL

George C Young Federal Building

400 West Washington Street, SU 1100

Trustee

L. Todd Budgen

Longwood, FL 32752

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Brian Michael Mark

Attorney at Brian Michael Mark, P.A.

111 E. Monument Avenue, Suite 510

Kissimmee, FL 34741

Us Trustee Attorney

Audrey M Aleskovsky

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

George C. Young Federal Building

400 West Washington St, SU 1100

 

Court Documents

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Motion to Reject Residential Lease with Purchase Option with Jazmin Santiago Filed by Brian Michael Mark on behalf of Debtor Semoran Pines Phase II Condominium Association, Inc. (related document(s)#27). Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2021 at 10:15 AM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. (Mark, Brian) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Motion to Reject Residential Lease with Purchase Option with Jazmin Santiago Filed by Brian Michael Mark on behalf of Debtor Semoran Pines Phase II Condominium Association, Inc. (Mark, Brian) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Pre-Status Conference Report Filed by Brian Michael Mark on behalf of Debtor Semoran Pines Phase II Condominium Association, Inc.. (Mark, Brian) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Certificate of Service Re: Amendments to Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Brian Michael Mark on behalf of Debtor Semoran Pines Phase II Condominium Association, Inc. (related document(s)#24). (Mark, Brian) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Amended Schedule A/B,Schedule G, Amended Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required., Amended Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Brian Michael Mark on behalf of Debtor Semoran Pines Phase II Condominium Association, Inc. (related document(s)#12). (Mark, Brian) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #22)). Notice Date 09/29/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Motion for Authority to Maintain Pre-Petition Bank Accounts Filed by Brian Michael Mark on behalf of Debtor Semoran Pines Phase II Condominium Association, Inc. (related document(s)#16). Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2021 at 10:15 AM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. (Mark, Brian) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing Scheduled for 10/21/2021 10:15 AM Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Motion for Authority to Maintain Pre-Petition Bank Accounts Doc #16. This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions: Brian Michael Mark is directed to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, the preparation, filing and service must be done immediately. Failure to comply with the noticing instructions will result in cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. Telephonic Appearance Requirement: Effective March 16, 2020, and continuing until further notice, Judges in all Divisions will conduct all preliminary and non-evidentiary hearings by telephone. For Judges Colton and Williamson, parties should arrange a telephonic appearance through Court Solutions (www.court-solutions.com). For Judges Delano, Funk, and McEwen, parties should arrange a telephonic appearance through Court Call (866-582-6878). Beginning Wednesday, September 1, 2021, for Judges Jennemann and Vaughan, parties should arrange a telephonic appearance through Court Solutions (www.court-solutions.com) by 5:00 p.m. the business day preceding the hearing. NOTE: All parties should proceed to the website and select 'Sign Up'. For unrepresented parties only, before submitting the completed form, you must select 'I am not an attorney' and 'Certified Indigent'. Once the information is submitted you will receive an email with further instructions. Should the Court decide to hold this hearing by Zoom, the Court will enter a subsequent Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearing. For hearings held by Zoom, parties should arrange to attend via Zoom only. Parties that wish to listen only, who do not anticipate active participation, or who lack technology to participate by video may participate telephonically only. (related document(s)#16). (Dkt) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketThe United States Trustee states that the initial meeting of creditors was held and concluded on 09/20/2021. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Aleskovsky, Audrey) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest (related document(s) (Related Doc #5)). Notice Date 08/22/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc #4)). Notice Date 08/22/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Deficient Filing. Summary of Assets, Schedules A,B, D-H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation, List of 20 Largest Creditors, Case Management Summary, Balance Sheet . (Ahyen) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/20/2021 at 10:00 AM. U.S. Trustee (Orl) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 877-801-2055. Passcode: 8940738#. Proofs of Claims due by 10/27/2021. (Ahyen) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11, Subchapter V Trustee L. Todd Budgen. L. Todd Budgen added to the case. Meeting of Creditors scheduled for 09/20/2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Room Telephonic Conference Line: 877-801-2055 Participant Passcode: 8940738#.. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement) (Aleskovsky, Audrey) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketAssignment of the Honorable Karen S. Jennemann, Bankruptcy Judge to this case . (autojtr-orl, orl) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Brian Michael Mark on behalf of Debtor Semoran Pines Phase II Condominium Association, Inc.. (Ahyen) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDebtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at #http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(6:21-bk-03745) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number 68067824, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) *Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Fee Paid.). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due 11/16/2021, Filed by Brian Michael Mark on behalf of Semoran Pines Phase II Condominium Association, Inc.. (Mark, Brian) Modified on 8/26/2021 (Kathy). (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Audrey M Aleskovsky