This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 08/19/2022 at 06:32:20 (UTC).

Millennium Services of Florida, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 Millennium Services of Florida, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Tiffany P. Geyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-BK-02173

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Tiffany P. Geyer

 

Party Details

Debtor

Millennium Services of Florida, LLC

1904 Williams Road

Winter Garden, FL 34787

Us Trustee

United States Trustee - ORL

George C Young Federal Building

Trustee

Robert Altman

Palatka, FL 32178-0922

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Jeffrey Ainsworth

Attorney at BransonLaw PLLC

1501 E. Concord Street

Orlando, FL 32803

Robert B Branson

Attorney at BransonLaw PLLC

1501 E. Concord Street

Orlando, FL 32803

Us Trustee Attorney

Bryan E Buenaventura

Attorney at U.S. Trustee Office - Region 21

400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100

Orlando, FL 32801

Trustee Attorneys

Robert Altman

Po Box 922

Palatka, FL 32178-0922

David E. Otero

Attorney at Akerman LLP

50 North Laura Street, Suite 3100

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Raye Curry Elliott

Attorney at Akerman LLP

401 East Jackson Street, Suite 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#112

(#112) Motion for the Entry of an Order (1) Approving Competitive Bidding and Sale Procedures for the Sale of Substantially All of the Debtor's Assets, (2) Scheduling Dates to Conduct Auction and Hearing to Consider Final Approval of Sale, Including the Treatment of Executory Contracts, (3) Approving the Form and Manner of Notices, (4) Approving the Sale of the Debtor's Assets Free and Clear of Certain Liens, Claims, Encumbrances, and Interests, and (5) Granting Related Relief Filed by David E. Otero on behalf of Trustee Robert Altman (Otero, David) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

111 #2

Mailing Matrix

111 #1

Main Document

#110

(#110) Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Millennium Services of Florida, LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

109 #2

Mailing Matrix

109 #1

Main Document

#108

(#108) Notice of Rescheduled Section 341 Meeting of Creditors. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/13/2022 at 02:00 PM. US Trustee (Orl-Spec) will hold meeting telephonically. Call in No. 866-904-0751. Passcode: 5101043. (Buenaventura, Bryan) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#107

(#107) Order Granting Emergency Motion Seeking an Order: (A) Authorizing the Debtor to Obtain Post-Petition Secured Financing on an Interim Basis Pursuant to Sec 105 and 364BK; (B) Providing Liens and Security Interest to the DIP Lender; (C) Scheduling Hearing for 9/1/22 at 02:00 PM. (Related Doc #77). Service Instructions: David Otero is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Vivianne) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#106

(#106) Second Interim Order Granting Debtor's Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral. Continued to 9/1/2022 at 02:00 PM (related document(s)#12, #60). Service Instructions: David Otero is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Vivianne) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#77

(#107) Order Granting Emergency Motion Seeking an Order: (A) Authorizing the Debtor to Obtain Post-Petition Secured Financing on an Interim Basis Pursuant to Sec 105 and 364BK; (B) Providing Liens and Security Interest to the DIP Lender; (C) Scheduling Hearing for 9/1/22 at 02:00 PM. (Related Doc #77). Service Instructions: David Otero is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Vivianne) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#8

(#8) Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#7

(#7) Unopposed Motion of R. Scott Williams to Appear pro hac vice , Designation of Local Counsel, and Consent to Act Filed by Suzanne Barto Hill on behalf of Creditor Assurance Mezzanine Fund III, L.P. (Hill, Suzanne) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Suzanne Barto Hill on behalf of Creditor Assurance Mezzanine Fund III, L.P.. (Hill, Suzanne) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

#5

(#5) Application to Employ Kenneth D. Herron, Jr. as Attorney for the Debtor Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Debtor Millennium Services of Florida, LLC (Herron, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

#4

(#4) Motion to Determine Adequate Assurance for Payment of Utility Services or, in the Alternative, Establishing the Procedure for Determining Adequate Assurance Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Debtor Millennium Services of Florida, LLC (Herron, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

#3

(#3) List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Debtor Millennium Services of Florida, LLC. (Herron, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

#2

(#2) List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Debtor Millennium Services of Florida, LLC. (Herron, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

#1

(#1) Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Fee Paid.). Schedules and Summary of Assets Not Filed. Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed. Disclosure of Compensation Not Filed. Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Millennium Services of Florida, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 10/18/2022. Disclosure Statement due by 10/18/2022. (Herron, Kenneth) Modified on 6/21/2022 (Ahyen). (Entered: 06/20/2022)

