This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 05/08/2023 at 06:23:49 (UTC).

PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. v. The Hebrew University of Jerusalem et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against The Hebrew University of Jerusalem. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New York Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Cecelia G. Morris. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-AP-01190

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Cecelia G. Morris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Defendants

The Hebrew University of Jerusalem

Yissum Research Development Company of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem Ltd.

Ben-Gurion University of the Negev

B.G. Negev Technologies and Applications Ltd.

Weizmann Institute of Science

Bar Ilan University

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David J. Sheehan

Fernando A Bohorquez

Defendant Attorney

Emil A. Kleinhaus

 

Court Documents

#78

(#78) Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Bankruptcy Rule 7012(b) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) (Related Doc #16) signed on 4/5/2023. (DuBois, Linda) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

#74

(#74) Memorandum Decision GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Dismiss signed on 3/28/2023. (related document(s)#16) (DuBois, Linda) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

#67

No Description Available

#65

No Description Available

#58

No Description Available

#57

No Description Available

#50

No Description Available

#49

No Description Available

#48

No Description Available

#47

No Description Available

#46

No Description Available

#45

No Description Available

#42

No Description Available

#41

No Description Available

40 #3

Exhibit 33

40 #2

Exhibit 16

40 #1

Main Document

105 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2023
  • Docket(#80) Pending Deadlines Terminated RE: Pre Trial Conference; hearing not held, Stricken Moot; Adversary Proceeding Closed. (VanessaAshmeade) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • Docket(#79) Pending Deadlines Terminated RE: Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by B.G. Negev Technologies and Applications Ltd., Bar Ilan University, Ben-Gurion University of the Negev, The Hebrew University of Jerusalem, Weizmann Institute of Science, Yissum Research Development Company of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem Ltd. (related doc. 16); hearing not held; motion and related opposition and reply stricken moot; see doc.78 for order. (VanessaAshmeade) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketAdversary Case 1:21-ap-1190 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (DuBois, Linda) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Bankruptcy Rule 7012(b) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) (Related Doc #16) signed on 4/5/2023. (DuBois, Linda) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • Docket(#77) Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Reply to Motion (related document(s)16) filed by Emil A. Kleinhaus on behalf of B.G. Negev Technologies and Applications Ltd., Bar Ilan University, Ben-Gurion University of the Negev, The Hebrew University of Jerusalem, Weizmann Institute of Science, Yissum Research Development Company of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem Ltd; hearing not held and adjourned to 05/17/2023 at 08:30 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM) (VanessaAshmeade) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • Docket(#76) Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Opposition /Trustee's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (related document(s)16) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC; hearing not held and adjourned for record purposes only to 05/17/2023 at 08:30 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM) (VanessaAshmeade) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: (related document(s): #16 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by B.G. Negev Technologies and Applications Ltd., Bar Ilan University, Ben-Gurion University of the Negev, The Hebrew University of Jerusalem, Weizmann Institute of Science, Yissum Research Development Company of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem Ltd.; hearing not held and adjourned for record purposes only to 05/17/2023 at 08:30 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM) (VanessaAshmeade) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) Memorandum Decision GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Dismiss signed on 3/28/2023. (related document(s)#16) (DuBois, Linda) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • Docket(#73) Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Reply to Motion (related document(s)16) filed by Emil A. Kleinhaus on behalf of B.G. Negev Technologies and Applications Ltd., Bar Ilan University, Ben-Gurion University of the Negev, The Hebrew University of Jerusalem, Weizmann Institute of Science, Yissum Research Development Company of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem Ltd; (related document(s): [55; Hearing Not Held, Written Decision Forthcoming; Adjourned for Record Purposes Only to 04/19/2023 at 07:30 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM) (VanessaAshmeade) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • Docket(#72) Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Opposition /Trustee's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (related document(s)16) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC (related document(s): 44 ; Hearing Not Held, Written Decision Forthcoming; Adjourned for Record Purposes Only to 04/19/2023 at 07:30 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM) (VanessaAshmeade) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Emil A. Kleinhaus on behalf of B.G. Negev Technologies and Applications Ltd., Bar Ilan University, Ben-Gurion University of the Negev, The Hebrew University of Jerusalem, Weizmann Institute of Science, Yissum Research Development Company of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem Ltd.. (Kleinhaus, Emil) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Stipulation and Order signed on 12/8/2021. (DuBois, Linda) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Pre-Trial Conference; hearing not held and adjourned to 3/16/2022 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM) (Ashmeade, Vanessa). (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Service (related document(s)#5) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Pre-Trial Conference filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/16/2022 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Service (Summons and Complaint) (related document(s)#2, #1) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Stipulation and Order signed on 10/20/2021. (DuBois, Linda) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/17/2021 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM). Answer due within 30 days after issuance or if outside the U.S., within 30 days from the date served. (Kinchen, Gwen) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Complaint(# 21-01190-cgm) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A15509270. Fee amount 350.00. (Re: Doc #1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 21-01190. Complaint against The Hebrew University of Jerusalem, Yissum Research Development Company of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem Ltd., Ben-Gurion University of the Negev, B.G. Negev Technologies and Applications Ltd., Weizmann Institute of Science, Bar Ilan University (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E #6 Exhibit F) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less