This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 08/03/2022 at 08:10:30 (UTC).

PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. v. The Hebrew University of Jerusalem et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against The Hebrew University of Jerusalem. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New York Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Cecelia G. Morris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-AP-01190

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Cecelia G. Morris

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L.

IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Defendants

The Hebrew University of Jerusalem

Yissum Research Development Company of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem Ltd.

Ben-Gurion University of the Negev

B.G. Negev Technologies and Applications Ltd.

Weizmann Institute of Science

Bar Ilan University

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Fernando A Bohorquez

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

David J. Sheehan

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Defendant Attorney

Emil A. Kleinhaus

Attorney at Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#42

(#42) Stipulation and Order signed on 7/21/2022. (DuBois, Linda) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#41

(#41) Certificate of Service (related document(s)#40) Filed by Fernando A Bohorquez on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Bohorquez, Fernando) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

40 #3

Exhibit 33

40 #2

Exhibit 16

40 #1

Main Document

#39

(#39) Certificate of Service (related document(s)#38, #36, #37) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

37 #35

Exhibit 32

37 #33

Exhibit 30

37 #21

Exhibit 18

#3

#2

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

#1

Main Document

93 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Stipulation and Order signed on 7/21/2022. (DuBois, Linda) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Certificate of Service (related document(s)#40) Filed by Fernando A Bohorquez on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Bohorquez, Fernando) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Amended Declaration of Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr. in Support of Trustee's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Fernando A Bohorquez on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16 #2 Exhibit 33) (Bohorquez, Fernando) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Certificate of Service (related document(s)#38, #36, #37) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Declaration of Retired Judge Varda Alshech (related document(s)#36) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Declaration of Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr. in Support of Trustee's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (related document(s)#36) filed by Fernando A Bohorquez on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1) #2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2) #3 Exhibit 2 #4 Exhibit 3 (Part 1) #5 Exhibit 3 (Part 2) #6 Exhibit 4 #7 Exhibit 5 #8 Exhibit 6 #9 Exhibit 7 #10 Exhibit 8 #11 Exhibit 9 #12 Exhibit 10 #13 Exhibit 11 #14 Exhibit 12 #15 Exhibit 13 #16 Exhibit 14 #17 Exhibit 15 #18 Exhibit 16 #19 Exhibit 17 #20 Exhibit 18 #21 Exhibit 19 #22 Exhibit 20 #23 Exhibit 21 #24 Exhibit 22 #25 Exhibit 23 #26 Exhibit 24 #27 Exhibit 25 #28 Exhibit 26 #29 Exhibit 27 #30 Exhibit 28 #31 Exhibit 29 #32 Exhibit 30 #33 Exhibit 31 #34 Exhibit 32 #35 Exhibit 33 #36 Exhibit 34 #37 Exhibit 35 #38 Exhibit 36 #39 Exhibit 37 #40 Exhibit 38 #41 Exhibit 39 #42 Exhibit 40 #43 Exhibit 41) (Bohorquez, Fernando) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Opposition /Trustee's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (related document(s)#16) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Stipulation and Order signed on 6/13/2022. (DuBois, Linda) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Certificate of Service of the Letter to the Honorable Cecelia G. Morris Requesting Enlargement of Page Limitation for the Trustee's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (related document(s)#33) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Letter to the Honorable Cecelia G. Morris Requesting Enlargement of Page Limitation for the Trustee's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Emil A. Kleinhaus on behalf of B.G. Negev Technologies and Applications Ltd., Bar Ilan University, Ben-Gurion University of the Negev, The Hebrew University of Jerusalem, Weizmann Institute of Science, Yissum Research Development Company of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem Ltd.. (Kleinhaus, Emil) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Stipulation and Order signed on 12/8/2021. (DuBois, Linda) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Pre-Trial Conference; hearing not held and adjourned to 3/16/2022 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM) (Ashmeade, Vanessa). (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Service (related document(s)#5) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Pre-Trial Conference filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/16/2022 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Service (Summons and Complaint) (related document(s)#2, #1) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Stipulation and Order signed on 10/20/2021. (DuBois, Linda) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/17/2021 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM). Answer due within 30 days after issuance or if outside the U.S., within 30 days from the date served. (Kinchen, Gwen) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Complaint(# 21-01190-cgm) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A15509270. Fee amount 350.00. (Re: Doc #1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 21-01190. Complaint against The Hebrew University of Jerusalem, Yissum Research Development Company of the Hebrew University of Jerusalem Ltd., Ben-Gurion University of the Negev, B.G. Negev Technologies and Applications Ltd., Weizmann Institute of Science, Bar Ilan University (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E #6 Exhibit F) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Picard, as Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard is a litigant

Latest cases where Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, Securities Investor Protection Corporation, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David J. Sheehan