This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 09/06/2021 at 06:31:25 (UTC).

Pipeline Foods, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 Pipeline Foods, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen B. Owens. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-BK-11002

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Karen B. Owens

 

Party Details

Debtor

Pipeline Foods, LLC

6499 University Avenue Nesuite 200

Fridley, MN 55432

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building

844 King Street, SU 2207

Not Classified By Court

Stretto

410 Exchange, Ste 100

Irvine, CA 92602

Reliable Companies

1007 North Orange Streetsuite 110

Wilmington, DE 19801

Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Pipeline Foods, LLC, et al.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Barry A. Chatz

Attorney at Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP

161 North Clark Street, Suite 4200

Chicago, IL 60601

Monique Bair DiSabatino

Attorney at Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP

1201 N. Market Street, Suite 2300P.O. Box 1266

Wilmington, DE 19899

David A. Golin

Attorney at Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP

161 N. Clark Street, Suite 4200

Chicago, IL 60601

Matthew P. Milana

Attorney at Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP

1201 North Market Street, Suite 2300P.O. Box 1266

Wilmington, DE 19899

Christopher S. Naveja

Attorney at Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP

161 North Clark Streetsuite 4200

Chicago, IL 60601

Mark Minuti

Attorney at Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP

1201 N. Market Street, Suite 2300P.O. Box 1266

Wilmington, DE 19899

Us Trustee Attorney

Jane M. Leamy

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Trustee

844 King St.Suite 2207

Wilmington, DE 19801

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Kevin G. Collins

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

1000 N. West Streetsuite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kevin C. Driscoll, Jr.

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg

1 North Wacker, # 4400

Chicago, IL 60526

Connie A. Lahn

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

225 South Sixth Street, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Molly N. Sigler

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

225 South Sixth Street, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

400 #4

Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives

400 #3

Exhibit B - Suminter Contract

400 #2

Exhibit A - Agri Exim Contract

400 #1

Main Document

#399

396 #3

Exhibit B - Blackline Settlement Agreement

396 #2

Exhibit A - Revised Exhibit 1 to Proposed Order

396 #1

Main Document

393 #4

Exhibit B - Mar Declaration

8 #1

Main Document

7 #2

Exhibit A - Proposed Order

7 #1

Main Document

#6

#5

4 #2

Certificate of Service

4 #1

Main Document

3 #1

Main Document

#1

790 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#400) Adversary case 21-51033. Complaint for (I) Turnover of Estate Property and an Accounting Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 542(a) or, Alternatively, for Breach of Contract and Conversion, and (II) for Damages for Defendants Violations of the Automatic Stay of 11 U.S.C. 362(a) by Pipeline Foods, LLC against Agri Exim DCMM, Suminter India Organics Pvt. Ltd.. Fee Amount $350 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agri Exim Contract #2 Exhibit B - Suminter Contract #3 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives) (Demmy, John) (Entered: 09/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#399) Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Notice of Filing of Revised Exhibit to Proposed Order to Motion of Debtors for Approval of Settlement Among Pipeline Foods, LLC and Illinois Union Insurance Company Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 (Docket No. 396). Filed by Stretto. (related document(s)#396) (Betance, Sheryl) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#398) Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing of Revised Exhibit to Proposed Order to Tenth Omnibus Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Rejection of Certain Executory Contracts (related document(s)#393) Filed by Pipeline Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Revised Exhibit 1 - Rejected Purchase Contracts) (Milana, Matthew) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#397) Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Pipeline Foods, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 9/8/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (DiSabatino, Monique) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#396) Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing of Revised Exhibit to Proposed Order to Motion of Debtors for Approval of Settlement Among Pipeline Foods, LLC and Illinois Union Insurance Company Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 (related document(s)#387) Filed by Pipeline Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Revised Exhibit 1 to Proposed Order #2 Exhibit B - Blackline Settlement Agreement) (Milana, Matthew) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#395) Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Notice of Stipulation Establishing Procedures for Michigan Grain Sellers to Sell Grain and Mitigate Damages (Docket No. 379), Motion of the Debtors for Shortened Notice of Stipulation Establishing Procedures for Michigan Grain Sellers to Sell Grain and Mitigate Damages (Docket No. 380), Notice of