This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 06/19/2022 at 06:35:02 (UTC).

Purdue Pharma L.P. et al v. Commonwealth of Massachusetts et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Purdue Pharma L P filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Commonwealth of Massachusetts. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New York Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert D. Drain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-AP-08289

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Robert D. Drain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Purdue Pharma L.P

Defendants

Commonwealth of Massachusetts

County of Potter

The County of Cuyahoga, Ohio

Kjellsi Meinecke

Lackawanna County, Pennsylvania

Erin Doyle

Town of Lynnfield

Charleston Area Medical Center, Inc.

Amisub (SFH), Inc.

County of Washington

County of Westmoreland

County of Dorchester

The City of Mount Vernon

St. Mary's Hospital of Tucson

County of Logan

Randolph County Commission

Longview Medical Center, L.P. d/b/a Longview Regional Medical Center

The City of New London

The County of Lewis

872 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Sydenham B. Alexander, III

Attorney at Massachusetts Attorney General's Office

One Ashburton Place

Boston, MA 02108

Gillian Feiner

Attorney at Massachusetts Attorney General's Office

One Ashburton Place

Boston, MA 02108

Beth Kaswan

Attorney at Scott & Scott, Attorneys at Law, LLP

The Helmsley Building, 230 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10169

Other Attorneys

Eli J. Vonnegut

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Marc Joseph Tobak

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Heather M Crockett

Attorney at Office of Indiana Attorney General

302 W. Washington St, Igcs, 5Th Floor

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Lara J Fogel

Attorney at Office of the New Jersey Attorney General

124 Halsey Street, 5Th Floor, P.O. Box 45029-5029

Newark, NJ 07101

Eric John Maloney

Attorney at Minnesota Attorney General's Office

445 Minnesota Street, Suite 1200

St. Paul, MN 55101

Nicklas Arnold Akers

Attorney at California Attorney General's Office

455 Golden Gate Ave, Ste 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Robert Padjen

Attorney at Assistant Attorney General

1300 Broadway, Ste 8Th Floor

Denver, CO 80203

Ashley Keller

Attorney at Keller Postman LLC

150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 4100

Chicago, IL 60606

Christopher B Spuches

Attorney at Ehrenstein Charbonneau Calderin

501 Brickell Key Drive, Suite 300

Miami, FL 33131

Matthew J. Gold

Attorney at Kleinberg, Kaplan, Wolff & Cohen, P.C.

500 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10110

Sean Michael Murphy

17 W Main St, Post Office Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

Aaron R. Cahn

Attorney at Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP

2 Wall Street

New York, NY 10005

Ira S. Dizengoff

Attorney at Akin, Gump, Strauss, Hauer & Feld, LLP

One Bryant Park

New York, NY 10036

Megan Paris Rundlet

Attorney at Colorado Attorney General

1300 Broadway, Ste 10Th Floor

Denver, CO 80203

Kathryn Blake

Attorney at NYS Office of the Attorney General

Justice Building, Ste Annex Room C11-A

Albany, NY 12224

James I. McClammy

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Louis J. Testa

Attorney at Attny. Gen. State of New York

Albany, Ny 12224-0341

Albany, NY 12224-0341

20 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#357

(#357) Affidavit of Service of Rohany Tejada Regarding Twenty-Eighth Amended Order Granting Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (related document(s)#356) filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#356

(#356) Twenty-Eighth Amended Order signed on 4/29/2022 Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) Granting Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Related Doc #353) . (Vargas, Ana) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#355

(#355) Affidavit of Service of Sonia Akter Regarding Motion to Extend the Preliminary Injunction, and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Extend the Preliminary Injunction (related document(s)#354, #353) filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Malo, David) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#354

(#354) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Extend the Preliminary Injunction (related document(s)#353) filed by Benjamin S. Kaminetzky on behalf of Avrio Health L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Manufacturing L.P., Purdue Pharma of Puerto Rico, Purdue Pharmaceutical Products L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Transdermal Technologies L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies. Objections due by 4/20/2022, Reply due by 4/25/2022, (Kaminetzky, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#353

(#353) Motion to Extend Time / Motion to Extend the Preliminary Injunction filed by Benjamin S. Kaminetzky on behalf of Avrio Health L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Manufacturing L.P., Purdue Pharma of Puerto Rico, Purdue Pharmaceutical Products L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Transdermal Technologies L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies with hearing to be held on 4/27/2022 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (RDD) Responses due by 4/20/2022,. (Kaminetzky, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#352

(#352) Affidavit of Service of Sonia Akter Regarding Order Shortening Notice with respect to Debtors' Motion to Extend the Preliminary Injunction, and Twenty-Seventh Amended Order Granting Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (related document(s)#348, #349) filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

#349

(#352) Affidavit of Service of Sonia Akter Regarding Order Shortening Notice with respect to Debtors' Motion to Extend the Preliminary Injunction, and Twenty-Seventh Amended Order Granting Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (related document(s)#348, #349) filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

