This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 04/14/2021 at 05:22:53 (UTC).

Richard Sullivan

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 Richard Sullivan was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Julia W. Brand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-BK-12992

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Julia W. Brand

 

Party Details

Debtor

Richard Sullivan, Richard Sullivan

Sunland, CA 91040

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Nancy K Curry (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Douglas A. Crowder

Attorney at Crowder Law Center, PC

303 N. Glenoaks Blvd., Suite 200

Burbank, CA 91502

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Notice of Motion and Motion in Individual Case for Order Imposing a Stay or Continuing the Automatic Stay as the Court Deems Appropriate . Fee Amount $188, Filed by Debtor Richard Sullivan (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Richard Sullivan. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

(#4) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/20/2021 at 09:00 AM at TR 13, VIDEO CONFERENCE. GOTO TRUSTEE WEBSITE FOR INSTRUCTIONS. Confirmation hearing to be held on 07/12/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 06/22/2021. (Crowder, Douglas) Note: New Confirmation hearing to be held on 06/23/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1375. Modified on 4/13/2021 (Tatum, Shafari). (Entered: 04/13/2021)

1 #3

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

1 #2

Case Com Def Notice

#1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Motion for Relief - Imposing a Stay or Continuing the Automatic Stay(2:21-bk-12992-WB) [motion,nmis] ( 188.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 52750883. Fee amount 188.00. (re: Doc#5) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Motion and Motion in Individual Case for Order Imposing a Stay or Continuing the Automatic Stay as the Court Deems Appropriate . Fee Amount $188, Filed by Debtor Richard Sullivan (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketJudge Julia W. Brand added to case due to prior related case 2:17-bk-15883-WB. Involvement of Judge Vincent P. Zurzolo Terminated (Tatum, Shafari) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Richard Sullivan. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Richard Sullivan. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/20/2021 at 09:00 AM at TR 13, VIDEO CONFERENCE. GOTO TRUSTEE WEBSITE FOR INSTRUCTIONS. Confirmation hearing to be held on 07/12/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 06/22/2021. (Crowder, Douglas) Note: New Confirmation hearing to be held on 06/23/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1375. Modified on 4/13/2021 (Tatum, Shafari). (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(2:21-bk-12992) [misc,volp13] ( 313.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 52748021. Fee amount 313.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $313 Filed by Richard Sullivan Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 04/27/2021. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 04/27/2021. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 04/27/2021. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 04/27/2021. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 04/27/2021. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 04/27/2021. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 04/27/2021. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 04/27/2021. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 04/27/2021. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 04/27/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 04/27/2021. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 04/27/2021. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 04/27/2021. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 04/27/2021. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 04/27/2021. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 04/27/2021. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 04/27/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 04/27/2021. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas A Crowder