Withdrawal of Motion of the Debtors for Shortened Notice of Stipulation Establishing Procedures for Michigan Grain Sellers to Sell Grain and Mitigate Damages (Docket No. 381), Motion of the Debtors for Shortened Notice of Stipulation Establishing Procedures for Michigan Grain Sellers to Sell Grain and Mitigate Damages (Docket No. 382), Report by SierraConstellation Partners, LLC of Compensation Earned and Expenses Incurred for the Period of July 9, 2021 Through July 31, 2021 (Docket No. 383), Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Establishing Deadlines for Filing Proofs of Claim, Including Section 503(b)(9) Claims, and (II) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof (Docket No. 384), Order Granting Shortened Notice of Stipulation Establishing Procedures for Michigan Grain Sellers to Sell Grain and Mitigate Damages (Docket No. 385), Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Approving Key Employee Retention Plan and Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 386), Motion of Debtors for Approval of Settlement Among Pipeline Foods, LLC and Illinois Union Insurance Company Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 (Docket No. 387), Fifth Omnibus Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Rejection of Certain Executory Contracts (Docket No. 388), Sixth Omnibus Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Rejection of Certain Executory Contracts (Docket No. 389), Seventh Omnibus Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Rejection of Certain Executory Contracts (Docket No. 390), Eighth Omnibus Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Rejection of Certain Executory Contracts (Docket No. 391), Ninth Omnibus Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Rejection of Certain Executory Contracts (Docket No. 392), Tenth Omnibus Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Rejection of Certain Executory Contracts (Docket No. 393). Filed by Stretto. (related document(s)#379, #380, #381, #382, #383, #384, #385, #386, #387, #388, #389, #390, #391, #392, #393) (Betance, Sheryl) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#394) Request for Removal from Mailing List Filed by RTW Logistics, Inc.. (Shankman, Paul) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#393) Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Tenth Omnibus Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Rejection of Certain Executory Contracts Filed by Pipeline Foods, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 9/22/2021 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 9/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order #3 Exhibit B - Mar Declaration) (DiSabatino, Monique) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#392) Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Ninth Omnibus Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Rejection of Certain Executory Contracts Filed by Pipeline Foods, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 9/22/2021 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 9/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order #3 Exhibit B - Mar Declaration) (DiSabatino, Monique) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#391) Eighth Omnibus Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Rejection of Certain Executory Contracts. Filed by Pipeline Foods, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 9/22/2021 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 9/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order #3 Exhibit B - Mar Declaration) (DiSabatino, Monique) Modified Text on 9/2/2021 (LB). (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
391 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to File a Consolidated Creditor Matrix, and (II) Authorizing the Debtors to File a Consolidated List of the Debtors' 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed By Pipeline Foods, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Minuti, Mark) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion for Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Filed By Pipeline Foods, LLC Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2021 at 09:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(DiSabatino, Monique) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Affidavit/Declaration in Support of First Day Motion Omnibus Declaration of Winston Mar in Support of Debtors' Initial Emergency First Day Motions and Related Relief Filed By Pipeline Foods, LLC (Minuti, Mark) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance. Filed by Victor A Sahn. (Sahn, Victor) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance. Filed by Ford Motor Credit Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Pak, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketAttorney Matthew G. Summers and Laurel D. Roglen for Bar ALE, Inc. added to case Filed by Bar ALE, Inc.. (Roglen, Laurel) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance. Filed by Bar ALE, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Roglen, Laurel) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docket(#2) Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-11002) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A10398148, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketJudge Karen B. Owens added to case (LB) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Pipeline Foods, LLC. (Minuti, Mark) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stretto is a litigant

Latest cases where Reliable Companies is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Grant Collins