#332

(#359) Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 03/02/2022 At 11:01 AM RE: Motion To Extend Time / Motion To Extend The Preliminary Injunction.; Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion To Extend The Preliminary Injunction. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 9/6/2022. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) #331, #332). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 6/15/2022. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 6/29/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 7/11/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 9/6/2022. (Ramos, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#331

(#359) Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 03/02/2022 At 11:01 AM RE: Motion To Extend Time / Motion To Extend The Preliminary Injunction.; Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion To Extend The Preliminary Injunction. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 9/6/2022. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) #331, #332). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 6/15/2022. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 6/29/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 7/11/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 9/6/2022. (Ramos, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#4

Exhibit C

4 #3

Exhibit B

#3

#2

Exhibit A

2 #1

Main Document

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

#1

Main Document

547 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#359) Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 03/02/2022 At 11:01 AM RE: Motion To Extend Time / Motion To Extend The Preliminary Injunction.; Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion To Extend The Preliminary Injunction. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 9/6/2022. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) #331, #332). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 6/15/2022. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 6/29/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 7/11/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 9/6/2022. (Ramos, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#358) Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 04/27/2022 At 10:06 AM RE: Motion To Extend Time / Motion To Extend The Preliminary Injunction.; Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Motion To Extend The Preliminary Injunction.; Twenty-Fifth Amended Order Signed On Signed On 2/17/2022 Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. 105(A) Granting Motion For A Preliminary Injunction. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 8/16/2022. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) #354, #349, #353). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 5/25/2022. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 6/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 6/21/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 8/16/2022. (Ramos, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#357) Affidavit of Service of Rohany Tejada Regarding Twenty-Eighth Amended Order Granting Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (related document(s)#356) filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#356) Twenty-Eighth Amended Order signed on 4/29/2022 Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) Granting Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Related Doc #353) . (Vargas, Ana) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#355) Affidavit of Service of Sonia Akter Regarding Motion to Extend the Preliminary Injunction, and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Extend the Preliminary Injunction (related document(s)#354, #353) filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Malo, David) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#354) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Extend the Preliminary Injunction (related document(s)#353) filed by Benjamin S. Kaminetzky on behalf of Avrio Health L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Manufacturing L.P., Purdue Pharma of Puerto Rico, Purdue Pharmaceutical Products L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Transdermal Technologies L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies. Objections due by 4/20/2022, Reply due by 4/25/2022, (Kaminetzky, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#353) Motion to Extend Time / Motion to Extend the Preliminary Injunction filed by Benjamin S. Kaminetzky on behalf of Avrio Health L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Manufacturing L.P., Purdue Pharma of Puerto Rico, Purdue Pharmaceutical Products L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Transdermal Technologies L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies with hearing to be held on 4/27/2022 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (RDD) Responses due by 4/20/2022,. (Kaminetzky, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#352) Affidavit of Service of Sonia Akter Regarding Order Shortening Notice with respect to Debtors' Motion to Extend the Preliminary Injunction, and Twenty-Seventh Amended Order Granting Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (related document(s)#348, #349) filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#351) Affidavit of Service (Supplemental) of Nuno Cardoso Regarding Twenty-Fifth Amended Order Granting Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (related document(s)#333) filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#350) Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 03/23/2022 At 10:00 AM RE: Motion To Extend The Preliminary Injunction.; Motion For Entry Of An Order Shortening Notice With Respect To Debtors Motion To Extend The Preliminary Injunction.; Etc. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 6/23/2022. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) #344, #346, #347, #345). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/1/2022. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 4/15/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 4/25/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 6/23/2022. (Ramos, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
345 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/19/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse. Answer due by 10/21/2019. (Vargas, Ana) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Hearing on Debtors' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and on Debtors' Motion for Entry of a Scheduling Order and a Protective Order in Connection with the Preliminary Injunction Motion (related document(s)#2, #7) filed by Benjamin S. Kaminetzky on behalf of Avrio Health L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Manufacturing L.P., Purdue Pharma of Puerto Rico, Purdue Pharmaceutical Products L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Transdermal Technologies L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies. with hearing to be held on 10/11/2019 (check with court for location) Objections due by 10/2/2019, (Kaminetzky, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to Approve Debtors' Motion for Entry of a Scheduling Order and a Protective Order in Connection with the Preliminary Injunction Motion (related document(s)#2) filed by Benjamin S. Kaminetzky on behalf of Avrio Health L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Manufacturing L.P., Purdue Pharma of Puerto Rico, Purdue Pharmaceutical Products L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Transdermal Technologies L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies with hearing to be held on 10/11/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Courthouse (RDD) Responses due by 10/2/2019,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kaminetzky, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Declaration of Jamie OConnell in Support of Debtors' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (related document(s)#2) filed by Benjamin S. Kaminetzky on behalf of Avrio Health L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Manufacturing L.P., Purdue Pharma of Puerto Rico, Purdue Pharmaceutical Products L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Transdermal Technologies L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies. (Kaminetzky, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Declaration of Jesse DelConte in Support of Debtors' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (related document(s)#2) filed by Benjamin S. Kaminetzky on behalf of Avrio Health L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Manufacturing L.P., Purdue Pharma of Puerto Rico, Purdue Pharmaceutical Products L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Transdermal Technologies L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies. (Kaminetzky, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Declaration of Benjamin S. Kaminetzky in Support of Debtors' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (related document(s)#2) filed by Benjamin S. Kaminetzky on behalf of Avrio Health L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Manufacturing L.P., Purdue Pharma of Puerto Rico, Purdue Pharmaceutical Products L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Transdermal Technologies L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E) (Kaminetzky, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (related document(s)#2) filed by Benjamin S. Kaminetzky on behalf of Avrio Health L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Manufacturing L.P., Purdue Pharma of Puerto Rico, Purdue Pharmaceutical Products L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Transdermal Technologies L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies. (Kaminetzky, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Benjamin S. Kaminetzky on behalf of Avrio Health L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Manufacturing L.P., Purdue Pharma of Puerto Rico, Purdue Pharmaceutical Products L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Transdermal Technologies L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies. with hearing to be held on 10/11/2019 (check with court for location) Responses due by 10/2/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kaminetzky, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Complaint(# 19-08289-rdd) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13427607. Fee amount 350.00. (Re: Doc #1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 19-08289. Complaint against Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania by Attorney General Josh Shapiro, Commonwealth of Virginia, ex rel. Mark R. Herring, Attorney General, The State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, ex rel. Mark Brnovich, Attorney General, State of Arkansas, ex rel. Leslie Rutledge, The People of the State of California, The State of Colorado ex rel. Philip J. Weiser, Attorney General, State of Connecticut, District of Columbia, State of Delaware, ex rel. Kathy Jennings, State of Florida, Office of the Attorney General, Department of Legal Affairs, State of Georgia, Territory of Guam, State of Hawaii, ex rel. Clare E. Connors, Attorney General, State of Idaho, Through Attorney General Lawrence G. Wasden, The People of the State of Illinois, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, Thomas J. Miller, Attorney General of Iowa, State of Kansas, ex rel. Derek Schmidt, Attorney General, State of LA f/k/a Louisiana Dept. of Health, State of Maine, Consumer Protection Division Office of the Attorney General (Md.), State of Minnesota by its Attorney General, Keith Ellison, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, ex rel. Eric Schmitt, in his official capacity as Missouri Attorney General, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of New Hampshire, Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General of the State of New Jersey, Paul R. Rodriguez, Acting Director of the New Jersey Division of Consumer Affairs, State of New Mexico, ex rel. Hector Balderas, Attorney General, The People of the State of New York, by Letitia James, Attorney General of the State of New York, State of North Carolina, ex rel. Joshua H. Stein, Attorney General, State of North Dakota, ex rel. Wayne Stenehjem, Attorney General, State of Ohio, ex rel. David Yost, Ohio Attorney General, State of Oregon, ex rel. Ellen F. Rosenblum, Attorney General for the State of Oregon, The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Rhode Island, by and through Peter Neronha, Attorney General, State of South Carolina, ex rel. Alan Wilson Attorney General, State of South Dakota, ex rel. Jason Ravnsborg, South Dakota Attorney General, State of Tennessee, ex rel. Herbert H. Slatery III, Attorney General and Reporter, State of Texas, Utah Division of Consumer Protection, State of Vermont, State of Washington, State of West Virginia, ex rel. Patrick Morrisey, Attorney General, State of Wisconsin, State of Wyoming, ex rel. Bridget Hill, Attorney General, The Blackfeet Tribe of the Blackfeet Indian Reservation, The Muscogee (Creek) Nation, Citizen Potawatomi Nation, Sac & Fox Nation, Delaware Nation, Apache Tribe of Oklahoma, The Osage Nation, Pawnee Nation of Oklahoma, Thlopthlocco Tribal Town, Bullhead City, City of Glendale, City of Prescott, City of Surprise, County of Apache, County of La Paz, State of Arkansas, ex rel. Scott Ellington, County of Arkansas, County of Ashley, County of Baxter, County of Benton, County of Boone, County of Bradley, County of Calhoun, County of Chicot, County of Clark, County of Clay, County of Cleburne, County of Columbia, County of Conway, County of Craighead, County of Crawford, County of Cross, County of Dallas, County of Desha, County of Faulkner, County of Franklin, County of Fulton, County of Garland, County of Grant, County of Greene, County of Hempstead, County of Hot Spring, County of Howard, County of Independence, County of Izard, County of Jackson, County of Johnson, County of Lafayette, County of Lawrence, County of Lee, County of Lincoln, County of Little River, County of Logan, County of Lonoke, County of Madison, County of Miller, County of Mississippi, County of Monroe, County of Montgomery, County of Ouachita, County of Perry, County of Phillips, County of Pike, County of Poinsett, County of Polk, County of Pope, County of Prairie, County of Randolph, County of St. Francis, County of Saline, County of Scott, County of Searcy, County of Sebastian, County of Sevier, County of Sharp, County of Stone, County of Union, County of Van Buren, County of Washington, County of White, County of Woodruff, County of Yell, County of Carroll, County of Newton, County of Cleveland, City of Little Rock, City of Fort Smith, City of Springdale, City of Jonesboro, City of North Little Rock, City of Conway, City of Rogers, City of Pine Bluff, City of Bentonville, City of Hot Springs, City of Benton, City of Texarkana, City of Sherwood, City of Jacksonville, City of Monticello, City of El Monte, and The People of the State of California, by and through El Monte City Attorney Rick Olivarez, County of Kern, and The People of the State of California, by and through Kern County Counsel Margo Raison, The People of the State of California, acting by and through Santa Clara County Counsel James R. Williams, The People of the State of California, acting by and through Orange County District Attorney Tony Rackauckas, The People of the State of California, acting by and through Los Angeles County Counsel Mary C. Wickham, The People of the State of California, acting by and through Oakland City Attorney Barbara J. Parker, City of New Britain, The City of Ansonia, The City of Danbury, The City of Derby, The City of Norwalk, The City of Bridgeport, The Borough of Naugatuck, The Town of Southbury, The Town of Woodbury, The Town of Fairfield, The Town of Beacon Falls, The City of Milford, The City of West Haven, The Town of North Haven, The Town of Thomaston, The City of Torrington, The City of Bristol, The Town of East Hartford, The Town of Southington, The Town of Newtown, The City of Shelton, The Town of Tolland, The Town of Oxford, The City of New Haven, The City of New London, The City of Waterbury, The Town of Stratford, The Town of Berlin, The Town of Middlebury, The Town of Seymour, The Town of Prospect, The Town of Wolcott, The Town of Bethlehem, The Town of New Milford, The Town of Roxbury, The Town of Coventry, Town of Wallingford, City of Dover, a municipal corporation of the State of Delaware, City of Seaford, a municipal corporation of the State of Delaware, Kent County, a political subdivision of the State of Delaware, County of Hawai'i, County of Lake, Michael Nerheim, Lake County State's Attorney, Mark C. Curran Jr., Lake County Sheriff, Dr. Howard Cooper, Lake County Coroner, The County of Lake in the Name of the People of the State of Illinois, City of Sesser, City of Granite City, Illinois, The City of Burbank, The City of Countryside, The People of the State of Illinois and Boone County, Illinois, The People of the State of Illinois and Bureau County, Illinois, The People of the State of Illinois and Champaign County, Illinois, The People of the State of Illinois and Cook County, Illinois, The People of the State of Illinois, and DuPage County, Illinois, The People of the State of Illinois and Jersey County, Illinois, The People of the State of Illinois and LaSalle County, The People of the State of Illinois and Macon County, Illinois, The People of the State of Illinois and McLean County, Illinois, The People of the State of Illinois, and DeKalb County, Illinois, The People of the State of Illinois, and Henry County, Illinois, The People of the State of Illinois, and Kane County, Illinois, The People of the State of Illinois and Kankakee County, Illinois, The People of the State of Illinois, and Kendall County, Illinois, The People of the State of Illinois, and Macoupin County, Illinois, The People of the State of Illinois, and McHenry County, Illinois, The People of the State of Illinois, and Piatt County, Illinois, The People of the State of Illinois, and Will County, Illinois, The Village of Bedford Park, The Village of Evergreen Park, The Village of Lyons, The Village of Summit, Village of Bridgeview, Village of Hodgkins, City of Rockland, State of Maine, Knox County, State of Maine, Anne Arundel County, Maryland, Mayor & City Council of Baltimore, City of Boston, The Boston Public Health Commission, The Boston Housing Authority, City of Cambridge, City of Chicopee, City of Framingham, City of Gloucester, City of Haverhill, City of Salem, City of Worcester, Town of Canton, Town of Lynnfield, Town of Natick, Town of Randolph, Town of Springfield, Town of Wakefield, Jefferson County, Butler County, Cape Girardeau County, Christian County, City of Independence, City of Joplin, Crawford County, Dent County, Dunklin County, Franklin County, Greene County, Iron County, Jasper County, Madison County, Perry County, Ste. Genevieve County, Stone County, Taney County, Texas County, Washington County, City of Henderson, City of Las Vegas, City of North Las Vegas, City of Reno, Clark County, City of Trenton, County of Ocean, NJ, Cumberland County, The City of Albany, City of Ithaca, City of New York, City of Schenectady, City of Yonkers, County of Broome, County of Columbia, County of Dutchess, County of Erie, County of Nassau, County of Niagara, County of Orange, County of Oswego, City of Troy, County of Rensselaer, County of Saratoga, County of Herkimer, County of Schenectady, County of Schoharie, County of Seneca, County of St. Lawrence, County of Suffolk, County of Sullivan, County of Tompkins, County of Westchester, County of Montgomery, The City of Mount Vernon, The County of Cattaraugus, The County of Cayuga, The County of Chautauqua, The County of Chenango, The County of Clinton, The County of Ontario, The County of Cortland, The County of Essex, The County of Franklin, The County of Fulton, The County of Genesee, The County of Greene, The County of Hamilton, City of Plattsburgh, The County of Lewis, The County of Livingston, The County of Madison, The County of Monroe, The County of Otsego, The County of Putnam, The County of Schuyler, The County of Steuben, The County of Tioga, The County of Ulster, The County of Warren, The County of Washington, The County of Wyoming, The Town of Amherst, The Town of Cheektowaga, The Town of Lancaster, The Town of Tonawanda, The County of Fayette, Ohio, The State of Ohio ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Fayette County, Jess Weade, The County of Medina, Ohio, The State of Ohio ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Medina County, S. Forrest Thompson, Board of County Commissioners of Cleveland County, Board of County Commissioners of Coal County, Board of County Commissioners of Hughes County, Board of County Commissioners of Jackson County, Board of County Commissioners of Kay County, Board of County Commissioners of Love County, Board of County Commissioners of McCurtain County, Board of County Commissioners of Noble County, Board of County Commissioners of Okfuskee County, Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County, Board of County Commissioners of Pottawatomie County, Board of County Commissioners of Woodward County, Board of County Commissioners of Major County, Board of County Commissioners of Woods County, Board of County Commissioners of Greer County, Board of County Commissioners of LeFlore County, Board of County Commissioners of Logan County, Board of County Commissioners of Texas County, City of Anadarko, City of Burns Flat, City of Fort Cobb, City of Bethany, Commonwealth of PA, acting by and through Philadelphia District Attorney Lawrence S. Krasner, Commonwealth of PA, acting by James Martin; People of Lehigh County and Lehigh County, PA, Adams County, Armstrong County, PA, Beaver County, Pennsylvania, Bucks County, Cambria County, Pennsylvania, City of Lock Haven, City of Philadelphia, City of Pittsburgh, Clearfield County, Clinton County, County of Allegheny, County of Bradford, County of Carbon, County of Clarion, County of Cumberland, County of Erie, County of Fayette, County of Monroe, County of Tioga, County of Washington, County of Westmoreland, County of York, Dauphin County, PA, Delaware County, Franklin County, County of Greene, Pennsylvania, Lackawanna County, Pennsylvania, Lawrence County, Pennsylvania, Mahoning Township, Mercer County, Newtown Township, People of Northampton County and Northampton County, PA, Pike County, Pa., Schuylkill County, Pennsylvania, The Municipality of Norristown, The Township of West Norriton, Wampum Borough, Warrington Township, City of Charleston, City of North Charleston, County of Abbeville, County of Aiken, County of Allendale, County of Anderson, County of Bamberg, County of Barnwell, County of Beaufort, County of Calhoun, County of Cherokee, County of Chesterfield, County of Clarendon, County of Colleton, County of Dillon, County of Dorchester, County of Edgefield, County of Fairfield, County of Florence, County of Greenwood, County of Hampton, County of Horry, County of Jasper, County of Kershaw, County of Lancaster, County of Laurens, County of Lee, County of Lexington, County of Marion, County of McCormick, County of Oconee, County of Orangeburg, County of Pickens, County of Saluda, County of Sumter, County of Union, County of Williamsburg, County of York, Greenville County, Spartanburg County, Town of Mount Pleasant, Bryant C. Dunaway, in his official capacity as the District Attorney General for the Thirteenth Judicial District, TN and on behalf of all political subdivisions therein, Including Clay County, City o, Jenning H. Jones, in his official capacity as the District Attorney General for the Sixteenth Judicial District, TN and on behalf of all political subdivisions therein, including Cannon County, Town o, Robert J. Carter, in his official capacity as the District Attorney General for the Seventeenth Judicial District, TN and on behalf of all political subdivisions therein, including Bedord County, Town, Brent A. Cooper, in his official capacity as the District Attorney General for the Twenty-Second Judicial District, TN and on behalf of all political subdivisions therein, including Giles County, City, Lisa S. Zavogiannis, in her official capacity as the District Attorney General for the Thirty-First Judicial District, TN and on behalf of all political subdivisions therein, including Van Buren Count, Baby Doe, by and through his Mother, Jared Effler, in his official capacity as the District Attorney General for the Eighth Judicial District, TN, Charme Allen, in her official capacity as the District Attorney General for the Sixth Judicial District, Dave Clark, in his official capacity as the District Attorney General for the Seventh Judicial District, TN, Russell Johnson, in his official capacity as the District Attorney General for the Ninth Judicial District, TN, Stephen Crump, in his official capacity as the District Attorney General for the Tenth Judicial District, TN, Baby Doe #1, Baby Doe #2, Barry Staubus, in his official capacity as the District Attorney General for the Second Judicial District and on behalf of all political subdivisions therein, Tony Clark, in his official capacity as the District Attorney General for the First Judicial District and on behalf of all political subdivisions therein, Dan Armstrong, in his official capacity as the District Attorney General for the Third Judicial District and on behalf of all political subdivisions therein, Baby Doe, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, Shelby County, by the Shelby Board of Commissioners, City of Houston, Texas, County of Bee, County of Bexar, County of Burleson, County of Burnet, County of Cameron, County of Cass, County of Cooke, County of Coryell, County of Dallas, County of Delta, County of Dimmit, County of Ector, County of El Paso, County of Falls, County of Fannin, County of Freestone, County of Grayson, County of Harrison, County of Hidalgo, County of Hopkins, County of Houston, County of Kendall, County of Kerr, County of Liberty, County of Limestone, County of Marion, County of McMullen, County of Milam, County of Nacogdoches, County of Nueces, Nueces County Hospital District, County of Orange, County of Panola, County of Parker, County of Potter, County of Robertson, County of San Patricio, County of Shelby, County of Travis, County of Trinity, County of Van Zandt, County of Waller, County of Williamson, County of Wood, Johnson County, Cache County, Utah, Rich County, Utah, Davis County, Grand County, Iron County, Millard County, Salt Lake County, San Juan County, Sanpete County, Sevier County, Juab County, Emery County, Wayne County, Piute County, Summit County, Utah, Tooele County, Utah, Uintah County, Utah, Duscesne County, Utah, Daggett County, Utah, Tri-County Health Department, Wasatch County, Utah, Washington County, Utah, Kane County, Utah, Beaver County, Utah, Garfield County, Utah, Weber County, Utah, City of Martinsville, Virginia, Dinwiddie County, Virginia, The County Board of Arlington County, Virginia, Mecklenburg County, Brooke County Commission, Hancock County Commission, Harrison County Commission, Lewis County Commission, Marshall County Commission, Ohio County Commission, Tyler County Commission, Wetzel County Commission, The County Commission of Mason County, The County Commission of Barbour County, Mayor Chris Tatum on behalf of The Village of Barboursville, The County Commission of Taylor County, The County Commission of Webster County, Mayor Don E. McCourt, on behalf of the Town of Addison a/k/a The Town of Webster Springs, Mayor Peggy Knotts Barney, on behalf of the City of Grafton, Mayor Philip Bowers, on behalf of the City of Philippi, Monongalia County Commission, Marion County Commission, Doddridge County Commission, Randolph County Commission, Upshur County Commission, Roane County Commission, The City of Spencer, Jackson County Commission, The City of Ripley, The Town of Ravenswood, Wood County Commission, The City of Williamstown, Wirt County Commission, The Town of Elizabeth, Pleasants County Commission, City of St. Mary's, Ritchie County Commission, Town of Harrisville, West Volusia Hospital Authority, Thomas Hickey, I-Kare Treatment Center, LLC, Broward County, Florida, Cabell County Commission, City of Huntington, West Virginia, City of Chicago, City of Cleveland, County of Summit, Ohio, Summit County Public Health, The City of Akron, State of Ohio, ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney for Summit County, Sherri Bevan Walsh, The Director of Law for the City of Akron, Eve Belfance, County of Monroe, The County of Cuyahoga, Ohio, State of Ohio, ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Cuyahoga County, Michael C. O'Malley, Alexander City, Alabama, City of Oxford, Alabama, Russell County, Alabama, City of Santa Ana, The People of the State of California, by and through Santa Ana City Attorney Sonia R. Carvalho, City of Fullerton, The People of the State of California by and through Fullerton City Attorney Richard D. Jones, City of Irvine, The People of the State of California by and through Irvine City Attorney Jeffrey Melching, City of San Clemente, The People of the State of California by and through San Clemente City Attorney Scott C. Smith, City of Costa Mesa, The People of the State of California by and through Costa Mesa City Attorney Kimberly Hall Barlow, City of Westminster, The People of the State of California by and through Westminster City Attorney Richard D. Jones, County of Alameda, The People of the State of California by and through County Counsel Donna Ziegler, City of Ocala, Florida, County of Kaua'i, a political subdivision of the State of Hawaii, for themselves individually, and on behalf of all similarly situated persons, and on behalf of the general public, as a class, Howard County, Charter Township of Harrison, City of Sterling Heights, City of Warren, City of Coon Rapids, Minnesota, St. Francois County, County of Burlington, NJ, Township of Brick, City of Amsterdam, City of Auburn, City of Poughkeepsie, City of Rochester, City of Saratoga Springs, City of Ogdensburg, Board of County Commissioners of Atoka County, Board of County Commissioners of Caddo County, Board of County Commissioners of Cimarron County, Board of County Commissioners of Grady County, Board of County Commissioners of Haskell County, Board of County Commissioners of Jefferson County, Board of County Commissioners of Latimer County, City of Jenks, City of Seminole, City of Shawnee, City of Allentown, Pennsylvania, County of Duval, County of Kleberg, County of Jim Hogg, Ellis County, Rockwall County, Charlotte County, City of Emporia, City of Fredericksburg, City of Portsmouth, City of Radford, City of Waynesboro, Culpeper County, Cumberland County, Greensville County, Loudoun County, Patrick County, Prince George County, Shenandoah County, Wise County Board of Supervisors, The DCH Health Care Authority, The Healthcare Authority for Baptist Health, an affiliate of UAB Health System, Medical West Hospital Authority, an affiliate of UAB Health System, Evergreen Medical Center, LLC, Gilliard Health Services, Inc., Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Triad of Alabama, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Affinity Hospital, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Foley Hospital Corporation, The Health Care Authority of Clarke County, Alabama, BBH PBMC, LLC, BBH, WBMC, LLC, BBH SBMC, LLC, BBH CBMC, LLC, BBH BMC, LLC, Tucson Medical Center, Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc. f/k/a Takoma Hospital, Inc., Amisub (SFH), Inc., Baptist Womens Health Center, LLC, Campbell County HMA, LLC, Clarksville Health System, G.P., Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC, Cocke County HMA, LLC, Dickenson Community Hospital, Hawkins County Memorial Hospital, Jefferson County HMA, LLC, Johnston Memorial Hospital, Inc., Lebanon HMA, Inc., Lexington Hospital Corporation, Metro Knoxville HMA, LLC, Mountain States Health Alliance f/k/a Johnson City Medical Center Hospital, Inc., Northeast Tennessee Community Health Centers, Inc., Norton Community Hospital, Saint Francis Hospital--Bartlett, Inc. f/k/a Tenet Health System, Shelbyville Hospital Company, LLC f/k/a Shelbyville Hospital Corporation, Smyth County Community Hospital, Tullahoma HMA, LLC f/k/a Tullahoma HMA, Inc., Wellmont Health System f/k.a Brmc/Hvmc, Inc., Kingman Hospital, Inc., Arizona Spine and Joint Hospital LLC, Bullhead City Hospital Corporation, Carondelet St. Joseph's Hospital, Holy Cross Hospital, Inc., Hospital Development of West Phoenix, Inc., Northwest Hospital, LLC, Oro Valley Hospital, LLC, Oasis Hospital, Orthopedic and Surgical Specialty Company, LLC, St. Mary's Hospital of Tucson, VHS Acquisition Subsidiary Number 1, Inc., VHS Arrowhead, Inc., West Virginia University Hospitals Inc., Appalachian Regional Healthcare, Inc., Bluefield Hospital Company, LLC, Charleston Area Medical Center, Inc., Davis Memorial Hospital, Broaddus Hospital Association, Webster County Memorial Hospital, Inc., Grafton City Hospital, Inc., Community Health Association d/b/a Jackson General Hospital, Grant Memorial Hospital, Greenbrier VMC, LLC, Monongalia County General Hospital Company, Preston Memorial Hospital Corporation, Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc., Stonewall Jackson Memorial Hospital Company, Oak Hill Hospital Corporation d/b/a Plateau Medical Center, Camden-Clark Memorial Hospital Corporation, The Charles Town General Hospital, City Hospital, Inc., Potomac Valley Hospital of W. Va., Inc., Reynolds Memorial Hospital Inc., St. Joseph's Hospital of Buckhannon, Inc., Wetzel County Hospital