This case was last updated from PACER on 03/13/2020 at 16:11:19 (UTC).

PCT INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 PCT INTERNATIONAL, INC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Arizona Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul Sala. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-BK-14586

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Paul Sala

 

Party Details

Debtor

PCT INTERNATIONAL, INC.

2260 W. Broadway Rd.

Mesa, AZ 85202

Not Classified By Court

EZCONN CORPORATION

One Arizona Center, 400 E Van Buren St, Ste 1900

Phoenix, AZ 85004

EGTRAN CORPORATION

CHENG-SUN LAN

Mclean, VA 22101

Us Trustee

U.S. TRUSTEE

230 North First Avenue, Suite 204

Phoenix, AZ 85003

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

WESLEY DENTON RAY

Attorney at SACKS TIERNEY P.A.

4250 N. Drinkwater Blvd., 4Th Floor

Scottsdale, AZ 85251-3693

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

BENJAMIN WILLIAM REEVES

Attorney at SNELL & WILMER LLP

One Arizona Center, 400 E Van Buren St

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

CHRISTOPHER H. BAYLEY

Attorney at SNELL & WILMER, L.L.P.

One Arizona Center, 400 E. Van Buren St, Ste 1900

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

GREER NOVALIS SHAW

Attorney at HAGENS BERMAN SOBOL SHAPIRO LLP

301 N Lake Ave Suite 920

Pasadena, CA 91101

Us Trustee Attorney

CHRISTOPHER J PATTOCK

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE

230 N. First Ave., #204

Phoenix, AZ 85003-1706

 

Court Documents

#67

(#67) Periodic Report Regarding Value, Operations and Profitability of Entities in Which the Debtor's Estate Holds a Substantial or Controlling Interest as of November 2019 filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of PCT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (RAY, WESLEY) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#65

(#65) Certificate of Mailing filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of PCT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (RAY, WESLEY) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#64

(#64) Amendment to Mailing List (31.00 fee) filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of PCT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (RAY, WESLEY) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#63

(#63) Operating Report For January 2020 filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of PCT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (RAY, WESLEY) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#62

(#62) Certificate of Mailing filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of PCT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (RAY, WESLEY) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#61

(#61) Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/31.00 Fee) /Amended Schedule E/F filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of PCT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (RAY, WESLEY) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

60 #2

Exhibit Attachments

60 #1

Main Document

59 #2

SIGN IN SHEET

36 #1

Ch 11 Status Confernce - MCW/P

#9

(#9) ORDER Granting Pro Hac Vice Application (Related Doc #8) signed on 11/21/2019 . (Tripp, LaTosha) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#8

(#9) ORDER Granting Pro Hac Vice Application (Related Doc #8) signed on 11/21/2019 . (Tripp, LaTosha) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#7

(#7) Pro Hac Vice Application filed by RYAN J. LORENZ of Clark Hill, PLC on behalf of Sallyport Commercial Finance, LLC. (LORENZ, RYAN) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by RYAN J. LORENZ of Clark Hill, PLC on behalf of Sallyport Commercial Finance, LLC.(LORENZ, RYAN) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Service Acceptance of Service filed by BENJAMIN WILLIAM REEVES of SNELL & WILMER LLP on behalf of PCT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (REEVES, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#4

(#4) Involuntary Debtor Summons Issued (Tripp, LaTosha) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#3

(#3) ENTERED IN ERROR Summons Issued . (Tripp, LaTosha) Modified on 11/19/2019 (Tripp, LaTosha). (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#1

(#1) Involuntary Chapter 7 Petition Against a Non-Individual. Re: PCT INTERNATIONAL, INC. Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s): EZCONN CORPORATION (attorney CHRISTOPHER H. BAYLEY), EGTRAN CORPORATION (attorney CHRISTOPHER H. BAYLEY), CHENG-SUN LAN (attorney CHRISTOPHER H. BAYLEY) (BAYLEY, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) Periodic Report Regarding Value, Operations and Profitability of Entities in Which the Debtor's Estate Holds a Substantial or Controlling Interest as of November 2019 filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of PCT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (RAY, WESLEY) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) Certificate of Mailing filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of PCT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (RAY, WESLEY) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Amendment to Mailing List (31.00 fee)(2:19-bk-14586-PS) [other,1559] ( 31.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 32438626. Fee amount 31.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) Amendment to Mailing List (31.00 fee) filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of PCT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (RAY, WESLEY) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) Operating Report For January 2020 filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of PCT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (RAY, WESLEY) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) Certificate of Mailing filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of PCT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (RAY, WESLEY) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/31.00 Fee)(2:19-bk-14586-PS) [other,1229] ( 31.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 32407199. Fee amount 31.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/31.00 Fee) /Amended Schedule E/F filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of PCT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (RAY, WESLEY) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Amendment to Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J) Amended Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of PCT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachments)(RAY, WESLEY) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Minutes of Hearing held on: 01/27/2020 Subject: CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE STATUS. (vCal Hearing ID (1428005)). (related document(s)#36) (Kelly, Margaret) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2020 (Kelly, Margaret). (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER Granting Pro Hac Vice Application (Related Doc #8) signed on 11/21/2019 . (Tripp, LaTosha) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Pro Hac Vice Application filed by RYAN J. LORENZ of Clark Hill, PLC on behalf of Sallyport Commercial Finance, LLC. (LORENZ, RYAN) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Pro Hac Vice Application filed by RYAN J. LORENZ of Clark Hill, PLC on behalf of Sallyport Commercial Finance, LLC. (LORENZ, RYAN) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Appearance filed by RYAN J. LORENZ of Clark Hill, PLC on behalf of Sallyport Commercial Finance, LLC.(LORENZ, RYAN) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Service Acceptance of Service filed by BENJAMIN WILLIAM REEVES of SNELL & WILMER LLP on behalf of PCT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (REEVES, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Involuntary Debtor Summons Issued (Tripp, LaTosha) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ENTERED IN ERROR Summons Issued . (Tripp, LaTosha) Modified on 11/19/2019 (Tripp, LaTosha). (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • (#2) Request for Issuance of Involuntary Summons filed by CHRISTOPHER H. BAYLEY of SNELL & WILMER, L.L.P. on behalf of EGTRAN CORPORATION, EZCONN CORPORATION, CHENG-SUN LAN. (BAYLEY, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Receipt of Involuntary Chapter 7 Petition(2:19-bk-14586) [other,827] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 32073369. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Involuntary Chapter 7 Petition Against a Non-Individual. Re: PCT INTERNATIONAL, INC. Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s): EZCONN CORPORATION (attorney CHRISTOPHER H. BAYLEY), EGTRAN CORPORATION (attorney CHRISTOPHER H. BAYLEY), CHENG-SUN LAN (attorney CHRISTOPHER H. BAYLEY) (BAYLEY, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher J Pattock(Designation Retained)