This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 09/15/2019 at 16:04:54 (UTC).

Orchids Paper Products Company

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 Orchids Paper Products Company was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary F. Walrath. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-BK-10729

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Mary F. Walrath

 

Party Details

Debtor

Orchids Paper Products Company

201 Summit View Drive, Suite 110

Brentwood, TN 37027

Not Classified By Court

Prime Clerk LLC

One Grand Central Place, 60 East 42Nd St, Suite 1440

New York, NY 10165

Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors

Reliable Companies

1007 North Orange Street, Suite 110

Wilmington, DE 19801

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, 844 King Street, Suite 2207, Lockbox 35

Wilmington, DE 19801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Christopher A. Ward

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1101

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jerry L Switzer, Jr

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

Shanti M. Katona

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1101

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael R Mazzella, III

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

One East Washington, Suite 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Janel M Glynn

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

One East Washington, Suite 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Todd A Burgess

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

One East Washington, Suite 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Benjamin Joseph Steele

Attorney at Prime Clerk LLC

One Grand Central Place, 60 East 42Nd Street, Suite 1440

New York, NY 10165

Marc J. Phillips

Attorney at Montgomery McCracken Walker & Rhoads LLP

1105 North Market Street, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

Mary E. Seymour

Attorney at Lowenstein Sandler LLP

One Lowenstein Drive

Roseland, NJ 07068

Jennifer B Kimble

Attorney at Lowenstein Sandler LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Gabriel L Olivera

Attorney at Lowenstein Sandler LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Kenneth A. Rosen

Attorney at Lowenstein Sandler LLP

One Lowenstein Drive

Roseland, NJ 07068

Nicole Fulfree

Attorney at Lowenstein Sandler LLP

One Lowenstein Drive

Roseland, NJ 07068

Joseph J. DiPasquale

Attorney at Lowenstein Sandler LLP

One Lowenstein Drive

Roseland, NJ 07068

Bruce Buechler

Attorney at Lowenstein Sandler LLP

One Lowenstein Drive

Roseland, NJ 07068

Us Trustee Attorney

Juliet M. Sarkessian

Attorney at U.S. Trustee's Office

844 King Street, Room 2207, Lockbox #35

Wilmington, DE 19899-0035

 

Court Documents

#525

#524

362 #3

Exhibit B

362 #2

Exhibit A

362 #1

Main Document

#354

352 #3

Exhibit B (Blackline of Final Proposed Sale Order)

352 #2

Exhibit A (Proposed Final Sale Order)

352 #1

Main Document

6 #3

Exhibit B

#4

3 #4

Exhibit C

#3

Exhibit B

3 #2

Exhibit A

3 #1

Main Document

#2

Exhibit A

2 #1

Main Document

#1

1,071 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#525) Notice of Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens - 363(f) FRBP 6004 / Notice of Closing of Sale of Substantially All of the Assets of the Debtors (related document(s)#362) Filed by Orchids Paper Products Company. (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#524) Notice of Service / Notice of Filing of Revised Redacted Final Schedules to the Asset Purchase Agreement (related document(s)#352, #354, #362, #432) Filed by Orchids Paper Products Company. (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#523) [SEALED] Notice of Service / Notice of Filing of Revised Final Schedules to Asset Purchase Agreement (related document(s)#353, #362) Filed by Orchids Paper Products Company. (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#522) Supplemental Declaration of Benjamin J. Steele in Support of Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing Employment and Retention of Prime Clerk LLC as Administrative Advisor Nunc Pro Tunc to August 21, 2019 (related document(s)#469) Filed by Orchids Paper Products Company. (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketAdversary Case 1:19-ap-50264 Closed (LAM) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#521) Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Sebastian V. Higgins Regarding Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on September 10, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. (ET). Filed by Prime Clerk LLC. (related document(s)#506) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#520) Fourth Monthly Fee Application of Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc. for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Advisor and Investment Banker to the Debtors for the period of July 1, 2019 to July 31, 2019 Filed by Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc.. Objections due by 10/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice #2 Exhibit A-C) (Katona, Shanti) Modified on 9/13/2019 (BA). (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#519) Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding Third Monthly Fee Application of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC for Payment of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the Period from July 1, 2019 through July 31, 2019 (related document(s)#459) Filed by Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#518) Order Approving Motion for an Order Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019 Approving Settlement Agreement By and Among the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Ankura Trust Company, LLC and Orchids Investment LLC (Related Doc #480, #483, #484, #485, #515) Signed on 9/12/2019. (LMC) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#517) Transcript regarding Hearing Held 9/10/2019 RE: Omnibus. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 12/11/2019. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to obtain a transcript, call the Clerk's Office or Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, Reliable, at Telephone number (302)654-8080. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 9/19/2019. Redaction Request Due By 10/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 10/15/2019. Transcript access will be restricted through 12/11/2019. (BJM) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
512 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion Prohibiting Utilities from Discontinuing Service Filed By Orchids Paper Products Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C)(Ward, Christopher) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to Pay Employee Wages Filed By Orchids Paper Products Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B)(Ward, Christopher) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to Maintain Bank Accounts Filed By Orchids Paper Products Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B)(Ward, Christopher) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Docket(#5) Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(19-10729) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9254392, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Daniel J. McGuire. Receipt Number 2608214, Filed by Orchids Investment LLC. (Niederman, Seth) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Application to Appoint Claims/Noticing Agent PRIME CLERK LLC Filed By Orchids Paper Products Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C)(Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • DocketAttorney Juliet M. Sarkessian and Juliet M. Sarkessian for U.S. Trustee added to case Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Sarkessian, Juliet) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Orchids Paper Products Company. (Ward, Christopher) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • DocketJudge Mary F. Walrath added to case (LCo) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Orchids Paper Products Company. (Ward, Christopher) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Reliable Companies is a litigant

Latest cases where Prime Clerk LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Juliet M. Sarkessian