This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 05/24/2022 at 06:32:06 (UTC).

M.S. Acquisitions & Holdings, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/25/2022 M S Acquisitions Holdings, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Middle Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Caryl E. Delano. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-BK-00341

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Caryl E. Delano

 

Party Details

Debtor

M.S. Acquisitions & Holdings, LLC

14366 Charthouse Circle

Naples, FL 34114

Us Trustee

United States Trustee - FTM

Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200, 501 E. Polk Street

Tampa, FL 33602

Trustee

Amy Denton Mayer

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Brett D Lieberman

Attorney at Edelboim Lieberman Revah PLLC

20200 W. Dixie Hwy, Suite 905

Miami, FL 33180

Us Trustee Attorney

Benjamin E. Lambers

Attorney at Timberlake Annex

501 E. Polk Street, Suite 1200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) *Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Fee Paid.). Summary of Assets. List of 20 Largest Creditors. Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required. Filed by Brett D Lieberman on behalf of M.S. Acquisitions & Holdings, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 06/23/2022. (Lieberman, Brett) Modified on 3/29/2022 (Ahyen). (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#2

(#2) Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Brett D Lieberman on behalf of Debtor M.S. Acquisitions & Holdings, LLC. (Ahyen) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

4 #1

Main Document

4 #2

Exhibit Verified Statement

#5

(#5) Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Brett D Lieberman on behalf of Debtor M.S. Acquisitions & Holdings, LLC. (Lieberman, Brett) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#6

(#7) Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration . This case is associated with lead case 2:22-bk-340-FMD. (Related Doc #6). Service Instructions: Brett Lieberman is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Lewis, Bernadette) Modified on 3/30/2022 (Bernadette). Modified on 3/31/2022 (Nita). (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#7

(#7) Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration . This case is associated with lead case 2:22-bk-340-FMD. (Related Doc #6). Service Instructions: Brett Lieberman is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Lewis, Bernadette) Modified on 3/30/2022 (Bernadette). Modified on 3/31/2022 (Nita). (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#8

(#12) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc #8)). Notice Date 04/02/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/03/2022)

#9

(#9) Notice of Deficient Filing. Schedules A,B, D-H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation, Small Business Balance Sheet . (Ahyen) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#10

(#10) Declaration re: current balance sheet, statement of operations and cashflow statement Filed by Brett D Lieberman on behalf of Debtor M.S. Acquisitions & Holdings, LLC. (Lieberman, Brett) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#11

(#11) Notice of Filing 2021 Profit and Loss Statement Filed by Brett D Lieberman on behalf of Debtor M.S. Acquisitions & Holdings, LLC. (Lieberman, Brett) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#12

(#12) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc #8)). Notice Date 04/02/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/03/2022)

#13

(#13) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest (related document(s) (Related Doc #9)). Notice Date 04/02/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/03/2022)

#14

(#14) Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Filed by Brett D Lieberman on behalf of Debtor M.S. Acquisitions & Holdings, LLC. (Lieberman, Brett) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#15

(#15) Schedules A - H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Creditor Matrix Includes addition or deletion of creditors to Schedules or Change in the Amount or Classification of Debts. (Fee Paid.) Filed by Brett D Lieberman on behalf of Debtor M.S. Acquisitions & Holdings, LLC. (Lieberman, Brett) Modified on 4/12/2022 (Nita). (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#16

(#16) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Brian P. Hall and Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP on behalf of Centric Bank Filed by Brian P Hall on behalf of Creditor Centric Bank. (Hall, Brian) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Brian P. Hall and Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP on behalf of Centric Bank Filed by Brian P Hall on behalf of Creditor Centric Bank. (Hall, Brian) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Schedules (all schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)(# 2:22-bk-00341-FMD) [misc,schaja] ( 32.00). Receipt Number A69759278, Amount Paid $ 32.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Schedules A - H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Creditor Matrix Includes addition or deletion of creditors to Schedules or Change in the Amount or Classification of Debts. (Fee Paid.) Filed by Brett D Lieberman on behalf of Debtor M.S. Acquisitions & Holdings, LLC. (Lieberman, Brett) Modified on 4/12/2022 (Nita). (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDebtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at #http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Filed by Brett D Lieberman on behalf of Debtor M.S. Acquisitions & Holdings, LLC. (Lieberman, Brett) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest (related document(s) (Related Doc #9)). Notice Date 04/02/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc #8)). Notice Date 04/02/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Filing 2021 Profit and Loss Statement Filed by Brett D Lieberman on behalf of Debtor M.S. Acquisitions & Holdings, LLC. (Lieberman, Brett) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Declaration re: current balance sheet, statement of operations and cashflow statement Filed by Brett D Lieberman on behalf of Debtor M.S. Acquisitions & Holdings, LLC. (Lieberman, Brett) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Deficient Filing. Schedules A,B, D-H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation, Small Business Balance Sheet . (Ahyen) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration . This case is associated with lead case 2:22-bk-340-FMD. (Related Doc #6). Service Instructions: Brett Lieberman is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Lewis, Bernadette) Modified on 3/30/2022 (Bernadette). Modified on 3/31/2022 (Nita). (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Expedited Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 22-00340-FMD with 22-00341-FMD Ex Parte Filed by Brett D Lieberman on behalf of Debtor M.S. Acquisitions & Holdings, LLC (Lieberman, Brett) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Brett D Lieberman on behalf of Debtor M.S. Acquisitions & Holdings, LLC. (Lieberman, Brett) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11, Subchapter V Trustee . Amy Denton Harris added to the case. Filed by Benjamin E. Lambers on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - FTM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verified Statement) (Lambers, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketThe Voluntary Petition, filed by Brett D Lieberman, contains a firm name and address information that is different from the firm information reflected in the filer's CM/ECF record. If you have changed your law firm affiliation, complete the appropriate Change of Law Firm form contained in the following link: #http://pacer.flmb.uscourts.gov/cmecf/changelawfirm.asp (related document(s) [#1]) (Deborah K.) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketAssignment of the Honorable Caryl E. Delano, Bankruptcy Judge to this case. The Trustee appointed to this case is US Trustee. (Ellen M.) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • Docket(#3) Tax Documents for the Year 2020 Filed by Brett D Lieberman on behalf of Debtor M.S. Acquisitions & Holdings, LLC. (Ahyen) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Brett D Lieberman on behalf of Debtor M.S. Acquisitions & Holdings, LLC. (Ahyen) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 2:22-bk-00341) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A69655736, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) *Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Fee Paid.). Summary of Assets. List of 20 Largest Creditors. Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required. Filed by Brett D Lieberman on behalf of M.S. Acquisitions & Holdings, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 06/23/2022. (Lieberman, Brett) Modified on 3/29/2022 (Ahyen). (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin E. Lambers(Designation Retained)