This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2019 at 05:17:13 (UTC).

Sean Roy Slaby

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 Sean Roy Slaby was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin R. Barash. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:19-BK-11245

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Martin R. Barash

 

Party Details

Debtor

Sean Roy Slaby

Simi Valley, CA 93063

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (ND)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Sandra McBeth (TR)

Atascdero, CA 93422

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/19/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 148, 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. Objections for Discharge due by 10/18/2019. Cert. of Financial Management due by 10/18/2019 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Rust, Kam) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

1 #2

Case Com Def Notice

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • Receipt of Chapter 7 Filing Fee - $335.00 by 00. Receipt Number 90026324. (admin) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Sean Roy Slaby . (Rust, Kam) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/19/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 148, 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. Objections for Discharge due by 10/18/2019. Cert. of Financial Management due by 10/18/2019 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Rust, Kam) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Sean Roy Slaby Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 8/2/2019. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 8/2/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 8/2/2019. (Rust, Kam) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.