Association, Williamson Memorial Hospital, LLC, Braxton County Memorial Hospital, Inc., United Hospital Center, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren Community Hospital Corporation, The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc., Arh Tug Valley Health Services Inc. f/k/a Highlands Hospital Corporation, Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc., Baptist Health Richmond, Inc., Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, West Boca Medical Center, Inc., Gary Carr, Fredrick Hill, Francisco Perez, AFSCME District Council 33 Health & Welfare Fund, AFSCME District Council 47 Health & Welfare Fund, Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local Union No. 1 of PA/DE Health and Welfare Fund, Carpenters Health & Welfare of Philadelphia & Vicinity, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 98 Health & Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 89 Sound and Communication Health & Welfare Fund, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 728 Family Healthcare Plan, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Council No. 21 Welfare Fund, Iron Workers District Council of Philadelphia and Vicinity, Benefit Fund, Philadelphia Federation of Teachers Health and Welfare Fund, The Trustees of the Unite Here Local 634 Health & Welfare Fund, UFCW Local 23 and Employers Health Fund, Western Pennsylvania Electrical Employees Insurance Trust Fund, Dallas County Hospital District d/b/a Parkland Health & Hospital System, Palo Pinto County Hospital District a/k/a Palo Pinto General Hospital, Guadalupe Valley Hospital a/k/a Guadalupe Regional Medical Center, VHS San Antonio Partners, LLC d/b/a Baptist Medical Center, Mission Trail Baptist Hospital, North Central Baptist Hospital, Northeast Baptist Hospital, and St. Lukes Baptist Hospital, Nacogdoches Medical Center, Resolute Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Resolute Health, The Hospitals of Providence East Campus, The Hospitals of Providence Memorial Campus, The Hospitals of Providence Sierra Campus, The Hospitals of Providence Transmountain Campus, VHS Brownsville Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Valley Baptist Medical Center - Brownsville, VHS Harlingen Hospital Company, LLC d/b/a Valley Baptist Medical Center, Armc, L.P. d/b/a Abilene Regional Medical Center, College Station Hospital, LP, Granbury Hospital Corporation d/b/a Lake Granbury Medical Center, Navarro Hospital, L.P. d/b/a Navarro Regional Hospital, Brownwood Hospital, L.P. d/b/a Brownwood Regional Medical Center, Victoria of Texas, L.P. d/b/a Detar Hospital Navarro and Detar Hospital North, Laredo Texas Hospital Company, L.P. d/b/a Laredo Medical Center, San Angelo Hospital, L.P. d/b/a San Angelo Community Medical Center, Cedar Park Health System, L.P. d/b/a Cedar Park Regional Medical Center, NHCI of Hillsboro, Inc. d/b/a Hill Regional Hospital, Longview Medical Center, L.P. d/b/a Longview Regional Medical Center, Piney Woods Healthcare System, L.P. d/b/a Woodland Heights Medical Center, Fire and Police Retirement Health Care Fund, San Antonio, Alicia Simonson, Alyssa Lyle, A.M.H., Amanda Gibson, Amanda Muffley, Amy Shepard, Beverly Riling, Angela Cherry, April Berzinski, Aracya Johnson, Billie Ivie, Bobbie Lou Moore, Brandi Brumbarger, Brittany Flach, Carol Lively, Caroline VonCannon, Chloe Paul, Christina Delancey, Cleveland Bakers and Teamsters Health and Welfare Fund, Pipe Fitters Local Union No. 120 Insurance Fund, Corey Means, Courtney Herring, Darren Flanagan, Elena Flanagan, Deborah Dixon, Deric Rees, Ceonda Rees, Desiree Carlson, Desirae Warren, Elizabeth Kommer, Erin Doyle, Esperenza Ellis, Farrah Williams, Gena Patterson, Gloria Cruz, Heather Goss, Heather Puckett, Jacquelynn Martinez, Jamie Johnson, Jamiee Gilson, Jenni Goldman, Jennifer Artz, Jennifer Thomas, Jenny Scully, Jessica Collier, Jessica Hampel, Jessica Perkins, Jessica Rodriguez, Jessica Taylor, Jodi Shaffer, John Doe, Katherine Whittington, Kayla Shockley, Kiana Hutchins, Kimberly Martin, Kjellsi Meinecke, Krista Gauthier, Angela Sawyers, Jessica Springborn, Lori Taylor, Maria Ortiz, Marijha Hamawi, Meghan Lara, Mechelle Gauthier, Melissa Ambrosio, Musette Chancey, Naomi Wright, Nichole Tindall, Nicole Tuttle, Niola Lechuga, Paula Watson, Penny Martin, Quincy Weatherwax, Rachel Wood, Reannan Howell, Rebecca Goforth, Roxie Whitley, Chris Denson, Diane Denson, James Holland, Teri Holland, Sally Peterson, Samantha DeMaro, Samantha McAnany, Sandra Atkinson, Shannon Hunt, Shelby L. Brant, Shelley Whittaker, Shilo Shewmake, Taylor Brooke Underwood, Tyler M. Roach, Walter Salmons, Virginia Salmons, Waikeisha Richardson, Wendy Stewart, W.E., by and through her guardian and next friend, Pamela Osborne, Pamela Osborne, Amanda Hanlon, Amy Gardner for Injunctive Relief (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (71 (Injunctive relief - reinstatement of stay)), (72 (Injunctive relief - other)) Filed by Benjamin S. Kaminetzky on behalf of Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Transdermal Technologies L.P., Purdue Pharma Manufacturing L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Purdue Pharma of Puerto Rico, Purdue Pharmaceutical Products L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, Avrio Health L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C) (Kaminetzky, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lackawanna County DA is a litigant

Latest cases where Longview Medical Center, L.P. d/b/a Longview Regional Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where CHARLESTON AREA MEDICAL CENTER INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMISUB is a litigant