This case was last updated from PACER on 04/07/2021 at 16:09:02 (UTC).

Rhino Bare Projects LLC et al v. Canico Capital Group, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Rhino Bare Projects LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Canico Capital Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Sheri Bluebond. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-AP-01036

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Sheri Bluebond

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Canico Capital Group, LLC

3172 S. Barrington Ave, # 101

Los Angeles, CA 90066

Rhino Bare Projects LLC

1947 S Myrtle Ave

Monrovia, CA 91016

Defendants

Abraham Assil

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Canico Capital Group, LLC

3172 S. Barrington Ave, # 101

Los Angeles, CA 90066

West Best Capital Group, LLC

3172 S. Barrington Ave, # 101

Los Angeles, CA 90066

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Leslie A Cohen

Attorney at Leslie Cohen Law PC

506 Santa Monica Bl Ste 200

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Nathan D Meyer

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd 12Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorney

Daniel J McCarthy

Attorney at Hill Farrer & Burrill LLP

300 S Grand Ave 37Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Amended Complaint by Nathan D Meyer on behalf of Rhino Bare Projects LLC against Abraham Assil, Canico Capital Group, LLC, West Best Capital Group, LLC. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#8

(#8) Request for judicial notice in Support of Motion for Abstention and Dismissal of Complaint and Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendants Abraham Assil, Canico Capital Group, LLC, West Best Capital Group, LLC (RE: related document(s)#7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Motion and Motion For Abstention and Dismissal of Complaint and Adversary Proceeding; Memorandum of Points and Authorities). (McCarthy, Daniel) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#7

(#7) Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Motion and Motion For Abstention and Dismissal of Complaint and Adversary Proceeding; Memorandum of Points and Authorities Filed by Defendants Abraham Assil, Canico Capital Group, LLC, West Best Capital Group, LLC (McCarthy, Daniel) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#6

(#6) Proof of service Filed by Plaintiff Rhino Bare Projects LLC. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#4

(#4) Proof of service Filed by Plaintiff Rhino Bare Projects LLC. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#3

(#3) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Blumenfeld, Ori. (Blumenfeld, Ori) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued on Abraham Assil Date Issued 2/24/2021, Answer Due 3/26/2021; Canico Capital Group, LLC Date Issued 2/24/2021, Answer Due 3/26/2021; West Best Capital Group, LLC Date Issued 2/24/2021, Answer Due 3/26/2021 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Defendant Canico Capital Group, LLC, Plaintiff Canico Capital Group, LLC, Plaintiff Rhino Bare Projects LLC) Status hearing to be held on 4/27/2021 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1539, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sheri Bluebond (Jackson, Wendy Ann) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#1

(#1) Adversary case 2:21-ap-01036. Complaint by Rhino Bare Projects LLC, Canico Capital Group, LLC against Canico Capital Group, LLC, West Best Capital Group, LLC, Abraham Assil. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Cohen, Leslie) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect hearing date/time/location was selected. The status conference hearing date must be stated under the caption of the document; THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE CORRECT HEARING INFORMATION. (RE: related document(s)#10 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Rhino Bare Projects LLC) (Jackson, Wendy Ann) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Amended Complaint by Nathan D Meyer on behalf of Rhino Bare Projects LLC against Abraham Assil, Canico Capital Group, LLC, West Best Capital Group, LLC. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Abraham Assil, Defendant Canico Capital Group, LLC, Plaintiff Canico Capital Group, LLC, Defendant West Best Capital Group, LLC) The Hearing date is set for 4/20/2021 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1539, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sheri Bluebond (Jackson, Wendy Ann) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for judicial notice in Support of Motion for Abstention and Dismissal of Complaint and Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendants Abraham Assil, Canico Capital Group, LLC, West Best Capital Group, LLC (RE: related document(s)#7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Motion and Motion For Abstention and Dismissal of Complaint and Adversary Proceeding; Memorandum of Points and Authorities). (McCarthy, Daniel) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Motion and Motion For Abstention and Dismissal of Complaint and Adversary Proceeding; Memorandum of Points and Authorities Filed by Defendants Abraham Assil, Canico Capital Group, LLC, West Best Capital Group, LLC (McCarthy, Daniel) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proof of service Filed by Plaintiff Rhino Bare Projects LLC. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Hearing information was not provided. Other: The Filer Is Instructed To Re-File The Document With The Current Status Conference Hearing Date Under The Caption Of The Document. - (RE: related document(s)#4 Proof of service filed by Plaintiff Rhino Bare Projects LLC) (Pennington-Jones, Patricia) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proof of service Filed by Plaintiff Rhino Bare Projects LLC. (Meyer, Nathan) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Blumenfeld, Ori. (Blumenfeld, Ori) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued on Abraham Assil Date Issued 2/24/2021, Answer Due 3/26/2021; Canico Capital Group, LLC Date Issued 2/24/2021, Answer Due 3/26/2021; West Best Capital Group, LLC Date Issued 2/24/2021, Answer Due 3/26/2021 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Defendant Canico Capital Group, LLC, Plaintiff Canico Capital Group, LLC, Plaintiff Rhino Bare Projects LLC) Status hearing to be held on 4/27/2021 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1539, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sheri Bluebond (Jackson, Wendy Ann) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 2:21-ap-01036. Complaint by Rhino Bare Projects LLC, Canico Capital Group, LLC against Canico Capital Group, LLC, West Best Capital Group, LLC, Abraham Assil. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Cohen, Leslie) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rhino Bare Projects LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leslie A Cohen