This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 05/11/2021 at 07:27:20 (UTC).

Retired-N-Fit, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 Retired-N-Fit, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Brendan Linehan Shannon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-BK-10561

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Brendan Linehan Shannon

 

Party Details

Debtor

Retired-N-Fit, LLC

1405 Foulk Road, Suite 201

Wilmington, DE 19803

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, 844 King Street, Suite 2207, Lockbox 35

Wilmington, DE 19801

Trustee

Jami B Nimeroff

Wilmington, DE 19801

Not Classified By Court

Hockessin Plaza, LLC, Landlord

3704 Kennett Pike, Suite 200

Greenville, DE 19807

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

David M. Klauder

Attorney at Bielli & Klauder, LLC

1204 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Us Trustee Attorney

David Villagrana

Attorney at U.S. Trustee Office

844 King Street, Suite 2207

Wilmington, DE 19801

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Jillian Marie Pratt

Attorney at Morton, Valihura & Zerbato, LLC

3704 Kennett Pike, Suite 200

Greenville, DE 19807

 

Court Documents

#35

#34

33 #3

Service List

33 #2

Certificate of Service

#31

#30

28 #2

Exhibit

28 #1

Main Document

#27

7 #2

SBRA Order Setting Status Conf: Notice Recipients

#6

#5

4 #3

Proposed Form of Order

4 #2

Exhibit A

4 #1

Main Document

3 #2

Proposed Form of Order

3 #1

Main Document

#1

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Status Report -- Subchapter V Status Report -- Filed by Retired-N-Fit, LLC. (Klauder, David) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March (3/12/2021) Filed by Retired-N-Fit, LLC. (Klauder, David) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Retired-N-Fit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service #2 Service List) (Klauder, David) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket(#32) Minute Sheet 341 Meeting Held and Concluded . The meeting was held telephonically on April 15, 2021 and concluded on the same date. Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Villagrana, David) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Final Order Granting Debtor's Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtor to (A) Continue and Maintain its Consolidated Cash Management System, (B) Continue and Maintain its Existing Bank Accounts and (C) Use Existing Business Forms; (II) Suspending the Requirements of Bankruptcy Code Section 345(B); and (III) Granting Related Relief (related document(s)#28) Order Signed on 4/14/2021. (JMW) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Order, Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code, Authorizing the Rejection of Nonresidential Real Property Lease Agreement Between the Debtor and Hockessin Plaza, LLC Effective March 12, 2021 (related document(s)#25, #27) Order Signed on 4/14/2021. (JMW) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Order Approving Application to Employ and Retain Bielli & Klauder, LLC as Counsel for the Debtor and Debtor-In-Possession, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (Related Doc #21)(related document(s)#21, #26) Order Signed on 4/14/2021. (JMW) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Certificate of No Objection -- Certificate of No Objection Regarding the Interim Order Granting Debtor's Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtor to (A) Continue and Maintain its Consolidated Cash Management System, (B) Continue and Maintain its Existing Bank Accounts and (C) Use Existing Business Forms; (II) Suspending the Requirements of Bankruptcy Code Section 345(B); and (III) Granting Related Relief -- (related document(s)#14) Filed by Retired-N-Fit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Klauder, David) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Certificate of No Objection -- Certificate of No Objection Regarding the Debtor's Motion for Order, Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code, Authorizing the Rejection of Nonresidential Real Property Lease Agreement Between the Debtor and Hockessin Plaza, LLC Effective March 12, 2021 -- (related document(s)#25) Filed by Retired-N-Fit, LLC. (Klauder, David) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Certificate of No Objection -- Certificate of No Objection Regarding the Application to Employ and Retain Bielli & Klauder, LLC as Counsel for the Debtor and Debtor-In-Possession, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date -- (related document(s)#21) Filed by Retired-N-Fit, LLC. (Klauder, David) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Retired-N-Fit, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 3/18/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service #2 Service List) (Klauder, David) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) (ENTERED IN ERROR) Order Setting Status Conference SBRA Status Conference to be held on 3/18/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Pre-Status Report Due By 3/4/2021. Signed on 3/15/2021. (SJS) Modified on 3/16/2021 (SJS). (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee Jami B. Nimeroff by U.S. Trustee. Jami B Nimeroff added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Villagrana, David) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Affidavit/Declaration in Support of First Day Motion -- Declaration of Christine M. Stanbery in Support of Debtor's Chapter 11 Subchapter V Petition and Request for First Day Relief -- Filed By Retired-N-Fit, LLC (Klauder, David) (Entered: 03/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion to Maintain Bank Accounts -- Motion of the Debtor for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (A) Authorizing the Maintenance of Bank Accounts and Continued Use of Existing Business Forms and Checks, (B) Authorizing the Continued Use of Existing Cash Management Systems, and (C) Granting Limited Relief from the Requirements of Bankruptcy Code Section 345(b) -- Filed By Retired-N-Fit, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Proposed Form of Order)(Klauder, David) (Entered: 03/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion to Pay Employee Wages -- Motion of the Debtor for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtor to Pay Prepetition Wages, Compensation, Employee Benefits and Other Associated Relief -- Filed By Retired-N-Fit, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Form of Order)(Klauder, David) (Entered: 03/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketFiled by U.S. Trustee. (Villagrana, David) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketJudge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case (LB) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docket(#2) Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-10561) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A10234080, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Retired-N-Fit, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 06/10/2021. (Klauder, David) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant