This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 01/22/2022 at 06:30:48 (UTC).

Rebecca F Audiss

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 Rebecca F Audiss was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Colorado Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth E. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-BK-15815

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth E. Brown

 

Party Details

Debtor

Rebecca F Audiss

Littleton, CO 80160

Us Trustee

US Trustee

Byron G. Rogers Federal Building1961 Stout St.

Denver, CO 80294

Trustee

Joli A. Lofstedt

Louisville, CO 80027

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Kelsey Jamie Buechler

999 18Th St.Ste., 1230 S

Denver, CO 80202

Us Trustee Attorney

Paul Moss

Byron G. Rogers Federal Building1961 Stout St.

Denver, CO 80294

 

Court Documents

#41

(#41) 1009-1.1 Notice of Amendment to Voluntary Petition, Lists, Schedules, or Statements Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss (related document(s):#34 Statement of Financial Affairs, #35 Schedule D And/Or Schedule E/F, #36 Schedule H, #37 Schedule I, #38 Schedule J, #39 Schedule J-2)... (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#39

(#39) Schedule J-2 Expenses for Separate Household of Debtor 2 Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss (related document(s):#1 Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11, #38 Schedule J). (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#38

(#38) Amended Schedule J: Current Expenditures For Individual Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss (related document(s):#1 Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11). (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#37

(#37) Amended Schedule I: Current Income For Individual Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss (related document(s):#1 Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11). (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#36

(#36) Amended Schedule H: For Individual Codebtors Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss (related document(s):#1 Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11). (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#35

(#35) Amended Schedule D: Creditors having Claims Secured by Property And/Or Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims For Individual Total Number of Creditors Added or Uploaded: 7 Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss (related document(s):#1 Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11). (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#34

(#34) Amended Statement of Financial Affairs for Individual Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss. (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#32

(#33) Certificate of Service Filed by Paul Moss on behalf of US Trustee (related document(s):#31 Objection, #32 9013-1.1 Notice). (Attachments: #1 Other Mailing Matrix) (Moss, Paul) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

7 #2

Proposed/Unsigned Order

7 #1

Main Document

6 #2

Certificate of Service

6 #1

Main Document

5 #4

Certificate of Service

5 #3

Proposed/Unsigned Order

5 #2

Exhibit 1 (Declaration)

5 #1

Main Document

#4

(#4) Employee Pay Advice/Income Record, Pay Stubs, and/or No Employee Income Record Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss. (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#1

(#35) Amended Schedule D: Creditors having Claims Secured by Property And/Or Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims For Individual Total Number of Creditors Added or Uploaded: 7 Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss (related document(s):#1 Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11). (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Amended Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss (related document(s):#1 Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11, #35 Schedule D And/Or Schedule E/F). (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) 1009-1.1 Notice of Amendment to Voluntary Petition, Lists, Schedules, or Statements Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss (related document(s):#34 Statement of Financial Affairs, #35 Schedule D And/Or Schedule E/F, #36 Schedule H, #37 Schedule I, #38 Schedule J, #39 Schedule J-2)... (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Docket(#40) Receipt of Schedule D And/Or Schedule E/F(# 21-15815-EEB) [misc,schef] ( 32.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31071864. Fee amount 32.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Schedule J-2 Expenses for Separate Household of Debtor 2 Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss (related document(s):#1 Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11, #38 Schedule J). (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Amended Schedule J: Current Expenditures For Individual Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss (related document(s):#1 Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11). (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Amended Schedule I: Current Income For Individual Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss (related document(s):#1 Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11). (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Amended Schedule H: For Individual Codebtors Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss (related document(s):#1 Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11). (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Amended Schedule D: Creditors having Claims Secured by Property And/Or Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims For Individual Total Number of Creditors Added or Uploaded: 7 Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss (related document(s):#1 Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11). (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Amended Statement of Financial Affairs for Individual Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss. (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Certificate of Service Filed by Paul Moss on behalf of US Trustee (related document(s):#31 Objection, #32 9013-1.1 Notice). (Attachments: #1 Other Mailing Matrix) (Moss, Paul) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Paul Moss on behalf of US Trustee... (Moss, Paul) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Individual List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss . (mjb) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss (related document(s):#7 Motion to Approve Retainer).. 9013 Objections due by 12/7/2021 for #7,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to Approve Retainer In The Amount Of $10,957.00 Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss. (Attachments: #1 Proposed/Unsigned Order #2 Certificate of Service) (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss (related document(s):#5 Application to Employ).. 9013 Objections due by 12/7/2021 for #5,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Application to Employ Buechler Law Office, LLC as Counsel for the Debtor-in-Possession Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration) #2 Proposed/Unsigned Order #3 Certificate of Service) (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Employee Pay Advice/Income Record, Pay Stubs, and/or No Employee Income Record Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss. (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docket(#3) Receipt of Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11(# 21-15815) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A30968754. Fee amount 1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Social Security Number Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of Rebecca F Audiss (related document(s):#1 Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11). (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition for Individual. Total Number of Creditors Uploaded: 8. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V due by 02/22/2022. Government Proofs of Claim due by 05/23/2022. (Buechler, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant