This case was last updated from PACER on 12/11/2020 at 06:40:24 (UTC).

MD America Energy Holdings, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2020 MD America Energy Holdings, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy. The Judges overseeing this case are Marvin Isgur and David R Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-BK-34967

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judges

Marvin Isgur

David R Jones

 

Party Details

Debtor

MD America Energy Holdings, Inc.

301 Commerce Street, Ste. 2500

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Us Trustee

US Trustee

515 Rusk Ave, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

John F Higgins, IV

Attorney at Porter Hedges LLP

1000 Main St, Ste 3600

Houston, TX 77002-6336

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#5 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/16/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/17/2020)

#6

(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#3 Order for Joint Administration) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/15/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#5

(#5) Notice and Order regarding exchanging of exhibits and witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings. (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#3

(#3) Order for Joint Administration under 20-34966. Signed on 10/13/2020 (aaloadi) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#2

Proposed Order

2 #1

Main Document

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by MD America Energy Holdings, Inc.. (Higgins, John) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#5 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/16/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#3 Order for Joint Administration) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/15/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice and Order regarding exchanging of exhibits and witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings. (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docket(#4) No Creditor Mailing List (JacquelineMataadi) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketAn order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 20-34966 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (aaloadi) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order for Joint Administration under 20-34966. Signed on 10/13/2020 (aaloadi) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketJudge David R Jones added to case. Involvement of Judge Marvin Isgur Terminated (aalo) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor MD America Energy Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Higgins, John) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(20-34967) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22500891. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by MD America Energy Holdings, Inc.. (Higgins, John) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John F Higgins, IV