111 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) Motion for the Entry of an Order (1) Approving Competitive Bidding and Sale Procedures for the Sale of Substantially All of the Debtor's Assets, (2) Scheduling Dates to Conduct Auction and Hearing to Consider Final Approval of Sale, Including the Treatment of Executory Contracts, (3) Approving the Form and Manner of Notices, (4) Approving the Sale of the Debtor's Assets Free and Clear of Certain Liens, Claims, Encumbrances, and Interests, and (5) Granting Related Relief Filed by David E. Otero on behalf of Trustee Robert Altman (Otero, David) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) Proof of Service of Order Granting Subchapter V Trustee's Emergency Motion Seeking an Order: (A) Authorizing the Debtor to Obtain Post-Petition Secured Financing on an Interim Basis Pursuant to 105 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code; Providing Liens and Security Interest to the DIP Lender; and (C) Scheduling Hearing (Doc. 107). Filed by David E. Otero on behalf of Trustee Robert Altman (related document(s)#107). (Attachments: #1 Mailing Matrix) (Otero, David) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Filed by Jeffrey Ainsworth on behalf of Debtor Millennium Services of Florida, LLC. (Ainsworth, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) Proof of Service of Second Interim Order Granting Debtor's Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral (Doc. 106). Filed by David E. Otero on behalf of Trustee Robert Altman (related document(s)#106). (Attachments: #1 Mailing Matrix) (Otero, David) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) Notice of Rescheduled Section 341 Meeting of Creditors. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/13/2022 at 02:00 PM. US Trustee (Orl-Spec) will hold meeting telephonically. Call in No. 866-904-0751. Passcode: 5101043. (Buenaventura, Bryan) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) Order Granting Emergency Motion Seeking an Order: (A) Authorizing the Debtor to Obtain Post-Petition Secured Financing on an Interim Basis Pursuant to Sec 105 and 364BK; (B) Providing Liens and Security Interest to the DIP Lender; (C) Scheduling Hearing for 9/1/22 at 02:00 PM. (Related Doc #77). Service Instructions: David Otero is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Vivianne) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) Second Interim Order Granting Debtor's Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral. Continued to 9/1/2022 at 02:00 PM (related document(s)#12, #60). Service Instructions: David Otero is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Vivianne) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketThe United States Trustee states that the initial meeting of creditors was held and continued to the following date to allow further examination of the debtor(s) and/or the records of the debtor(s). Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - ORL. Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/6/2022 at 02:00 PM. US Trustee (Orl-Spec) will hold meeting telephonically. Call in No. 866-904-0751. Passcode: 5101043. (Buenaventura, Bryan) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) Notice of Issuance of Subpoena to PNC Bank, National Association Filed by David E. Otero on behalf of Trustee Robert Altman. (Otero, David) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) Notice of Hearing on Amended Motion for Allowance and Payment of Chapter 11 Administrative Priority Expense Rent Claim by Creditor, R.S. Armstrong, LLC (ECF No. 52 and ECF No. 101) Filed by Richard B Webber II on behalf of Creditor R.S. Armstrong, LLC (related document(s)#52, #101). Hearing scheduled for 9/1/2022 at 02:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. (Webber, Richard) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketAssignment of the Honorable Tiffany P. Geyer, Bankruptcy Judge to this case . (Ahyen) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDebtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at #http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed Motion of R. Scott Williams to Appear pro hac vice , Designation of Local Counsel, and Consent to Act Filed by Suzanne Barto Hill on behalf of Creditor Assurance Mezzanine Fund III, L.P. (Hill, Suzanne) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Suzanne Barto Hill on behalf of Creditor Assurance Mezzanine Fund III, L.P.. (Hill, Suzanne) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Application to Employ Kenneth D. Herron, Jr. as Attorney for the Debtor Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Debtor Millennium Services of Florida, LLC (Herron, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion to Determine Adequate Assurance for Payment of Utility Services or, in the Alternative, Establishing the Procedure for Determining Adequate Assurance Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Debtor Millennium Services of Florida, LLC (Herron, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Debtor Millennium Services of Florida, LLC. (Herron, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Debtor Millennium Services of Florida, LLC. (Herron, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Fee Paid.). Schedules and Summary of Assets Not Filed. Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed. Disclosure of Compensation Not Filed. Filed by Kenneth D Herron Jr on behalf of Millennium Services of Florida, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 10/18/2022. Disclosure Statement due by 10/18/2022. (Herron, Kenneth) Modified on 6/21/2022 (Ahyen). (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Evan Otero(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Altman