This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2021 at 05:07:34 (UTC).

Saharnaz Karimiha

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 Saharnaz Karimiha was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Victoria S. Kaufman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-BK-11696

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

Judge Details

Judge

Victoria S. Kaufman

 

Party Details

Debtor

Saharnaz Karimiha

Northridge, CA 91325

Trustee

Nancy J Zamora (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SV)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/19/2021 at 09:30 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) Cert. of Financial Management due by 1/18/2022. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 1/18/2022. (Remy, Johanne) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#4

(#4) Application to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by Debtor Saharnaz Karimiha (Kinsley, Terri) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#3

(#3) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Saharnaz Karimiha . (Kinsley, Terri) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

1 #2

Case Com Def Notice

#1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/19/2021 at 09:30 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) Cert. of Financial Management due by 1/18/2022. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 1/18/2022. (Remy, Johanne) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Application to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by Debtor Saharnaz Karimiha (Kinsley, Terri) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Saharnaz Karimiha . (Kinsley, Terri) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Docket(#2) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Saharnaz Karimiha . (Kinsley, Terri) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Saharnaz Karimiha Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 10/29/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 10/29/2021. (Kinsley, Terri) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant