This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2020 at 05:09:00 (UTC).

Reyna Lizzet Martinez

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Reyna Lizzet Martinez was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Sandra R. Klein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-BK-10095

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Sandra R. Klein

 

Party Details

Debtor

Reyna Lizzet Martinez

Palmdale, CA 93591

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Kathy A Dockery (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Nancy Korompis

Attorney at Korompis Law Offices

Po Box 60011

Pasadena, CA 91116

 

Court Documents

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

(#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Reyna Lizzet Martinez. (Korompis, Nancy) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Reyna Lizzet Martinez. (Korompis, Nancy) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#2

(#2) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Filed by Debtor Reyna Lizzet Martinez. (Korompis, Nancy) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Reyna Lizzet Martinez. (Korompis, Nancy) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#1

(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Reyna Lizzet Martinez (Korompis, Nancy) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/14/2020 at 09:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017. Confirmation hearing to be held on 03/12/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1575, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 03/16/2020. (Korompis, Nancy) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(2:20-bk-10095) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 50393460. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Reyna Lizzet Martinez. (Korompis, Nancy) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Reyna Lizzet Martinez. (Korompis, Nancy) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Reyna Lizzet Martinez. (Korompis, Nancy) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Reyna Lizzet Martinez. (Korompis, Nancy) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Filed by Debtor Reyna Lizzet Martinez. (Korompis, Nancy) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Reyna Lizzet Martinez (Korompis, Nancy) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.