This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 07/28/2020 at 08:00:09 (UTC).

QualSight, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/29/2020 QualSight, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen B. Owens. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-BK-11415

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Karen B. Owens

 

Party Details

Debtor

QualSight, LLC

1555 Palm Beach Lakes Blvd., Suite 600

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Not Classified By Court

Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc.

6201 15Th Avenue

Brooklyn, NY 11219

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, 844 King Street, Suite 2207, Lockbox 35

Wilmington, DE 19801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

G. David Dean

Attorney at Cole Schotz P.C.

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

3 #1

Main Document

3 #2

Exhibit A - Proposed Order

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by QualSight, LLC. (Dean, G.) (Entered: 06/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by QualSight, LLC. (Dean, G.) (Entered: 06/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of LVI Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Case No. 20-11413 (KBO), for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 20-11413 (KBO) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (Related document(s)#3) Order Signed on 6/2/2020 (Mml) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2020
  • DocketJudge Karen B. Owens added to case (BA) (Entered: 05/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion for Joint Administration Filed by LVI Intermediate Holdings, Inc.. (Pernick, Norman) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • Docket(#2) Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(20-11415) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9799016, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for QualSight, LLC. Fee Amount $1717. Filed by QualSight, LLC. (Dean, G.) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer G. David Dean