This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 11/02/2021 at 06:32:07 (UTC).

Philippine Airlines, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 Philippine Airlines, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New York Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Shelley C. Chapman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-BK-11569

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Shelley C. Chapman

 

Party Details

Debtor

Philippine Airlines, Inc.

Diosdado Macapagal Ave., Ccp Complexpasay City 1300, Metro Manila

Us Trustee

United States Trustee

U.S. Federal Office Building

201 Varick Street, RO 1006

Not Classified By Court

Kurtzman Carson Consultants

222 N. Pacific Coast Highwaysuite 300

El Segundo, CA 90245

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Jasmine Ball

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Nick S. Kaluk, III

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Elie Jonathan Worenklein

Attorney at Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#235

(#235) Certificate of Mailing of Claims Agent re Various Documents Served on October 29, 2021 (related document(s)#229, #225, #227, #224, #230, #228) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#234

(#234) Statement Periodic Report Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2015.3 filed by Jasmine Ball on behalf of Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Ball, Jasmine) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#233

(#233) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice and Service of Papers filed by Dennis D. Miller on behalf of IP Woodstock One Bay LLC. (Miller, Dennis) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#230

(#230) Affidavit Ordinary Course Professional Declaration of Hogan Lovells US LLP Filed by Jasmine Ball on behalf of Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Ball, Jasmine) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#229

(#229) Affidavit and Disclosure Statement of Michael Urbani, on Behalf of Stikeman Elliott LLP Filed by Jasmine Ball on behalf of Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Ball, Jasmine) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#228

(#228) Affidavit and Disclosure Statement of Richard Jeremy Gimblett, on Behalf of Holman Fenwick Willan Middle East LLP Filed by Jasmine Ball on behalf of Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Ball, Jasmine) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#227

(#227) Affidavit and Disclosure Statement of Mert Ozkan Hifzi, on Behalf of Holman Fenwick Willan Singapore LLP Filed by Jasmine Ball on behalf of Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Ball, Jasmine) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#225

(#232) Amended Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Between Debtor and Counterparties Concerning Certain Equipment (related document(s)#225, #128) filed by Jasmine Ball on behalf of Philippine Airlines, Inc.. with presentment to be held on 11/8/2021 at 12:00 PM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC) Objections due by 11/5/2021, (Ball, Jasmine) (Entered: 10/31/2021)

#224

(#235) Certificate of Mailing of Claims Agent re Various Documents Served on October 29, 2021 (related document(s)#229, #225, #227, #224, #230, #228) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

320 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#235) Certificate of Mailing of Claims Agent re Various Documents Served on October 29, 2021 (related document(s)#229, #225, #227, #224, #230, #228) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#234) Statement Periodic Report Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2015.3 filed by Jasmine Ball on behalf of Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Ball, Jasmine) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#233) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice and Service of Papers filed by Dennis D. Miller on behalf of IP Woodstock One Bay LLC. (Miller, Dennis) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#232) Amended Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Between Debtor and Counterparties Concerning Certain Equipment (related document(s)#225, #128) filed by Jasmine Ball on behalf of Philippine Airlines, Inc.. with presentment to be held on 11/8/2021 at 12:00 PM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC) Objections due by 11/5/2021, (Ball, Jasmine) (Entered: 10/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#231) Certificate of Mailing of Claims Agent (Supplemental) re Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case (related document(s)#82) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#230) Affidavit Ordinary Course Professional Declaration of Hogan Lovells US LLP Filed by Jasmine Ball on behalf of Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Ball, Jasmine) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#229) Affidavit and Disclosure Statement of Michael Urbani, on Behalf of Stikeman Elliott LLP Filed by Jasmine Ball on behalf of Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Ball, Jasmine) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#228) Affidavit and Disclosure Statement of Richard Jeremy Gimblett, on Behalf of Holman Fenwick Willan Middle East LLP Filed by Jasmine Ball on behalf of Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Ball, Jasmine) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#227) Affidavit and Disclosure Statement of Mert Ozkan Hifzi, on Behalf of Holman Fenwick Willan Singapore LLP Filed by Jasmine Ball on behalf of Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Ball, Jasmine) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#226) Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Authorizing Debtor to Reject Certain Unexpired Leases with Aircraft Counterparties and to Abandon Certain Aircraft (related document(s)#129) filed by Jasmine Ball on behalf of Philippine Airlines, Inc.. with presentment to be held on 11/8/2021 (check with court for location) Objections due by 11/5/2021, (Ball, Jasmine) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
227 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion to Impose Automatic Stay Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order Confirming (I) Authority to Operate Its Business in the Ordinary Course and (II) Implementation of the Automatic Stay filed by Jasmine Ball on behalf of Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Ball, Jasmine) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion to Authorize Debtor's Motion for Interim and Final Orders for Authority to Enter Into, Continue Performance and Provide Credit Support under Hedging and Derivative Contracts filed by Jasmine Ball on behalf of Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Ball, Jasmine) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion to Authorize Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Granting Administrative Expense Status to Debtor's Undisputed Obligations to Vendors Arising from the Postpetition Delivery of Goods and Services Ordered Prepetition and (II) Authorizing Debtor to Pay Undisputed Postpetition Obligations in the Ordinary Course of Business filed by Jasmine Ball on behalf of Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Ball, Jasmine) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Application to Pay Taxes Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Authorizing, But Not Requiring, the Debtor to Remit and Pay Sales, Use and Franchise Taxes and Certain Other Government Charges and (B) Authorizing Banks and Other Financial Institutions to Receive, Process, Honor, and Pay Checks Issued and Electronic Payment Requests Made Relating to the Foregoing filed by Jasmine Ball on behalf of Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Ball, Jasmine) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to Authorize Debtor's Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing (I) the Debtor to Continue and Renew Its Liability, Property, Casualty and Other Insurance Policies and Honor all Obligations in Respect Thereof and (II) Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Related Checks and Transfers filed by Jasmine Ball on behalf of Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Ball, Jasmine) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to Authorize Debtor's Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing (A) Debtor to Honor Prepetition Obligations to Customers and Related Third Parties and to Otherwise Continue Customer Programs in the Ordinary Course of Business, (B) Debtor to Honor Commercial Agreements and to Otherwise Continue Commercial Contracts in the Ordinary Course of Business, and (C) Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Related to the Relief Requested Herein filed by Jasmine Ball on behalf of Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Ball, Jasmine) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order Extending Time to File Schedules, Statements of Financial Affairs and Rule 2015.3 Financial Reports filed by Jasmine Ball on behalf of Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Ball, Jasmine) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion to Authorize Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Waiving the Requirement to File a List of Creditors and Authorizing Preparation of a List of Creditors in Lieu of Submitting a Formatted Mailing Matrix and (II) Establishing Procedures for Notifying Creditors of the Commencement of the Debtor's Chapter 11 Case filed by Jasmine Ball on behalf of Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Ball, Jasmine) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Appoint Debtor's Application for Entry of an Order Appointing Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC as Claims and Noticing Agent for the Debtor Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 156(c), 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and S.D.N.Y. LBR 5075-1 Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date filed by Jasmine Ball on behalf of Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Ball, Jasmine) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Plan due by 1/3/2022, Disclosure Statement due by 1/3/2022, Initial Case Conference due by 10/4/2021, Filed by Jasmine Ball of Debevoise & Plimpton LLP on behalf of Philippine Airlines, Inc.. (Ball, Jasmine) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHILIPPINE AIRLINES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant