This case was last updated from PACER on 02/16/2021 at 05:06:39 (UTC).

Ralph Andrew Kottke

Case Summary

On 02/13/2021 Ralph Andrew Kottke was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Neil W. Bason. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-BK-11170

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Neil W. Bason

 

Party Details

Debtor

Ralph Andrew Kottke, Ralph Kottke

Glendale, CA 91202

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Kathy A Dockery (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Douglas A. Crowder

Attorney at Crowder Law Center, PC

303 N. Glenoaks Blvd., Suite 200

Burbank, CA 91502

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Ralph Andrew Kottke. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/13/2021)

#5

(#5) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Filed by Debtor Ralph Andrew Kottke. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/13/2021)

#4

(#4) Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) Filed by Debtor Ralph Andrew Kottke. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/13/2021)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Ralph Andrew Kottke. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/13/2021)

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#1

(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $313 Filed by Ralph Andrew Kottke (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/13/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(2:21-bk-11170) [misc,volp13] ( 313.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 52465173. Fee amount 313.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 02/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Ralph Andrew Kottke. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2021
  • DocketMeeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/26/2021 at 09:00 AM at TR 13, VIDEO CONFERENCE. GOTO TRUSTEE WEBSITE FOR INSTRUCTIONS. Confirmation hearing to be held on 04/22/2021 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 1545, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 04/26/2021. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Filed by Debtor Ralph Andrew Kottke. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) Filed by Debtor Ralph Andrew Kottke. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Ralph Andrew Kottke. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Ralph Andrew Kottke. (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $313 Filed by Ralph Andrew Kottke (Crowder, Douglas) (Entered: 02/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas A Crowder