This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 06/24/2021 at 05:25:03 (UTC).

Michael Anthony Federici

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Michael Anthony Federici was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Julia W. Brand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-BK-15129

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Julia W. Brand

 

Party Details

Debtor

Michael Anthony Federici

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Trustee

Nancy K Curry (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Kevin T Simon

Attorney at Law Offices of Kevin T. Simon, APC

21241 Ventura Blvd., Suite 253

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/29/2021 at 09:00 AM at TR 13, VIDEO CONFERENCE. GOTO TRUSTEE WEBSITE FOR INSTRUCTIONS. Confirmation hearing to be held on 9/8/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proofs of Claims due by 9/1/2021. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Michael Anthony Federici. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#2

(#2) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Michael Anthony Federici. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#1

(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $313 Filed by Michael Anthony Federici Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 07/7/2021. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 07/7/2021. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 07/7/2021. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 07/7/2021. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 07/7/2021. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 07/7/2021. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 07/7/2021. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 07/7/2021. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 07/7/2021. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 07/7/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 07/7/2021. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 07/7/2021. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 07/7/2021. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 07/7/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 07/7/2021. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(# 2:21-bk-15129) [misc,volp13] ( 313.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A53084764. Fee amount 313.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/29/2021 at 09:00 AM at TR 13, VIDEO CONFERENCE. GOTO TRUSTEE WEBSITE FOR INSTRUCTIONS. Confirmation hearing to be held on 9/8/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proofs of Claims due by 9/1/2021. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docket(#4) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Michael Anthony Federici. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Michael Anthony Federici. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Michael Anthony Federici. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $313 Filed by Michael Anthony Federici Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 07/7/2021. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 07/7/2021. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 07/7/2021. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 07/7/2021. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 07/7/2021. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 07/7/2021. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 07/7/2021. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 07/7/2021. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 07/7/2021. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 07/7/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 07/7/2021. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 07/7/2021. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 07/7/2021. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 07/7/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 07/7/2021. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin T Simon