This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 02/04/2022 at 05:15:14 (UTC).

Rowley, Jr. v. Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency

Case Summary

On 02/03/2022 Rowley, Jr filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin R. Barash. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:22-AP-01007

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Martin R. Barash

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dennis Robert Rowley, Jr.

Arroyo Grande, CA 93420

Defendant

Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency

1200 North Seventh Street

Harrisburg, PA 17102

Trustee

Jerry Namba (TR)

Santa Maria, CA 93454

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (ND)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua Cohen

Attorney at Cohen Consumer Loaw

Pob 1040

St Albans, VT 05478

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Adversary case 9:22-ap-01007. Complaint by Dennis Robert Rowley Jr. against Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. ($350.00 Fee Not Required). Nature of Suit: (63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)) (Cohen, Joshua) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

2 #1

Main Document

#2

AP-Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued on Plaintiff, service to be made upon Defendant Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency Date Issued 2/3/2022, Answer Due 3/7/2022 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dennis Robert Rowley) Status hearing to be held on 4/14/2022 at 02:30 PM at Crtrm 201, 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. The case judge is Martin R. Barash. Due to the COVID-19 public health emergency, the courtroom will be closed to the public and the hearing will be held via ZoomGov, which provides both audio and video access. All parties and members of the public may connect to the hearing free of charge. ZoomGov connection information for this hearing will be posted on the Court's public calendar for Judge Barash, accessible on the court's website: http://ecf-ciao.cacb.uscourts.gov/CiaoPosted/default.aspx (Handy, Brad) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 9:22-ap-01007. Complaint by Dennis Robert Rowley Jr. against Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. ($350.00 Fee Not Required). Nature of Suit: (63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)) (Cohen, Joshua) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant