This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 04/17/2021 at 06:32:48 (UTC).

Peter Etney Williams and Paulette Angela Williams

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 Peter Etney Williams and Paulette Angela Williams was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Middle Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen S. Jennemann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-BK-00657

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Karen S. Jennemann

 

Party Details

Debtors

Paulette Angela Williams

Windermere, FL 34786

Peter Etney Williams

Windermere, FL 34786

Us Trustee

United States Trustee - ORL

George C Young Federal Building, 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100

Orlando, FL 32801

Trustee

L. Todd Budgen

Longwood, FL 32752

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Wayne B Spivak

Attorney at Attorneys Justin Clark & Associates PLLC

500 Winderley Place, Unit 100

Maitland, FL 32751

Us Trustee Attorney

Audrey M Aleskovsky

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

George C. Young Federal Building, 400 West Washington St, Suite 1100

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#39

#38

#37

22 #8

Exhibit G

22 #7

Exhibit F

22 #6

Exhibit E

22 #5

Exhibit D

22 #4

Exhibit C

22 #3

Exhibit B

22 #2

Exhibit A

22 #1

Main Document

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Proof of Service of Order Granting Amended Motion for Relief from Stay. Filed by Gregg S Ahrens on behalf of Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as trustee for the holders of the First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-FF17, et al (related document(s)#38). (Ahrens, Gregg) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Order Granting Amended Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc #22) Service Instructions: Gregg Ahrens is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Lee Hue, Karla) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 04/08/2021 10:30:42 ]. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Wayne Spivak (Debtor Atty); Peter and Paulette Williams (Debtors); Audrey Aleskovsky (US Trustee Atty); Todd Budgen (Sub V Trustee); Gregg Ahrens (Wells Fargo Atty); RULING: (ZOOM) Initial Status Conference - cont. to May 4, 2021 at 2:45 pm (AOCNFNG); 1) Wells Fargo's Amended Motion for Relief from Stay. (Verify Payment of Filing Fee on Previous Motion). Re: 13438 Bonica Way, Windermere, FL34786 (Doc #22) - Granted:Order by Ahrens; 2) Trustee's Objection to Amended Petition's Subchapter V Election (Doc #33) - cont. to May 4, 2021 at 2:45 pm (AOCNFNG); 3) Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case or Convert Case to Chapter 7 (Doc #34) - cont. to May 4, 2021 at 2:45 pm (AOCNFNG); (gww); Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Dkt) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Joinder Motion to Dismiss and Objection to Subchapter V Election by U.S. Trustee Filed by Gregg S Ahrens on behalf of Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as trustee for the holders of the First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-FF17, et al (related document(s)#33, #34). (Ahrens, Gregg) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Motion to Dismiss Case or Convert Case to Chapter 7. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. (Aleskovsky, Audrey) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Objection to Amended Petition's Subchapter V Election Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL (related document(s)#5). (Aleskovsky, Audrey) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Amended Schedule A/B, Amended Summary of Schedules, Amended Declaration Concerning Schedules, Certificate of Service Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required. Filed by Wayne B Spivak on behalf of Joint Debtor Paulette Angela Williams, Debtor Peter Etney Williams. (Spivak, Wayne) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Amended Response to Creditors Amended Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Wayne B Spivak on behalf of Joint Debtor Paulette Angela Williams, Debtor Peter Etney Williams (related document(s)#22). (Spivak, Wayne) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Response to Creditor's Amended Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Wayne B Spivak on behalf of Joint Debtor Paulette Angela Williams, Debtor Peter Etney Williams (related document(s)#22). (Spivak, Wayne) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Deficient Filing. Summary of Assets, Schedules A-J, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation, Case Management Summary . (Ahyen) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketAssignment of the Honorable Karen S. Jennemann, Bankruptcy Judge to this case . (Ahyen) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDebtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at #http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Amended Voluntary Petition. Reason for Amendment: Amended to Change Filing Status to Chapter 11 Subchapter 5. , Certificate of Service Filed by Wayne B Spivak on behalf of Joint Debtor Paulette Angela Williams, Debtor Peter Etney Williams (related document(s)#1). (Spivak, Wayne) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(6:21-bk-00657) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number 66595800, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling. Date Course was Completed: 02/04/2021. Filed by Wayne B Spivak on behalf of Joint Debtor Paulette Angela Williams. (Spivak, Wayne) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling. Date Course was Completed: 02/04/2021. Filed by Wayne B Spivak on behalf of Debtor Peter Etney Williams. (Spivak, Wayne) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Debtors Social Security Numbers Filed by Wayne B Spivak on behalf of Joint Debtor Paulette Angela Williams, Debtor Peter Etney Williams. (Spivak, Wayne) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Fee Paid.).List of 20 Largest Creditors. Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Statement of Current Monthly Income Not Filed or Not Required. Filed by Wayne B Spivak on behalf of Peter Etney Williams, Paulette Angela Williams. (Spivak, Wayne) Modified on 2/18/2021 (Ahyen). (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Audrey M Aleskovsky