This case was last updated from PACER on 03/05/2021 at 06:33:56 (UTC).

North Channel Assistance Ministries

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 North Channel Assistance Ministries was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher M. Lopez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-BK-30019

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher M. Lopez

 

Party Details

Debtor

North Channel Assistance Ministries

Houston, TX 77015

Us Trustee

US Trustee

515 Rusk Ave, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Us Trustee Attorney

Jayson B. Ruff

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

515 Rusk St., Ste. 3516

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#1

3 #1

Main Document

3 #2

Proposed Order

5 #1

Main Document

5 #2

Proposed Order

#6

#7

#8

#10

#12

#13

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#12 Generic Order) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/13/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Order Continuing U.S. Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case. Signed on 2/10/2021 (Related document(s):#5 Motion to Dismiss Case) (kpico) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 10:00 AM - 10:15 AM. Appearances: Rodney Redford as Debtor Representative and Jayson Ruff for U.S. Trustee. (Related document(s):#3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments, #5 Motion to Dismiss Case, and #6 Emergency Motion to Extend Time). Mr. Redford provides a status report to the Court. Comments made by Mr. Ruff. All matters are continued to a status conference scheduled for 3/10/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone and video conference. Debtor is to retain counsel by March 10, 2021; the proposed counsel must file a notice of appearance by 03/9/2021. (kpico) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Creditor Mailing List Received in Paper and Loaded. (Filed By North Channel Assistance Ministries ). (JacquelineMata) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docket(#9) Receipt of Second Installment Payment. Receipt Number 190413, Fee Amount $600.00 (JesusGuajardo) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Witness List (Filed By US Trustee ).(Related document(s):#3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments, #5 Motion to Dismiss Case, #6 Emergency Motion, Motion to Extend Time) (Ruff, Jayson) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Hearing. (Related document(s):#3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments, #5 Motion to Dismiss Case, #6 Emergency Motion, Motion to Extend Time) Filed by US Trustee (Ruff, Jayson) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Set On (Related document(s):#3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments, #5 Motion to Dismiss Case, #6 Emergency Motion, Motion to Extend Time). Hearing is scheduled for 2/10/2021 at 10:00 AM at telephone and video conference. Dial-in Telephone No: 832-917-1510. Conference Code: 590153. Please do not appear in person. If you have questions, please email rosario_saldana@txs.uscourts.gov. Telephonic participants may connect on-line to view the Courts broadcast onto the courtrooms television monitors. To view online, you may connect through the website located at https://www.gotomeeting.com/meeting/join-meeting. The code for the meeting is JudgeLopez. If you are attempting to view the broadcast on an iPad or similar device, you may be required to download a free app from the website. (rsal) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Emergency Motion to Extend Time Filed by Debtor North Channel Assistance Ministries (BrendaLacy) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to Dismiss Case for Other Cause . Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ruff, Jayson) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • Docket(#4) No Creditor Mailing List (JosephWellsadi) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jayson B. Ruff (Ruff, Jayson) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments. Receipt Number 190361, Fee Amount: $ 600.00 Filed by Debtor North Channel Assistance Ministries (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (rcas) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Receipt Number 0, Fee Amount $1738 Filed by North Channel Assistance Ministries . Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) due by 7/6/2021. (rcas) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jayson B. Ruff