This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 04/20/2023 at 04:09:50 (UTC).

Melissa Cantu

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 Melissa Cantu was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey P Norman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-BK-80063

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey P Norman

 

Party Details

Debtor

Melissa Cantu

Trustee

William E. Heitkamp

Us Trustee

US Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Gabriel Perez

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#20 Final Decree. Bankruptcy Case Closed) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/20/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/20/2022)

#20

(#20) Final Decree. Bankruptcy Case Closed (Admin.) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#19

(#19) Chapter 13 Trustee Final Report and Account. (Heitkamp, William) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#18

(#18) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#17 Dismissing Case for Deficiencies JN (FORMS)) No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 06/02/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#17

(#17) Order Dismissing Debtor for deficiencies: Schedules, SOFA, Form 22c, Pay Advices. (TraceyConrad) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#16

(#16) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#15 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules) No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/18/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#15

(#15) Order Granting in Part the Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information. Deadline is set for May 27, 2022. (Related Doc #14) Signed on 5/16/2022. (mrios) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

14 #2

Proposed Order

14 #1

Main Document

8 #2

Ch 13 First Mtg

8 #1

Ch 13 First Mtg

#7

(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#4 Order: Possible Future Dismissal of Case) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/09/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/09/2022)

#6

(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#5 Initial Order for Chapter 13 Case) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 04/09/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/09/2022)

#5

(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#5 Initial Order for Chapter 13 Case) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 04/09/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/09/2022)

#4

(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#4 Order: Possible Future Dismissal of Case) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/09/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/09/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Michael W Zientz Filed by on behalf of CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC, as servicer for FIRST GUARANTY MORTGAGE CORPORATION (Zientz, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling (Filed By Melissa Cantu ). (Perez, Gabriel) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#1

(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $313 Filed by Melissa Cantu. (Perez, Gabriel) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/20/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#20 Final Decree. Bankruptcy Case Closed) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/20/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) Final Decree. Bankruptcy Case Closed (Admin.) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) Chapter 13 Trustee Final Report and Account. (Heitkamp, William) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#17 Dismissing Case for Deficiencies JN (FORMS)) No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 06/02/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) Order Dismissing Debtor for deficiencies: Schedules, SOFA, Form 22c, Pay Advices. (TraceyConrad) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#15 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules) No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/18/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) Order Granting in Part the Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information. Deadline is set for May 27, 2022. (Related Doc #14) Signed on 5/16/2022. (mrios) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) First Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Debtor Melissa Cantu (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Exhibit) (Perez, Gabriel) (Entered: 05/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case . Hearing scheduled for 6/10/2022 at 10:00 AM. (Heitkamp, William) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Meeting of Creditors Held - Trustee Does Not Recommend Confirmation of the plan. Debtor did not appear at the meeting held 5/9/2022. Meeting not concluded . (Related document(s):#8 Chapter 13 Meeting of Creditors (batch)) (Heitkamp, William) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
04/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Chapter 13 Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/9/2022 at 11:30 AM at Trustee Heitkamp Teleconference Line 1. Financial Management Course due:6/23/2022. Last day to object to dischargeability under section 523 is 7/8/2022. Proofs of Claims due by 6/13/2022. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/3/2022. Confirmation Hearing to be held on 6/10/2022 at 10:00 AM at Galveston 7th Floor Courtroom. Clerk to send Notice on Financial Management Requirement 6/23/2022. (Heitkamp, William) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#4 Order: Possible Future Dismissal of Case) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/09/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#5 Initial Order for Chapter 13 Case) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 04/09/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Order, Initial Order on Debtor's Responsibilities, and Order Authorizing Use of Vehicles Pursuant to 363 and Providing Adequate Protection. Signed on 4/7/2022 (JacquelineMata) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Order: Possible Future Dismissal of Case. Court advises that 11 U.S.C. Section 521(i) requires automatic dismissal if information required by Section 521(a)(1) is not filed. Signed on 4/7/2022 (JacquelineMata) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2022

DocketPrevious case filed in the Southern District of Texas, Case Number 19-80138. (SierraThomasAnderson) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Michael W Zientz Filed by on behalf of CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC, as servicer for FIRST GUARANTY MORTGAGE CORPORATION (Zientz, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling (Filed By Melissa Cantu ). (Perez, Gabriel) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(# 22-80063) [misc,volp13] ( 313.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23630274. Fee amount $ 313.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $313 Filed by Melissa Cantu. (Perez, Gabriel) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less