This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 12/14/2021 at 06:33:01 (UTC).

Casey Joyce All America Post 4380

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 Casey Joyce All America Post 4380 was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Eastern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Brenda T. Rhoades. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-BK-41459

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Brenda T. Rhoades

 

Party Details

Debtors

Plano VFW Post 4380, Veterans of Foreign Wars of t

Plano VFW Post 4380, Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States of America

Plano, TX 75094-1034

Casey Joyce All America Post 4380

P.O. Box 1034

Plano, TX 75094-1034

Us Trustee

US Trustee

110 N. College Ave., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

Trustee

BEHROOZ (SBRA V) P. Vida

Arlington, TX 76006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

John E. Mitchell

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman

525 W Monroe

Chicago, IL 60661

Amber G. Bennett

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

2121 North Pearl Street, Suite 1100

Dallas, TX 75201

Us Trustee Attorney

Marcus Salitore

Attorney at US Trustee Office

110 N. College Ave., Room 300

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#25 Order Approving the Employment of Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP as Counsel to the Debtor (RE: related document(s)#21 Application to Employ Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP as Counsel to the Debtor Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Casey Joyce All America Post 4380 . (slt) Modified on 12/7/2021 (slt).). Notice Date 12/08/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#25

(#25) Order Approving the Employment of Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP as Counsel to the Debtor (RE: related document(s)#21 Application to Employ Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP as Counsel to the Debtor Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Casey Joyce All America Post 4380 . (slt) Modified on 12/7/2021 (slt). (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#24

(#24) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#23 Order Striking Deficient Proof of Claim 1 from Claims Registry (lc)). Notice Date 12/03/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#23

(#23) Order Striking Deficient Proof of Claim 1 from Claims Registry (lc) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

21 #4

Service List

21 #3

Proposed Order

21 #2

Exhibit A - Affidavit ISO Application to Employ

21 #1

Main Document

#11

***Original***Declaration for Electronic Filing In Re: (RE: related document(s)#12 Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; (3) the attorney will forward the originally signed declaration to the Court upon receipt; and (4) the attorney has advised the debtor that any failure to file with the court the originally signed declaration could result in the dismissal of the case. Filed by Casey Joyce All America Post 4380 (RE: related document(s)#11 Amended Voluntary Petition. Amendment:Correcting the Debtor's name and EIN number, Amended Statement of Financial Affairs, Amended Schedules Filed: Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Amendment: Correcting the Debtor's name and EIN number Filed by Casey Joyce All America Post 4380 (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Plano VFW Post 4380, Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States of America, Document Due 10/22/2021. filed by Debtor Plano VFW Post 4380, Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States of America). Document Due 11/3/2021.Document Due 11/3/2021. filed by Debtor Casey Joyce All America Post 4380).). (pr) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

6 #3

Proposed Order

6 #2

Exhibit A - Pro hac Application - A. Bennett

6 #1

Main Document

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: John E. Mitchell) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Pleadings Filed by Plano VFW Post 4380, Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States of America (Mitchell, John) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Amount Charged $ 0.00 Amount Paid $ 0.00 Filed by Plano VFW Post 4380, Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States of America (Mitchell, John) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#3

(#7) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#3 A telephonic status hearing pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 1188 will be held on 11/30/2021 at 10:00 AM to consider and act upon the Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Plano VFW Post 4380, Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States of America filed as document number #1. Debtor shall file a Pre-Hearing Report pursuant to 11 U.S.C Sec. 1188(c) by 11/16/2021.). Notice Date 10/24/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/24/2021)

