This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 06/10/2022 at 06:33:12 (UTC).

New Broughton Street, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 New Broughton Street, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine Peek McEwen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-BK-01438

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Catherine Peek McEwen

 

Party Details

Debtor

New Broughton Street, LLC

618 East Broughton Street

Savannah, GA 31401

Us Trustee

United States Trustee - TPA

Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200, 501 E Polk Street

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Jake C Blanchard

Attorney at Blanchard Law, P.A.

1501 South Belcher Road, Unit 6B

Largo, FL 33771

Us Trustee Attorney

Nathan A Wheatley

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Trustee

501 E. Polk St., Suite1200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#41

(#41) Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: APPEARANCES via ZOOM: Amy Drushal, Ari Newman, Jake Blanchard, Al Gomez, Nathan Wheatley RULING: Initial Status Conference ...Case is Jointly Administered with (Lead Case) Savannah Capital, LLC case 8:22-bk-01431-CPM... Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Bill) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#40

(#40) Certificate of Service Re: Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration (Doc. 39). Filed by Jake C Blanchard on behalf of Debtor New Broughton Street, LLC (related document(s)#39). (Blanchard, Jake) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#39

(#39) Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Lead Case 8:22-bk-01431-CPM with 8:22-bk-01438-. This case is associated with lead case 8:22-bk-1431. (Related Doc #38). Service Instructions: Jake Blanchard is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Sabrina) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#38

(#38) Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 8:22-bk-01431-CPM with 8:22-bk-01438-CPM Filed by Jake C Blanchard on behalf of Debtor New Broughton Street, LLC (Blanchard, Jake) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

37 #2

Exhibit Composite Exhibit A

37 #1

Main Document

#36

(#36) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Lara Roeske Fernandez on behalf of Creditor Ryan Roa, as Trustee for the Callen Trust. (Fernandez, Lara) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#35

(#35) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Amy L Drushal on behalf of Creditor Ryan Roa, as Trustee for the Callen Trust. (Drushal, Amy) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#34

No Description Available

#33

No Description Available

#32

No Description Available

#31

No Description Available

#30

No Description Available

#29

No Description Available

#28

No Description Available

#27

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: APPEARANCES via ZOOM: Amy Drushal, Ari Newman, Jake Blanchard, Al Gomez, Nathan Wheatley RULING: Initial Status Conference ...Case is Jointly Administered with (Lead Case) Savannah Capital, LLC case 8:22-bk-01431-CPM... Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court. (Bill) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Certificate of Service Re: Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration (Doc. 39). Filed by Jake C Blanchard on behalf of Debtor New Broughton Street, LLC (related document(s)#39). (Blanchard, Jake) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Joint Administration of Cases. No further papers to be docketed in this case with the exception of Lists of Creditors, Schedules and Statements of Financial Affairs and any amendments thereto, Proofs of Claim, Ballots (if separate Plans are filed in the jointly administered cases), and Motions for Final Decree, pursuant to Local Rule 1015-1(c)(3). All other papers should be docketed in the lead Case No. 8:22-bk-01431-CPM (related document(s)#39). (Sabrina) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Lead Case 8:22-bk-01431-CPM with 8:22-bk-01438-. This case is associated with lead case 8:22-bk-1431. (Related Doc #38). Service Instructions: Jake Blanchard is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Sabrina) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 8:22-bk-01431-CPM with 8:22-bk-01438-CPM Filed by Jake C Blanchard on behalf of Debtor New Broughton Street, LLC (Blanchard, Jake) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Relief From Stay(# 8:22-bk-01438-CPM) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00). Receipt Number A70005423, Amount Paid $ 188.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Motion to Approve Stipulation on Motion for Relief from Stay. (Fee Paid.) Re: 310-322 W. Broughton Street, Savannah, GA 31401. Contains negative notice. and Adequate Protection between Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation and Debtor Filed by Alberto F Gomez Jr. on behalf of Creditor Ohio National Life Assurance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A) (Gomez, Alberto) Modified on 5/20/2022 (Pamella). (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Lara Roeske Fernandez on behalf of Creditor Ryan Roa, as Trustee for the Callen Trust. (Fernandez, Lara) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Amy L Drushal on behalf of Creditor Ryan Roa, as Trustee for the Callen Trust. (Drushal, Amy) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketThe United States Trustee states that the initial meeting of creditors was held and continued to the following date to allow further examination of the debtor(s) and/or the records of the debtor(s). Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - TPA. Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/24/2022 at 01:30 PM. U.S. Trustee (T/FM) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 866-910-0293. Passcode: 7560574. (Wheatley, Nathan) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Jake C Blanchard on behalf of Debtor New Broughton Street, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Matrix) (Blanchard, Jake) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Schedules (all schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)(# 8:22-bk-01438-CPM) [misc,schaja] ( 32.00). Receipt Number B69801717, Amount Paid $ 32.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Amended Schedule E/F, Includes addition or deletion of creditors to Schedules or Change in the Amount or Classification of Debts. ; With Certificate of Service (Fee Paid.) Filed by Jake C Blanchard on behalf of Debtor New Broughton Street, LLC. (Blanchard, Jake) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDebtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at #http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketAssignment of the Honorable Catherine Peek McEwen, Bankruptcy Judge to this case. The Trustee appointed to this case is US Trustee. (Ellen M.) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Jake C Blanchard on behalf of Debtor New Broughton Street, LLC. (Ahyen) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition Filed by Jake C Blanchard on behalf of Debtor New Broughton Street, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Blanchard, Jake) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 8:22-bk-01438) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A69770484, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Fee Paid.). Schedules D,E/F, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors. Filed by Jake C Blanchard on behalf of New Broughton Street, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/9/2022. Disclosure Statement due by 08/9/2022. (Blanchard, Jake) Modified on 4/15/2022 (Ahyen). (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan A Wheatley