This case was last updated from PACER on 07/17/2020 at 07:52:40 (UTC).

Robert Graham Designs, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 Robert Graham Designs, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New York Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Sean H. Lane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-BK-22666

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Sean H. Lane

 

Party Details

Debtor

Robert Graham Designs, LLC

350 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10118

Us Trustee

United States Trustee

U.S. Federal Office Building, 201 Varick Street, Room 1006

New York, NY 10014

Not Classified By Court

Prime Clerk LLC Claims Agent

One Grand Central Place, 60 East 42Nd Street, Suite 1440, Www.Primeclerk.Com

New York, NY 10165

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Gregg M. Galardi

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Order Signed On 5/20/2020, (A) Directing Joint Administration Of Related Chapter 11 Cases And (B) Granting Related Relief. (Related Doc #2) (Ebanks, Liza) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#2

(#2) Motion for Joint Administration / Debtors' Motion for Entry of Order (A) Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases and (B) Granting Related Relief filed by Gregg M. Galardi on behalf of Robert Graham Designs, LLC. (Galardi, Gregg) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A/B due 06/1/2020. Schedule C due 06/1/2020. Schedule D due 06/1/2020. Schedule E/F due 06/1/2020. Schedule G due 06/1/2020. Schedule H due 06/1/2020. Schedule I due 06/1/2020. Schedule J due 06/1/2020. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 06/1/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs due 06/1/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 06/1/2020, Filed by Gregg M. Galardi of Ropes & Gray LLP on behalf of Robert Graham Designs, LLC. (Galardi, Gregg) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketClaims and Noticing Agent, Prime Clerk LLC Claims Agent, added to the case. (McCaffrey, Dawn). (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCase Joint Administration: An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Bankruptcy Rules directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Centric Brands, Inc. (8178); Added Extras LLC (5851); American Marketing Enterprises Inc. (9672); Briefly Stated Holdings, Inc. (9890); Briefly Stated Inc. (6765); Centric Bebe LLC (2263); Centric Brands Holding LLC (3107); DBG Holdings Subsidiary Inc. (4795); DBG Subsidiary Inc. (6315); DFBG Swims, LLC (8035): F&T Apparel LLC (9183); Centric Accessories Group LLC (3904); Centric Beauty LLC (8044); Centric Denim Retail LLC (1013); Centric Denim USA, LLC (9608); Centric Jewelry Inc. (6431); Centric Socks LLC (2887); Centric West LLC (3064); Centric-BCBG LLC (5700); Centric-BCBG Retail LLC (4915); HC Acquisition Holdings, Inc. (4381); Hudson Clothing, LLC (2491); Hudson Clothing Holdings, Inc. (4298); Innovo West Sales, Inc. (8471); KHQ Athletics LLC (7413); KHQ Investment LLC (0014); Lotta Luv Beauty LLC (0202); Marco Brunelli IP, LLC (0227); RG Parent LLC (4002); RGH Group LLC (9853); RobertG raham Designs, LLC (1207); Robert Graham Holdings, LLC (0213); Robert Graham Retail LLC (7152); Rosetti Handbags and Accessories, Ltd. (2905); and VZI Investment Corp. (5233). The docket in Case No. 20-22637 (SHL) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (McCaffrey, Dawn). (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Signed On 5/20/2020, (A) Directing Joint Administration Of Related Chapter 11 Cases And (B) Granting Related Relief. (Related Doc #2) (Ebanks, Liza) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketPending Deadlines Terminated. (Walker, Justin) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketDeficiencies Set: Section 521(i) Incomplete Filing Date: 7/2/2020. Atty Disclosure State. due 6/1/2020. List of all creditors due 6/1/2020. List of All Creditors Required on Case Docket in PDF Format due 6/1/2020. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit due by: 6/1/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 6/1/2020, (Walker, Justin). (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 20-22666) [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13996908. Fee amount 1717.00. (Re: Doc #1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketJudge Sean H. Lane added to the case. (Andino, Eddie) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Joint Administration / Debtors' Motion for Entry of Order (A) Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases and (B) Granting Related Relief filed by Gregg M. Galardi on behalf of Robert Graham Designs, LLC. (Galardi, Gregg) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A/B due 06/1/2020. Schedule C due 06/1/2020. Schedule D due 06/1/2020. Schedule E/F due 06/1/2020. Schedule G due 06/1/2020. Schedule H due 06/1/2020. Schedule I due 06/1/2020. Schedule J due 06/1/2020. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 06/1/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs due 06/1/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 06/1/2020, Filed by Gregg M. Galardi of Ropes & Gray LLP on behalf of Robert Graham Designs, LLC. (Galardi, Gregg) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROBERT GRAHAM DESIGNS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Prime Clerk LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregg Galardi