This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 10/27/2020 at 06:47:18 (UTC).

O'Connor Hospital et al v. Argon Medical Devices, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 O'Connor Hospital filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Argon Medical Devices, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Ernest M. Robles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-AP-01499

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Ernest M. Robles

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

O'Connor Hospital

2105 Forest Avenue

San Jose, CA 95128

St. Francis Medical Center

3630 East Imperial Highway

Lynwood, CA 90262

Defendant

Argon Medical Devices, Inc.

2600 Dallas Parkway, Suite 440

Frisco, TX 75034

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr

Attorney at ASK LLP

2600 Eagan Woods Dr Ste 400

St Paul, MN 55121

Tania M Moyron

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

601 South Figuerora Street, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5704

 

Court Documents

#3

Scheduling Order

3 #2

Order Re: Courtroom Procedures

3 #1

Main Document

#2

(#2) Summons Issued on Argon Medical Devices, Inc. Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital) Status hearing to be held on 1/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

1 #4

Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

#1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, St. Francis Medical Center (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued). (Attachments: #1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures #2 Scheduling Order) (Moyron, Tania) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued on Argon Medical Devices, Inc. Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital) Status hearing to be held on 1/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01499-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51650357. Fee amount 350.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 2:20-ap-01499. Complaint by O'Connor Hospital, St. Francis Medical Center against Argon Medical Devices, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARGON MEDICAL DEVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where O'Connor Hospital is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant