This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2019 at 05:20:04 (UTC).

Paul Krist Marmolejo

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 case was filed by Paul Krist Marmolejo in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-BK-19040

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Wayne E. Johnson

 

Party Details

Debtor

Paul Krist Marmolejo

Trustee

Rod Danielson (TR)

US Trustee

United States Trustee (RS)

 

Court Documents

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Paul Krist Marmolejo. (Pournazarian, Rabin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#7

(#7) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/20/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/04/2019 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. Proof of Claim due by 12/24/2019. (Pournazarian, Rabin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#6

(#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Paul Krist Marmolejo. (Pournazarian, Rabin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#1

(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Paul Krist Marmolejo (Pournazarian, Rabin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#2

(#2) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Filed by Debtor Paul Krist Marmolejo. (Pournazarian, Rabin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#3

(#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Paul Krist Marmolejo. (Pournazarian, Rabin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/20/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/04/2019 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. Proof of Claim due by 12/24/2019. (Pournazarian, Rabin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(6:19-bk-19040) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 49922241. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Paul Krist Marmolejo. (Pournazarian, Rabin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Paul Krist Marmolejo. (Pournazarian, Rabin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Paul Krist Marmolejo. (Pournazarian, Rabin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Paul Krist Marmolejo. (Pournazarian, Rabin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Filed by Debtor Paul Krist Marmolejo. (Pournazarian, Rabin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Paul Krist Marmolejo (Pournazarian, Rabin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.