This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 08/02/2020 at 06:33:54 (UTC).

Prestige Landscaping Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 Prestige Landscaping Services, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Middle Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen S. Jennemann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-BK-03154

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Karen S. Jennemann

 

Party Details

Debtor

Prestige Landscaping Services, LLC

524 Springcreek Drive

Longwood, FL 32779

Us Trustee

United States Trustee - ORL

George C Young Federal Building, 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100

Orlando, FL 32801

Trustee

Jerrett M McConnell

Jacksonville, FL 32258

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Jeffrey Ainsworth

Attorney at BransonLaw PLLC

1501 E. Concord Street

Orlando, FL 32803

Robert B Branson

Attorney at BransonLaw PLLC

1501 E. Concord Street

Orlando, FL 32803

Jacob D Flentke

Attorney at Flentke Legal Consulting, PLLC

3106 Ardsley Drive

Orlando, FL 32804

Us Trustee Attorney

Audrey M Aleskovsky

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

George C. Young Federal Building, 400 West Washington St, Suite 1100

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#39

#38

#37

#36

#35

#34

#33

#32

#31

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Financial Reports for the Period June 4, 2020 to June 30, 2020. Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Prestige Landscaping Services, LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Certificate of Service Re: Debtor's Solicitation Package including a Ballot, the Order Scheduling Hearing on Confirmation of Plan and Establishing Deadlines and the Plan of Reorganization Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Prestige Landscaping Services, LLC (related document(s)#36). (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #36)). Notice Date 07/26/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Order Scheduling Hearing on Confirmation of Plan of Reorganization, (II) Setting Deadlines with Respect to Confirmation Hearing, and (III) Setting Deadlines for Filing Adminstrative Expense Applications (related document(s)#33). Hearing scheduled for 9/8/2020 at 02:45 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Scott) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Jeffrey Ainsworth (Debtor Atty); Miriam Suarez (US Trustee Atty); Jerrett McConnell (Sub V Trustee); RULING: (Video) Continued Status Conference 1) Motion by Debtor for Authority to Use Cash Collateral and Emergency Hearing Requested (Doc #7) - Granted through September 8, 2020;Order by Ainsworth; - cont. to status conference on 9/8/2020 at 2:45 pm (AOCNFNG); 2) Debtor's Motion to Determine Secured Status/Value of FC Marketplace, LLC. Total Secured Amount Claimed: $ 34000 (Doc #22) - cont. to status conf on 9/8/2020 at 2:45 pm (AOCNFNG); Note: Debtor has filed a plan of reorganization (Doc #33); the Court will notice confirmation for 9/8/2020 at 2:45 pm.; (bt/GWW). Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Dkt) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 07/22/2020 13:22:19 ]. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Prestige Landscaping Services, LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Amended Schedule A/B with Summary and Declaration, Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required. Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Prestige Landscaping Services, LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/17/2020 (Susan). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Amended Statement of Financial Affairs and Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Prestige Landscaping Services, LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/17/2020 (Susan). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #28)). Notice Date 07/10/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral and Emergency Hearing Requested Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Prestige Landscaping Services, LLC (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/4/2020 (Maggie). (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to Reject Unexpired Lease with Canterbury Enterprises, Inc. Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Prestige Landscaping Services, LLC (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • Docket(#5) Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Prestige Landscaping Services, LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Deficient Filing. case management summary, small business balance sheet not filed . (Kerry) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketAssignment of the Honorable Karen S. Jennemann, Bankruptcy Judge to this case . (autojtr-orl, orl) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Prestige Landscaping Services, LLC. (Kerry) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketDebtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at #http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(6:20-bk-03154) [misc,volp11a2] (1717.00). Receipt Number 64486438, Amount Paid $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Fee Paid.). Schedules and Summary of Assets, Statement of Financial Affairs Disclosure of Compensation, Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Prestige Landscaping Services, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 09/1/2020. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Audrey M Aleskovsky