This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2021 at 16:27:43 (UTC).

ROK Mobile Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 ROK Mobile Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Sandra R. Klein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-BK-13413

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

Judge Details

Judge

Sandra R. Klein

 

Party Details

Debtor

ROK Mobile Inc.

8500 Steller Dr., Bldg 4

Culver City, CA 90232-0000

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

John J Menchaca (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

David L. Neale

Attorney at Levene Neale Bender Yoo & Brill LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd Ste 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Trustee Attorneys

Danning, Gill, Israel & Krasnoff, LLP

Zev Shechtman

Attorney at Danning, Gill, Israel & Krasnoff, LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 450

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6006

Jeffrey L Sumpter

7815 S. 28Th Way

Phoenix, AZ 85042

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) Notice Notice of (1) Conducting of Continued 341(a) Meeting of Creditors by ZOOM; With Proof of Service. Filed by Trustee John J Menchaca (TR) (RE: related document(s) 19 Continuance of Meeting of Creditors (Rule 2003(e)) (Trustee's 341 Filings) 341(a) Meeting Continued to be held on 8/3/2021 at 01:30 PM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. (Menchaca (TR), John)). (Menchaca (TR), John) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#21

(#21) Order Granting Application to Employ the Firm of Menchaca & Company LLP as Financial Advisors and Consultants for Trustee (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #16) Signed on 7/12/2021. (May, Thais D.) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#20

(#20) Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3)) of Trustee for Authorization to Employ Menchaca & Company LLP as Financial Advisors and Consultants for Trustee Filed by Trustee John J Menchaca (TR) (RE: related document(s)#16 Application to Employ Menchaca & Company LLP as Financial Advisors and Consultants for Trustee ). (Sumpter, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#18

(#18) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#15 Order on Application to Employ (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/23/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#17

(#17) Notice of motion/application of Trustee to Employ Menchaca & Company as Financial Advisors and Consultants for Trustee Filed by Trustee John J Menchaca (TR) (RE: related document(s)#16 Application to Employ Menchaca & Company LLP as Financial Advisors and Consultants for Trustee Filed by Trustee John J Menchaca (TR)). (Sumpter, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#16

(#16) Application to Employ Menchaca & Company LLP as Financial Advisors and Consultants for Trustee Filed by Trustee John J Menchaca (TR) (Sumpter, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#15

(#18) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#15 Order on Application to Employ (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/23/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#8

(#8) Notice Notice of (1) Conducting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors By Zoom; and (2) Document Requirements 7 Days Prior to the 341(a) Meeting of Creditors with Proof of Service. Filed by Trustee John J Menchaca (TR) (RE: related document(s)#2 Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/24/2021 at 11:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE.). (Menchaca (TR), John) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#7

(#7) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by McCormick, William. (McCormick, William) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

5 #2

Ntc Pssbl Dvdnd/Ord Fx Time

5 #1

Main Document

#2

(#8) Notice Notice of (1) Conducting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors By Zoom; and (2) Document Requirements 7 Days Prior to the 341(a) Meeting of Creditors with Proof of Service. Filed by Trustee John J Menchaca (TR) (RE: related document(s)#2 Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/24/2021 at 11:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE.). (Menchaca (TR), John) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#1

(#3) Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Debtor(s) mailing address was entered in the system instead of the street address. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor ROK Mobile Inc.) (Carranza, Shemainee) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • Docket(#25) Continuance of Meeting of Creditors (Rule 2003(e)) (Trustee's 341 Filings) 341(a) Meeting Continued to be held on 9/16/2021 at 11:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. Debtor absent. (Menchaca (TR), John) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • Docket(#24) Continuance of Meeting of Creditors (Rule 2003(e)) (Trustee's 341 Filings) 341(a) Meeting Continued to be held on 8/30/2021 at 11:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. Debtor absent. (Menchaca (TR), John) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Notice Notice of (1) Conducting of Continued 341(a) Meeting of Creditors by ZOOM; With Proof of Service. Filed by Trustee John J Menchaca (TR) (RE: related document(s) 19 Continuance of Meeting of Creditors (Rule 2003(e)) (Trustee's 341 Filings) 341(a) Meeting Continued to be held on 8/3/2021 at 01:30 PM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. (Menchaca (TR), John)). (Menchaca (TR), John) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#21 Order on Application to Employ (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/14/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Order Granting Application to Employ the Firm of Menchaca & Company LLP as Financial Advisors and Consultants for Trustee (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #16) Signed on 7/12/2021. (May, Thais D.) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3)) of Trustee for Authorization to Employ Menchaca & Company LLP as Financial Advisors and Consultants for Trustee Filed by Trustee John J Menchaca (TR) (RE: related document(s)#16 Application to Employ Menchaca & Company LLP as Financial Advisors and Consultants for Trustee ). (Sumpter, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Docket(#19) Continuance of Meeting of Creditors (Rule 2003(e)) (Trustee's 341 Filings) 341(a) Meeting Continued to be held on 8/3/2021 at 01:30 PM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. (Menchaca (TR), John) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#15 Order on Application to Employ (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/23/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Notice of motion/application of Trustee to Employ Menchaca & Company as Financial Advisors and Consultants for Trustee Filed by Trustee John J Menchaca (TR) (RE: related document(s)#16 Application to Employ Menchaca & Company LLP as Financial Advisors and Consultants for Trustee Filed by Trustee John J Menchaca (TR)). (Sumpter, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Application to Employ Menchaca & Company LLP as Financial Advisors and Consultants for Trustee Filed by Trustee John J Menchaca (TR) (Sumpter, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Shechtman, Zev. (Shechtman, Zev) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice Notice of (1) Conducting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors By Zoom; and (2) Document Requirements 7 Days Prior to the 341(a) Meeting of Creditors with Proof of Service. Filed by Trustee John J Menchaca (TR) (RE: related document(s)#2 Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/24/2021 at 11:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE.). (Menchaca (TR), John) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by McCormick, William. (McCormick, William) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#5 Notice of Assets filed by trustee and court's notice of possible dividend (BNC) filed by Trustee John J Menchaca (TR)) No. of Notices: 41. Notice Date 05/05/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Assets filed by trustee and court's notice of possible dividend (BNC) Filed by Trustee John J Menchaca (TR). Proofs of Claims due by 8/6/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/25/2021. (Menchaca (TR), John) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#2 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 7b)) No. of Notices: 41. Notice Date 04/29/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Debtor(s) mailing address was entered in the system instead of the street address. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor ROK Mobile Inc.) (Carranza, Shemainee) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(# 2:21-bk-13413) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A52816361. Fee amount 338.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/24/2021 at 11:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. (Neale, David) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by ROK Mobile Inc. (Neale, David) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROK MOBILE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Lawrence Neale(Designation Retained)