This case was last updated from PACER on 12/31/2020 at 06:34:45 (UTC).

PREIT Associates, L.P.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2020 PREIT Associates, L P was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen B. Owens. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-BK-12736

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Karen B. Owens

 

Party Details

Debtor

PREIT Associates, L.P.

2005 Market Street, Suite 1000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Not Classified By Court

Prime Clerk LLC

One Grand Central Place, 60 East 42Nd St, Suite 1440

New York, NY 10165

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, 844 King Street, Suite 2207, Lockbox 35

Wilmington, DE 19801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

R. Craig Martin

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1201 North Martket Street, Suite 2100

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

5 #3

Exhibit 2

5 #2

Exhibit 1

5 #1

Main Document

3 #2

Exhibit

3 #1

Main Document

#2

Exhibit A

2 #1

Main Document

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by PREIT Associates, L.P.. (Martin, R.) (Entered: 11/01/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketBankruptcy Case Closed (AJL) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Final Decree Closing Certain of the Chapter 11 Cases. Order Signed on 12/22/2020 (Mml) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • Docket(#4) Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(20-12736) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 10033947, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Related Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Bala Cynwyd Associates, LP Case No. 20-12761 (KBO); Moorestown Mall LLC Case No. 20-12791 (KBO); PR AEKI Plymouth LLC Case No. 20-12775 (KBO); PR AEKI Plymouth, LP Case No. 20-12777 (KBO); PR BVM LLC Case No. 20-12796 (KBO);PR CC I LLC Case No. 20-12778 (KBO); PR CC II LLC Case No. 20-12772 (KBO); PR CC Limited Partnership Case No. 20-12781 (KBO); PR Capital City LLC Case No. 20-12774 (KBO); PR Capital City Limited Partnership Case No. 20-12776 (KBO); PR Cherry Hill Office GP, LLC Case No. 20-12759 (KBO); PR Cumberland Outparcel LLC Case No. 20-12744 (KBO); PR Exton LLC Case No. 20-12756 (KBO); PR Exton Limited Partnership Case No. 20-12762 (KBO); PR Exton Outparcel GP, LLC Case No. 20-12755 (KBO); PR Exton Outparcel Holdings, LP Case No. 20-12758 (KBO); PR Exton Outparcel Limited Partnership Case No. 20-12760 (KBO); PR Exton Square Property L.P. Case No. 20-12773 (KBO); PR Fin Delaware LLC Case No. 20-12739 (KBO); PR Financing I LLC Case No. 20-12757 (KBO); PR Financing II LLC Case No. 20-12754 (KBO); PR Financing Limited Partnership Case No. 20-12770 (KBO); PR GV LLC Case No. 20-12742 (KBO); PR GV LP Case No. 20-12747 (KBO); PR Gainesville LLC Case No. 20-12779 (KBO); PR Gainesville Limited Partnership Case No. 20-12749 (KBO); PR Hyattsville LLC Case No. 20-12784 (KBO); PR JK LLC Case No. 20-12763 (KBO); PR Jacksonville LLC Case No. 20-12765 (KBO); PR Jacksonville Limited Partnership Case No. 20-12768 (KBO); PR Magnolia LLC Case No. 20-12753 (KBO); PR Monroe Old Trail Holdings, L.P. Case No. 20-12803 (KBO); PR Monroe Old Trail Holdings, LLC Case No. 20-12802 (KBO); PR Monroe Old Trail Limited Partnership Case No. 20-12801 (KBO); PR Monroe Old Trail, LLC Case No. 20-12800 (KBO); PR Moorestown Anchor-L&T, LLC Case No. 20-12743 (KBO); PR Moorestown Anchor-M LLC Case No. 20-12792 (KBO); PR Moorestown LLC Case No. 20-12786 (KBO); PR Moorestown Limited Partnership Case No. 20-12790 (KBO); PR PM PC Associates LLC Case No. 20-12793 (KBO); PR PM PC Associates LP Case No. 20-12794 (KBO); PR Plymouth Anchor-M, L.P. Case No. 20-12787 (KBO); PR Plymouth Anchor-M, LLC Case No. 20-12785 (KBO); PR Plymouth Meeting Associates PC LP Case No. 20-12795 (KBO); PR Plymouth Meeting LLC Case No. 20-12780 (KBO); PR Plymouth Meeting Limited Partnership Case No. 20-12783 (KBO); PR Prince George's Plaza LLC Case No. 20-12782 (KBO); PR Springfield Town Center LLC Case No. 20-12741 (KBO); PR Sunrise Outparcel 2, LLC Case No. 20-12799 (KBO); PR Swedes Square LLC Case No. 20-12750 (KBO); PR TP LLC Case No. 20-12746 (KBO); PR TP LP Case No. 20-12751 (KBO); PR Valley Anchor-M Limited Partnership Case No. 20-12789 (KBO); PR Valley Anchor-M, LLC Case No. 20-12788 (KBO); PR Valley Anchor-S, LLC Case No. 20-12748 (KBO); PR Valley LLC Case No. 20-12764 (KBO); PR Valley Limited Partnership Case No. 20-12766 (KBO); PR Valley Solar LLC Case No. 20-12797 (KBO); PR Valley View Anchor-M Limited Partnership Case No. 20-12804 (KBO); PR Valley View Anchor-M, LLC Case No. 20-12752 (KBO); PR Valley View OP-DSG/CEC, LLC Case No. 20-12740 (KBO); PR Woodland Anchor-S, LLC Case No. 20-12745 (KBO); PREIT Associates, L.P. Case No. 20-12736 (KBO); PREIT-RUBIN OP, Inc. Case No. 20-12798 (KBO); PREIT-RUBIN, Inc. Case No. 20-12738 (KBO); Pennsylvania Real Estate Investment Trust Case No. 20-12737 (KBO); Plymouth Ground Associates LLC Case No. 20-12769 (KBO); Plymouth Ground Associates, LP Case No. 20-12771 (KBO); XGP LLC Case No. 20-12767 (KBO); All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed, in and all further docket entries shall be made in, Pennsylvania Real Estate Investment Trust, Case No. 20-12737 (KBO). (Related Document Nos. #2)Signed on 11/2/2020 (CB) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Bala Cynwyd Associates, LP, Moorestown Mall LLC, PR AEKI Plymouth LLC, PR AEKI Plymouth, LP, PR BVM LLC, PR CC I LLC, PR CC II LLC, PR CC Limited Partnership, PR Capital City LLC, PR Capital City Limited Partnership, PR Cherry Hill Office GP, LLC, PR Cumberland Outparcel LLC, PR Exton LLC, PR Exton Limited Partnership, PR Exton Outparcel GP, LLC, PR Exton Outparcel Holdings, LP, PR Exton Outparcel Limited Partnership, PR Exton Square Property L.P., PR Fin Delaware LLC, PR Financing I LLC, PR Financing II LLC, PR Financing Limited Partnership, PR GV LLC, PR GV LP, PR Gainesville LLC, PR Gainesville Limited Partnership, PR Hyattsville LLC, PR JK LLC, PR Jacksonville LLC, PR Jacksonville Limited Partnership, PR Magnolia LLC, PR Monroe Old Trail Holdings, L.P., PR Monroe Old Trail Holdings, LLC, PR Monroe Old Trail Limited Partnership, PR Monroe Old Trail, LLC, PR Moorestown Anchor-L&T, LLC, PR Moorestown Anchor-M LLC, PR Moorestown LLC, PR Moorestown Limited Partnership, PR PM PC Associates LLC, PR PM PC Associates LP, PR Plymouth Anchor-M, L.P., PR Plymouth Anchor-M, LLC, PR Plymouth Meeting Associates PC LP, PR Plymouth Meeting LLC, PR Plymouth Meeting Limited Partnership, PR Prince George's Plaza LLC, PR Springfield Town Center LLC, PR Sunrise Outparcel 2, LLC, PR Swedes Square LLC, PR TP LLC, PR TP LP, PR Valley Anchor-M Limited Partnership, PR Valley Anchor-M, LLC, PR Valley Anchor-S, LLC, PR Valley LLC, PR Valley Limited Partnership, PR Valley Solar LLC, PR Valley View Anchor-M Limited Partnership, PR Valley View Anchor-M, LLC, PR Valley View OP-DSG/CEC, LLC, PR Woodland Anchor-S, LLC, PREIT Associates, L.P., PREIT-RUBIN OP, Inc., PREIT-RUBIN, Inc., Pennsylvania Real Estate Investment Trust, Plymouth Ground Associates LLC, Plymouth Ground Associates, LP, XGP LLC. (Martin, R.) (Entered: 11/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2020
  • DocketJudge Karen B. Owens added to case (BA) (Entered: 11/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by PREIT Associates, L.P.. (Martin, R.) (Entered: 11/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Prime Clerk LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer R. Craig Martin