This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 07/25/2020 at 09:06:28 (UTC).

Royal Transport Express, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 Royal Transport Express, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Eastern Bankruptcy . The Judge overseeing this case is Brenda T. Rhoades. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-BK-41227

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Brenda T. Rhoades

 

Party Details

Debtor

Royal Transport Express, LLC

429 Royal Oak

Murphy, TX 75094

Trustee

Henry Thomas Moran (SBRA V)

Oklahoma City, OK 73116

Us Trustee

US Trustee

110 N. College Ave., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Eric A. Liepins

12770 Coit Road, Suite 1100

Dallas, TX 75251

Us Trustee Attorneys

Marcus Salitore

Attorney at US Trustee Office

110 N. College Ave., Room 300

Tyler, TX 75702

Timothy W. O'Neal

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Trustee

110 N. College Ave., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#45

#41

36 #4

Service List

36 #3

Proposed Order

36 #2

Stipulation

36 #1

Main Document

33 #3

Exhibits

33 #2

creditor matrix

33 #1

Main Document

7 #2

Notice of Ch11 Mtg C/P SubCh V

6 #2

Exhibit Statement of Disinterestedness

6 #1

Main Document

5 #3

Service List

5 #2

Proposed Order

5 #1

Main Document

#2

Claim projections

2 #1

Main Document

#1

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Order Granting Motion for Approval of Rule 4001 Stipulation (RE: related document(s)#36 Motion For Approval Of Rule 4001 Agreement with Simmons Bank, Filed by Simmons Bank (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation # 2 Proposed Order # 3 Service List) filed by Creditor Simmons Bank). (pr) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#41 Order Dismissing Pleading Without Prejudice (RE: related document(s)#33 Amended Motion for approval and entry of adequate protection stipulation Filed by BMO Harris Bank (RE: related document(s)#30 Agreed Motion for approval and entry of adequate protection stipulation filed by Creditor BMO Harris Bank). (Attachments: # 1 creditor matrix # 2 Exhibits # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Creditor BMO Harris Bank). (pr)). Notice Date 07/23/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#40 Order Granting Motion for Approval of Rule 4001 Stipulation (RE: related document(s)#35 Motion For Approval Of Rule 4001 Agreement with Engs Commercial Finance Co., Filed by Engs Commercial Finance Co. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Creditor Engs Commercial Finance Co.). (pr)). Notice Date 07/22/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Agreed Order or Judgment Submitted Prior to Hearing RE: #42 Approval of Agreement (Rule 4001) UPLOADED 2020-07-21 12:54 (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Motion For Approval Of Rule 4001 Agreement with BMO Harris Bank N.A., Filed by BMO Harris Bank (Attachments: #1 Creditor Matrix #2 Exhibits #3 Proposed Order) (Dadabhoy, Ammar) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Order Dismissing Pleading Without Prejudice (RE: related document(s)#33 Amended Motion for approval and entry of adequate protection stipulation Filed by BMO Harris Bank (RE: related document(s)#30 Agreed Motion for approval and entry of adequate protection stipulation filed by Creditor BMO Harris Bank). (Attachments: # 1 creditor matrix # 2 Exhibits # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Creditor BMO Harris Bank). (pr) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Order Granting Motion for Approval of Rule 4001 Stipulation (RE: related document(s)#35 Motion For Approval Of Rule 4001 Agreement with Engs Commercial Finance Co., Filed by Engs Commercial Finance Co. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Creditor Engs Commercial Finance Co.). (pr) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketChapter 11 Confirmation Hearing (RE: related document(s)#37 Amended Chapter 11 Small Business SubChapter V Plan Filed by Royal Transport Express, LLC (RE: related document(s)#2 Chapter 11 Small Business SubChapter V Plan Filed by Royal Transport Express, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Royal Transport Express, LLC, Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/24/2020.Document Due 06/2/2020. filed by Debtor Royal Transport Express, LLC). (Attachments: # 1 Claim projections) filed by Debtor Royal Transport Express, LLC). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit projections) filed by Debtor Royal Transport Express, LLC). Confirmation hearing to be held on 7/30/2020 at 09:30 AM at TELEPHONIC HEARING LOCATION. (sr) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Agreed Order or Judgment Submitted Prior to Hearing RE: #39 Approval of Agreement (Rule 4001) UPLOADED 2020-07-16 11:02 (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Agreed Motion For Approval Of Rule 4001 Agreement with Transportation Alliance Bank, Inc. d/b/a TAB Bank, Filed by TAB Bank (Gottlieb, Aaron) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020 (pr). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#5 Motion to Extend* Automatic Stay by Small Business Debtor As To Filed by Royal Transport Express, LLC filed by Debtor Royal Transport Express, LLC). Hearing scheduled to be held telephonically on June 16, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Please dial 1-888-675-2535, and use Access No. 4225607 and Security Code No 3620, to attend the hearing. (A) Parties may submit exhibits by attaching the proposed exhibits to that partys witness and exhibit list. The proposed exhibits shall be marked in accordance with the Courts Local Bankruptcy Rules as if they were being offered at an in-person hearing.(B) Parties may present direct witness testimony by affidavit or declaration under penalty of perjury. Such affidavit or declaration shall be attached to, and filed with, the witness and exhibit list. If there are no objections to the testimony, the party may proffer the testimony at the hearing. If there is an objection and an opposing party wishes to cross-examine the witness, (i) the party seeking cross-examination shall notify the party offering the witness and any other party-in-interest at least one day prior to the scheduled hearing, and (ii) the witness must be made available for cross-examination at the hearing. (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Laurie A. Spindler) Filed by City of Wylie (Spindler, Laurie) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Meeting of Creditors: 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/2/2020 at 10:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. (lc) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice To Trustee Thomas Moran Of Selection And Appointment With Trustee's Acceptance. Filed by US Trustee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Disinterestedness)(Salitore, Marcus) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to Extend* Automatic Stay by Small Business Debtor As To Filed by Royal Transport Express, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Service List) (Liepins, Eric) Modified on 5/29/2020 (mb). (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; (3) the attorney will forward the originally signed declaration to the Court upon receipt; and (4) the attorney has advised the debtor that any failure to file with the court the originally signed declaration could result in the dismissal of the case. Filed by Royal Transport Express, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Royal Transport Express, LLC, Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/24/2020.Document Due 06/2/2020. filed by Debtor Royal Transport Express, LLC). (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docket(#3) Application to Employ Eric Liepins Filed by Royal Transport Express, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Service List) (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Chapter 11 Small Business SubChapter V Plan Filed by Royal Transport Express, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Royal Transport Express, LLC, Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/24/2020.Document Due 06/2/2020. filed by Debtor Royal Transport Express, LLC). (Attachments: #1 Claim projections)(Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 20-41227) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11610354, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Royal Transport Express, LLC, Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/24/2020.Document Due 06/2/2020.(Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcus Salitore

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy W. O'Neal