This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2019 at 05:20:04 (UTC).

Rosibel Flores

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 case was filed by Rosibel Flores in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-BK-14478

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Erithe A. Smith

 

Party Details

Debtor

Rosibel Flores

Anaheim, CA 92802

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SA)

411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160

Santa Ana, CA 92701-4593

Trustee

Amrane (SA) Cohen (TR)

Orange, CA 92868

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Tuan Le

Attorney at Law Office of Tuan Le

333 City Blvd West, Suite 1700

Orange, CA 92868

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Rosibel Flores. (Le, Tuan) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#1

(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Rosibel Flores Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 11/29/2019. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 11/29/2019. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 11/29/2019. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 11/29/2019. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 11/29/2019. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 11/29/2019. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 11/29/2019. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 11/29/2019. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 11/29/2019. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 11/29/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 11/29/2019. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 11/29/2019. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 11/29/2019. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 11/29/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 11/29/2019. (Le, Tuan) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/17/2019 at 11:00 AM at RM 1-154, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/21/2020 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Proof of Claim due by 01/24/2020. (Le, Tuan) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Rosibel Flores. (Le, Tuan) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Rosibel Flores. (Le, Tuan) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Rosibel Flores Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 11/29/2019. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 11/29/2019. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 11/29/2019. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 11/29/2019. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 11/29/2019. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 11/29/2019. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 11/29/2019. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 11/29/2019. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 11/29/2019. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 11/29/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 11/29/2019. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 11/29/2019. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 11/29/2019. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 11/29/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 11/29/2019. (Le, Tuan) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less