#2

Affidavit

2 #1

Main Document

#1

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#25 Order Approving the Employment of Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP as Counsel to the Debtor (RE: related document(s)#21 Application to Employ Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP as Counsel to the Debtor Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Casey Joyce All America Post 4380 . (slt) Modified on 12/7/2021 (slt).). Notice Date 12/08/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Order Approving the Employment of Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP as Counsel to the Debtor (RE: related document(s)#21 Application to Employ Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP as Counsel to the Debtor Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Casey Joyce All America Post 4380 . (slt) Modified on 12/7/2021 (slt). (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#23 Order Striking Deficient Proof of Claim 1 from Claims Registry (lc)). Notice Date 12/03/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Order Striking Deficient Proof of Claim 1 from Claims Registry (lc) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketHearing Held: Status Hearing Held- No order due . (RE: related document(s) #3 A telephonic status hearing pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 1188 will be held on 11/30/2021 at 10:00 AM to consider and act upon the Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Plano VFW Post 4380, Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States of America filed as document number 1. Debtor shall file a Pre-Hearing Report pursuant to 11 U.S.C Sec. 1188(c) by 11/16/2021.). (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketHearing Held: Status Hearing Held- No order due . (RE: related document(s) #1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Plano VFW Post 4380, Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States of America, Document Due 10/22/2021.). (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Original***Declaration for Electronic Filing In Re: (RE: related document(s)#12 Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; (3) the attorney will forward the originally signed declaration to the Court upon receipt; and (4) the attorney has advised the debtor that any failure to file with the court the originally signed declaration could result in the dismissal of the case. Filed by Casey Joyce All America Post 4380 (RE: related document(s)#11 Amended Voluntary Petition. Amendment:Correcting the Debtor's name and EIN number, Amended Statement of Financial Affairs, Amended Schedules Filed: Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Amendment: Correcting the Debtor's name and EIN number Filed by Casey Joyce All America Post 4380 (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Plano VFW Post 4380, Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States of America, Document Due 10/22/2021. filed by Debtor Plano VFW Post 4380, Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States of America). Document Due 11/3/2021.Document Due 11/3/2021. filed by Debtor Casey Joyce All America Post 4380).). (pr) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketMeeting of Creditors Held & Concluded On 11/19/2021 Filed by US Trustee (Salitore, Marcus) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Operating Report for Filing Period October 15, 2021 - October 31, 2021 Filed by Casey Joyce All America Post 4380 (Mitchell, John) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Application to Employ Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP as Counsel to the Debtor Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Casey Joyce All America Post 4380 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit ISO Application to Employ #2 Proposed Order #3 Service List) (Mitchell, John) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Proofs of Claims due by 12/27/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 4/13/2022. (sd) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#3 A telephonic status hearing pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 1188 will be held on 11/30/2021 at 10:00 AM to consider and act upon the Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Plano VFW Post 4380, Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States of America filed as document number #1. Debtor shall file a Pre-Hearing Report pursuant to 11 U.S.C Sec. 1188(c) by 11/16/2021.). Notice Date 10/24/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion by (Attorney: Amber G. Bennett) to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amber G. Bennett Filed by Plano VFW Post 4380, Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pro hac Application - A. Bennett #2 Proposed Order) (Mitchell, John) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: John E. Mitchell) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Pleadings Filed by Plano VFW Post 4380, Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States of America (Mitchell, John) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Amount Charged $ 0.00 Amount Paid $ 0.00 Filed by Plano VFW Post 4380, Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States of America (Mitchell, John) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) A telephonic status hearing pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 1188 will be held on 11/30/2021 at 10:00 AM to consider and act upon the Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Plano VFW Post 4380, Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States of America filed as document number #1. Debtor shall file a Pre-Hearing Report pursuant to 11 U.S.C Sec. 1188(c) by 11/16/2021. (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice To Trustee Behrooz Vida Of Selection And Appointment With Trustee's Acceptance. Filed by US Trustee (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Salitore, Marcus) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Original***Declaration for Electronic Filing In Re: (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Plano VFW Post 4380, Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States of America, Document Due 10/22/2021. filed by Debtor Plano VFW Post 4380, Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States of America). (dc) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-41459) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A12212999, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Plano VFW Post 4380, Veterans of Foreign Wars of the United States of America, Document Due 10/22/2021.(Mitchell, John) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcus Salitore