Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2020 at 06:37:12 (UTC).

Noble John Sandifer LLC

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Noble John Sandifer LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is David R Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-BK-34646

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

David R Jones

 

Party Details

Debtor

Noble John Sandifer LLC

13135 Dairy Ashford, Suite 800

Sugar Land, TX 77478

Us Trustee

US Trustee

515 Rusk Ave, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

John F Higgins, IV

Attorney at Porter Hedges LLP

1000 Main St, Ste 3600

Houston, TX 77002-6336

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#5 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/30/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#6

(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#4 Order for Joint Administration) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/27/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/27/2020)

#5

(#5) Notice and Order regarding exchanging of exhibits and witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings. (Entered: 09/26/2020)

#4

(#4) Order for Joint Administration under 20-33826. Signed on 9/25/2020 (aaloadi) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#2

Proposed Order

2 #1

Main Document

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Noble John Sandifer LLC. (Higgins, John) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#5 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/30/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#4 Order for Joint Administration) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/27/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice and Order regarding exchanging of exhibits and witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings. (Entered: 09/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketAn order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 20-33826 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (aaloadi) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order for Joint Administration under 20-33826. Signed on 9/25/2020 (aaloadi) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketJudge David R Jones added to case. Involvement of Judge Marvin Isgur Terminated (aalo) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#3) No Creditor Mailing List (JosephWellsadi) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Noble John Sandifer LLC Hearing scheduled for 10/9/2020 at 09:30 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Higgins, John) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(20-34646) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22456650. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Noble John Sandifer LLC. (Higgins, John) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John F Higgins, IV