This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 06/03/2022 at 06:30:27 (UTC).

Purim Holding, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 Purim Holding, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin R. Barash. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-BK-10400

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Martin R. Barash

 

Party Details

Debtor

Purim Holding, LLC

11540 Santa Monica Bl., #201

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SV)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Michael Jay Berger

9454 Wilshire Blvd 6Th Fl

Beverly Hills, CA 90212-2929

Us Trustee Attorney

Russell Clementson

915 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#46

(#46) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#41 Order on Application to Employ (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/13/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#45

(#45) Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Purim Holding, LLC (RE: related document(s)#43 Notice). (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#43

(#43) Notice Notice of Non-Opposition Filed by Debtor Purim Holding, LLC (RE: related document(s)#36 Notice of UST's motion to dismiss - chapter 11 (BNC)). (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#42

(#42) Opposition to (related document(s): #33 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SV), #36 Notice of UST's motion to dismiss - Ch 11 (BNC)) Liberty Bank's Limited Opposition to the U.S. Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case Under 11 U.S.C. Section 1112(b); Declaration of Anthony J. Napolitano Filed by Creditor Liberty Bank (Napolitano, Anthony) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#41

(#41) Order Granting Application to Employ Law Offices of Michael J Berger, as general bankruptcy counsel (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #23) Signed on 5/11/2022. (JC) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#40

(#40) Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3)) Filed by Debtor Purim Holding, LLC (RE: related document(s)#23 Application to Employ Michael Jay Berger as General Bankruptcy Counsel ). (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#39

No Description Available

#38

No Description Available

#36

(#42) Opposition to (related document(s): #33 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SV), #36 Notice of UST's motion to dismiss - Ch 11 (BNC)) Liberty Bank's Limited Opposition to the U.S. Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case Under 11 U.S.C. Section 1112(b); Declaration of Anthony J. Napolitano Filed by Creditor Liberty Bank (Napolitano, Anthony) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#35

No Description Available

#33

(#42) Opposition to (related document(s): #33 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SV), #36 Notice of UST's motion to dismiss - Ch 11 (BNC)) Liberty Bank's Limited Opposition to the U.S. Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case Under 11 U.S.C. Section 1112(b); Declaration of Anthony J. Napolitano Filed by Creditor Liberty Bank (Napolitano, Anthony) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#31

No Description Available

#30

No Description Available

#29

No Description Available

#28

No Description Available

#27

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#25

No Description Available

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option) (RE: related document(s) #1 VOLUNTARY PETITION (CHAPTER 11) filed by Purim Holding, LLC) Status Hearing to be held on 06/15/2022 at 01:30 PM 21041 Burbank Blvd Woodland Hills, CA 91367 for #1 , (JC) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) (RE: related document(s) #33 U.S. TRUSTEE MOTION TO DISMISS OR CONVERT filed by United States Trustee (SV)) Hearing to be held on 06/15/2022 at 01:30 PM 21041 Burbank Blvd Woodland Hills, CA 91367 for #33 , (JC) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#41 Order on Application to Employ (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/13/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Purim Holding, LLC (RE: related document(s)#43 Notice). (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • Docket(#44) Continuance of Meeting of Creditors (Rule 2003(e)) Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SV). 341(a) Meeting Continued to 5/26/2022 at 01:00 PM at UST-SVND2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-820-9498, PARTICIPANT CODE:6468388. (Clementson, Russell) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Notice Notice of Non-Opposition Filed by Debtor Purim Holding, LLC (RE: related document(s)#36 Notice of UST's motion to dismiss - chapter 11 (BNC)). (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Opposition to (related document(s): #33 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SV), #36 Notice of UST's motion to dismiss - Ch 11 (BNC)) Liberty Bank's Limited Opposition to the U.S. Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case Under 11 U.S.C. Section 1112(b); Declaration of Anthony J. Napolitano Filed by Creditor Liberty Bank (Napolitano, Anthony) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Order Granting Application to Employ Law Offices of Michael J Berger, as general bankruptcy counsel (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #23) Signed on 5/11/2022. (JC) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3)) Filed by Debtor Purim Holding, LLC (RE: related document(s)#23 Application to Employ Michael Jay Berger as General Bankruptcy Counsel ). (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option) (RE: related document(s) #1 VOLUNTARY PETITION (CHAPTER 11) filed by Purim Holding, LLC) Status Hearing to be held on 05/25/2022 at 01:30 PM 21041 Burbank Blvd Woodland Hills, CA 91367 for #1 , (JC) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2022
  • Docket(#8) Certified Copy Emailed to yathida.nipha@bankruptcypower.com (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Request for a Certified Copy(# 1:22-bk-10400-MB) [misc,paycert] ( 11.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A54117636. Fee amount 11.00. (re: Doc# 7 ) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for a Certified Copy Fee Amount $11. The document will be sent via email to :yathida.nipha@bankruptcypower.com: Filed by Debtor Purim Holding, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Hearing Set - Chapter 11 Scheduling and Case Management Conference (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Purim Holding, LLC) Status hearing to be held on 5/4/2022 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 303, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Martin R. Barash (Cetulio, Julie) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of order req. filing of stat report and appear at stat conf or case will be dism or conv for failure to comp (BNC) (Cetulio, Julie) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order setting scheduling and case management conference (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/5/2022 (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Purim Holding, LLC). Status hearing to be held on 5/4/2022 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 303, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Martin R. Barash (Cetulio, Julie) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/28/2022 at 10:00 AM at UST-SVND2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-820-9498, PARTICIPANT CODE:6468388. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 6/27/2022. Proofs of Claims due by 7/27/2022. (Gasparian, Ana) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Purim Holding, LLC. (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 1:22-bk-10400) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A54114223. Fee amount 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Purim Holding, LLC List of Equity Security Holders due 04/18/2022. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 04/18/2022. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 04/18/2022. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 04/18/2022. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 04/18/2022. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 04/18/2022. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 04/18/2022. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 04/18/2022. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 04/18/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 04/18/2022. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 04/18/2022. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 04/18/2022. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 04/18/2022. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 04/18/2022. Incomplete Filings due by 04/18/2022. (Berger, Michael) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell Clementson