This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 07/12/2019 at 05:38:41 (UTC).

Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Golden

Case Summary

On 07/11/2019 Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Golden. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Erithe A. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-AP-01136

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Erithe A. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company

Defendant

Jeffrey Golden, Chapter 7 Trustee n Behalf of the Bankruptcy Estate of Tung Nguyen-Phuc

Trustee

Jeffrey I Golden (TR)

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SA)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lane K Bogard

Lisa Darling-Alderton

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Summons Issued on Jeffrey Golden Date Issued 7/11/2019, Answer Due 8/12/2019 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company). Status hearing to be held on 10/3/2019 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith. Mailed copy of summons to non-ECF Attorney filer Lisa Darling-Alderton by U.S. Mail (Duarte, Tina). (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#1

(#1) Adversary case 8:19-ap-01136. Complaint by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company against Jeffrey Golden. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Bogard, Lane) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued on Jeffrey Golden Date Issued 7/11/2019, Answer Due 8/12/2019 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company). Status hearing to be held on 10/3/2019 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith. Mailed copy of summons to non-ECF Attorney filer Lisa Darling-Alderton by U.S. Mail (Duarte, Tina). (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Complaint(8:19-ap-01136-ES) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 49375735. Fee amount 350.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Adversary case 8:19-ap-01136. Complaint by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company against Jeffrey Golden. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Bogard, Lane) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less