This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 05/15/2022 at 06:32:15 (UTC).

Schertz Aerial Service, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 Schertz Aerial Service, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Illinois Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary P. Gorman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-BK-70128

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Mary P. Gorman

 

Party Details

Debtor

Schertz Aerial Service, Inc.

P.O.Box 377

Hudson, IL 61848

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

401 Main St Ste 1100

Peoria, IL 61602

Trustee

Steven Wallace

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Robert E Eggmann

Attorney at Carmody MacDonald P.C.

120 South Central Avenue, Suite 1800

Clayton, MO 63105

Dormie Yu Heng Ko

Attorney at Carmody MacDonald P.C.

120 S. Central Ave., Ste 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

Thomas H Riske

Attorney at Carmody MacDonald, P.C.

120 South Central Avenue, Suite 1800

St Louis, MO 63105

Us Trustee Attorneys

James Anthony Salinas

Attorney at Office of United States Trustee

401 Main St., Suite 1100

Peoria, IL 61602

Mark D Skaggs

401 Main St. #1100

Peoria, IL 61602

U.S. Trustee

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Trustee

401 Main St Ste 1100

Peoria, IL 61602

Trustee Attorney

Steven M. Wallace

Attorney at Goldenberg Heller & Antognoli, P.C.

2227 South State Route 157

Edwardsville, IL 62025

 

Court Documents

#153

(#153) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related document(s)#150 Order Setting Hearing) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/13/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#152

(#152) Order Re: (RE: related document(s)#12 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Schertz Aerial Service, Inc.). (court, emcc) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#151

(#151) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related document(s)#131 Order (Generic)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/11/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#150

(#150) Order re: (RE: related document(s)#12 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Schertz Aerial Service, Inc., #32 Motion to Pay filed by Debtor Schertz Aerial Service, Inc.). Hearing to be held on 5/24/2022 at 01:30 PM Video Conference-Springfield,IL-MPG for #12 and for #32, (court, emcc) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#148

(#148) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/11/2022 9:00:15 AM ]. File Size [ 67326 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:28:03 ]. (Attorney: Thomas Riske-debtors attorney/Steven Wallace-Subchapter V Trustee/Anthony Salinas-United States Trustee/Jeffrey Richarson-Compeer Financial). (admin). (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#147

(#147) Attachment or Exhibits Exhibit L Filed by Jeffrey D Richardson on behalf of Compeer Financial, PCA f/k/a 1st Farm Credit Services, PCA (RE: related document(s)#12 Motion to Use Cash Collateral ). (Richardson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#146

(#146) Attachment or Exhibits Exhibit K Filed by Jeffrey D Richardson on behalf of Compeer Financial, PCA f/k/a 1st Farm Credit Services, PCA (RE: related document(s)#12 Motion to Use Cash Collateral ). (Richardson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#145

(#145) Attachment or Exhibits Exhibit J Filed by Jeffrey D Richardson on behalf of Compeer Financial, PCA f/k/a 1st Farm Credit Services, PCA (RE: related document(s)#12 Motion to Use Cash Collateral ). (Richardson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#131

(#151) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related document(s)#131 Order (Generic)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/11/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#32

(#149) Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#12 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Schertz Aerial Service, Inc., #32 Motion to Pay filed by Debtor Schertz Aerial Service, Inc.) Hearing held deadline set: 5/25/2022. (court, emcc) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

12 #2

Exhibit

12 #1

Main Document

#9

(#9) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/27/2022 at 01:30 PM at Telephonically with Chapter 11 Trustee (Conference Line: 1-877-988-4958, Participant Code: 7219234). Proofs of Claims due by 5/25/2022. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts: 6/26/2022. (court, emcc) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#8

(#8) Correspondence Filed by James Anthony Salinas of Office of United States Trustee on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Salinas, James) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#7

(#7) Order Setting Chapter 11 Subchapter V Status Conference Hearing; Parties participating in this hearing are directed to call 1-877-336-1829 five minutes prior to the hearing time. Use Access Code 8878507. Multiple hearings may be set at the same time. Please remain on the line until your hearing(s) are concluded. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Schertz Aerial Service, Inc.). Hearing to be held on 5/3/2022 at 09:30 AM Telephone Conference-Springfield,IL-MPG for #1, (court, emcc) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#6

(#6) Ch 11 Subchapter V Trustee's Verified Statement and Acceptance of Appointment. (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#2

(#2) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Robert E Eggmann on behalf of Schertz Aerial Service, Inc.. (Eggmann, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#1

(#7) Order Setting Chapter 11 Subchapter V Status Conference Hearing; Parties participating in this hearing are directed to call 1-877-336-1829 five minutes prior to the hearing time. Use Access Code 8878507. Multiple hearings may be set at the same time. Please remain on the line until your hearing(s) are concluded. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Schertz Aerial Service, Inc.). Hearing to be held on 5/3/2022 at 09:30 AM Telephone Conference-Springfield,IL-MPG for #1, (court, emcc) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

155 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#153) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related document(s)#150 Order Setting Hearing) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/13/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#152) Order Re: (RE: related document(s)#12 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Schertz Aerial Service, Inc.). (court, emcc) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#151) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: related document(s)#131 Order (Generic)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/11/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#150) Order re: (RE: related document(s)#12 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Schertz Aerial Service, Inc., #32 Motion to Pay filed by Debtor Schertz Aerial Service, Inc.). Hearing to be held on 5/24/2022 at 01:30 PM Video Conference-Springfield,IL-MPG for #12 and for #32, (court, emcc) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#149) Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#12 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Schertz Aerial Service, Inc., #32 Motion to Pay filed by Debtor Schertz Aerial Service, Inc.) Hearing held deadline set: 5/25/2022. (court, emcc) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#148) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/11/2022 9:00:15 AM ]. File Size [ 67326 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:28:03 ]. (Attorney: Thomas Riske-debtors attorney/Steven Wallace-Subchapter V Trustee/Anthony Salinas-United States Trustee/Jeffrey Richarson-Compeer Financial). (admin). (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#147) Attachment or Exhibits Exhibit L Filed by Jeffrey D Richardson on behalf of Compeer Financial, PCA f/k/a 1st Farm Credit Services, PCA (RE: related document(s)#12 Motion to Use Cash Collateral ). (Richardson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#146) Attachment or Exhibits Exhibit K Filed by Jeffrey D Richardson on behalf of Compeer Financial, PCA f/k/a 1st Farm Credit Services, PCA (RE: related document(s)#12 Motion to Use Cash Collateral ). (Richardson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#145) Attachment or Exhibits Exhibit J Filed by Jeffrey D Richardson on behalf of Compeer Financial, PCA f/k/a 1st Farm Credit Services, PCA (RE: related document(s)#12 Motion to Use Cash Collateral ). (Richardson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#144) Attachment or Exhibits Exhibit I Filed by Jeffrey D Richardson on behalf of Compeer Financial, PCA f/k/a 1st Farm Credit Services, PCA (RE: related document(s)#12 Motion to Use Cash Collateral ). (Richardson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
135 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/27/2022 at 01:30 PM at Telephonically with Chapter 11 Trustee (Conference Line: 1-877-988-4958, Participant Code: 7219234). Proofs of Claims due by 5/25/2022. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts: 6/26/2022. (court, emcc) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Correspondence Filed by James Anthony Salinas of Office of United States Trustee on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Salinas, James) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order Setting Chapter 11 Subchapter V Status Conference Hearing; Parties participating in this hearing are directed to call 1-877-336-1829 five minutes prior to the hearing time. Use Access Code 8878507. Multiple hearings may be set at the same time. Please remain on the line until your hearing(s) are concluded. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Schertz Aerial Service, Inc.). Hearing to be held on 5/3/2022 at 09:30 AM Telephone Conference-Springfield,IL-MPG for #1, (court, emcc) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Ch 11 Subchapter V Trustee's Verified Statement and Acceptance of Appointment. (Wallace, Steven) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appointment of Trustee Steven Wallace. Steven Wallace added to the case. (U.S. Trustee) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Mark D Skaggs on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Skaggs, Mark) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Thomas H Riske of Carmody MacDonald, P.C. on behalf of Schertz Aerial Service, Inc.. (Riske, Thomas) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 22-70128) [misc,volp11cc] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A12930214. Fee amount 1738.00 (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Robert E Eggmann on behalf of Schertz Aerial Service, Inc.. (Eggmann, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Schertz Aerial Service, Inc. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 06/14/2022. (Eggmann, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven M. Wallace