This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 11/15/2020 at 06:33:36 (UTC).

RGN-Miami Beach II, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 RGN-Miami Beach II, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brendan Linehan Shannon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-BK-12361

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Brendan Linehan Shannon

 

Party Details

Debtor

RGN-Miami Beach II, LLC

3000 Kellway Drive, Suite 140

Carrollton, TX 75006

Not Classified By Court

Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC

777 Third Avenue, 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, 844 King Street, Suite 2207, Lockbox 35

Wilmington, DE 19801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Patrick A. Jackson

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

222 Delaware Avenue

Wilmington, DE 19801

Ian J Bambrick

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

222 Delaware Avenue

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

4 #1

Main Document

4 #2

Statement of Financial Affairs

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by RGN-Miami Beach II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Financial Affairs) (Bambrick, Ian) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docket(#3) Order (FOURTH) Authorizing (I) Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (II) the Filing of a Consolidated Creditor Matrix. An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of RGN-GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, Case No. 20-11961 (BLS), for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 20-11961 (BLS) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 9/17/2020 (SJS) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketJudge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case (BA) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docket(#2) Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(20-12361) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9963976, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition RGN-Miami Beach II, LLC. Fee Amount $1717. Filed by RGN-Miami Beach II, LLC. (Jackson, Patrick) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick A. Jackson Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ian J Bambrick